This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 07/22/2022 at 07:00:22 (UTC).

1225 Clifton ST DE LLC

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 1225 Clifton ST DE LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, District Of Columbia Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth L. Gunn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-BK-00126

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth L. Gunn

 

Party Details

Debtor and Debtor In Possession

1225 Clifton ST DE LLC

627 Princeton Place Nw

Washington, DC 20010

Us Trustee

U. S. Trustee for Region Four

1725 Duke Street, Suite 650

Alexandria, VA 22314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor In Possession Attorney

Anitra Ash-Shakoor

Attorney at Capital Justice Attorneys, LLP

1325 G Street Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20005

Us Trustee Attorney

Kristen S. Eustis

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

1725 Duke Street, Ste 650

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738. Filed by 1225 Clifton ST DE LLC Schedule G due 08/4/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs due 08/4/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 08/4/2022. Chapter 11 Plan due by 11/18/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 11/18/2022. Government Proof of Claim due by 01/17/2023. (Ash-Shakoor, Anitra) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Order to File Required Documents. Missing Case Opening Documents due by 8/4/2022. (Alde, Claude) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice to Party Filing Deficient Bankruptcy Case. (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition) Case Opening Deficiencies due by 7/28/2022 for #1, . (Alde, Claude) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#5

(#5) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $ 12,738.00 (amount includes $1,738.00 court filing fee). Filed by 1225 Clifton ST DE LLC. (Ash-Shakoor, Anitra) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

6 #1

Main Document

6 #2

Verified Statement

6 #3

Notice

6 #4

Proposed Order

6 #5

Mailing Matrix

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application to Employ Anitra Ash-Shakoor and Capital Justice Attorneys, LLP as Attorney for Debtor In Possession 1225 Clifton ST DE LLC and Verified Statement of Proposed Party. Filed by 1225 Clifton ST DE LLC. Objections due by 08/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement #2 Notice #3 Proposed Order #4 Mailing Matrix) (Ash-Shakoor, Anitra) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $ 12,738.00 (amount includes $1,738.00 court filing fee). Filed by 1225 Clifton ST DE LLC. (Ash-Shakoor, Anitra) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Party Filing Deficient Bankruptcy Case. (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition) Case Opening Deficiencies due by 7/28/2022 for #1, . (Alde, Claude) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order to File Required Documents. Missing Case Opening Documents due by 8/4/2022. (Alde, Claude) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition(# 22-00126) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt numberA2608439. Fee Amount 1738.00 (Ash-Shakoor, Anitra) (re:Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738. Filed by 1225 Clifton ST DE LLC Schedule G due 08/4/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs due 08/4/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 08/4/2022. Chapter 11 Plan due by 11/18/2022. Disclosure Statement due by 11/18/2022. Government Proof of Claim due by 01/17/2023. (Ash-Shakoor, Anitra) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristen S. Eustis