This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 02/02/2022 at 01:29:37 (UTC).

1116 Maple Street, LLC v. Chakrian et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 1116 Maple Street, LLC filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Chakrian. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Barry Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-AP-01622

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Barry Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1116 Maple Street, LLC

Defendants

Alex Nelson

Nazaret Chakrian

O.K., LLC

1st Point Lending, Inc.

Oleg Khersonsky

Dzina Nelson

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeremy Faith

Ori S Blumenfeld

Anna Landa

Defendant Attorneys

James R Felton

Jeremy H Rothstein

Anita Jain

 

Court Documents

#123

(#123) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#122 DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/06/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#122

(#122) DEFAULT JUDGMENT Re: Judgment in favor of Plaintiff for damages in the amount of $2,300,000.00 (BNC-PDF) Signed on 8/4/2021 (RE: related document(s)#104 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC). (Toliver, Wanda) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#121

(#121) Status report Plaintiff's Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint). (Landa, Anna) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#120

(#120) Notice RE: BK Record Complete, Briefing Schedule RE: Appeal 2:21-cv-04778 DOC (Originally filed at District Court 07/09/2021). (RE: related document(s)#96 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC) (Milano, Sonny) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#119

(#119) Notice RE: BK Record Complete, Briefing Schedule RE: Appeal 2:21-cv-04777 DOC (Originally filed at District Court 07/09/2021). (RE: related document(s)#95 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC) (Milano, Sonny) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#118

(#118) Certificate of Readiness of Record on Appeal to District Court - Case Number: 2:21-cv-04778-DOC. (RE: related document(s)#96 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC) (Milano, Sonny) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#104

(#122) DEFAULT JUDGMENT Re: Judgment in favor of Plaintiff for damages in the amount of $2,300,000.00 (BNC-PDF) Signed on 8/4/2021 (RE: related document(s)#104 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC). (Toliver, Wanda) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#96

(#114) Notice of transcripts Notice of Transcripts Designated for an Appeal Filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC (RE: related document(s)#96 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A)). (Faith, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#95

(#115) Statement of Issues on Appeal Appellee O.K., LLC's Counter-Statement of Issues Filed by Defendant O.K., LLC (RE: related document(s)#95 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A)). (Jain, Anita) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

AP-Summons

2 #1

Main Document

1 #2

Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet

#1

Main Document

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#122 DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/06/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) DEFAULT JUDGMENT Re: Judgment in favor of Plaintiff for damages in the amount of $2,300,000.00 (BNC-PDF) Signed on 8/4/2021 (RE: related document(s)#104 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC). (Toliver, Wanda) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) Status report Plaintiff's Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint). (Landa, Anna) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) Notice RE: BK Record Complete, Briefing Schedule RE: Appeal 2:21-cv-04778 DOC (Originally filed at District Court 07/09/2021). (RE: related document(s)#96 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC) (Milano, Sonny) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) Notice RE: BK Record Complete, Briefing Schedule RE: Appeal 2:21-cv-04777 DOC (Originally filed at District Court 07/09/2021). (RE: related document(s)#95 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC) (Milano, Sonny) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) Certificate of Readiness of Record on Appeal to District Court - Case Number: 2:21-cv-04778-DOC. (RE: related document(s)#96 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC) (Milano, Sonny) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) Certificate of Readiness of Record on Appeal to District Court - Case Number: 2:21-cv-04777-DOC. (RE: related document(s)#95 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A) filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC) (Milano, Sonny) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) Statement of Issues on Appeal - Appellees Nelson, et al.'s Counter-Statement of Issues Filed by Defendants 1st Point Lending, Inc., Oleg Khersonsky, Alex Nelson, Dzina Nelson (RE: related document(s)#95 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A)). (Rothstein, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) Statement of Issues on Appeal Appellee O.K., LLC's Counter-Statement of Issues Filed by Defendant O.K., LLC (RE: related document(s)#95 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A)). (Jain, Anita) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) Notice of transcripts Notice of Transcripts Designated for an Appeal Filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC (RE: related document(s)#96 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (Official Form 417A)). (Faith, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Declaration re: Declaration of Jeremy W. Faith in Support of Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Notice of Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC (RE: related document(s)#9 Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP)). (Faith, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Notice of Status Conference (LBR 7004-1(a)(1)(B)) Filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC. (Faith, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Another Summons Issued on 1st Point Lending, Inc. Date Issued 10/21/2020, Answer Due 11/20/2020; Nazaret Chakrian Date Issued 10/21/2020, Answer Due 11/20/2020; Oleg Khersonsky Date Issued 10/21/2020, Answer Due 11/20/2020; Alex Nelson Date Issued 10/21/2020, Answer Due 11/20/2020; Dzina Nelson Date Issued 10/21/2020, Answer Due 11/20/2020; O.K., LLC Date Issued 10/21/2020, Answer Due 11/20/2020 (RE: related document(s)#5 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC) Status hearing to be held on 12/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (Fortier, Stacey) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Haberbush, Vanessa. (Haberbush, Vanessa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Notice of Status Conference (LBR 7004-1(a)(1)(B)) Filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC. (Faith, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Amended Complaint First Amended Complaint for: 1. Breach of Loan Agreement; 2. Breach of Fiduciary Duty; 3. Negligent Misrepresentation; 4. Negligent Misrepresentation; 5. Fraud (Intentional Misrepresentation); 6. Negligence; 7. Cancellation of Instruments; 8. Negligence Notary Public; and 9. Declaratory Relief by Jeremy Faith on behalf of 1116 Maple Street, LLC against 1st Point Lending, Inc., Nazaret Chakrian, Oleg Khersonsky, Alex Nelson, Dzina Nelson, O.K., LLC. (RE: related document(s)#1 Adversary case 2:20-ap-01622. Complaint by 1116 Maple Street, LLC against Nazaret Chakrian, Alex Nelson, Dzina Nelson, 1st Point Lending, Inc., O.K., LLC, Oleg Khersonsky. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint for: 1. Breach of Loan Agreement; 2. Breach of Fiduciary Duty; 3. Negligent Misrepresentation; 4. Fraud (Intentional Misrepresentation); 5. Negligence; 6. Cancellation of Instruments; 7. Negligence Notary Public; and 8. Declaratory Relief (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC). (Faith, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Blumenfeld, Ori. (Blumenfeld, Ori) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Landa, Anna. (Landa, Anna) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued on 1st Point Lending, Inc. Date Issued 9/15/2020, Answer Due 10/15/2020; Nazaret Chakrian Date Issued 9/15/2020, Answer Due 10/15/2020; Oleg Khersonsky Date Issued 9/15/2020, Answer Due 10/15/2020; Alex Nelson Date Issued 9/15/2020, Answer Due 10/15/2020; Dzina Nelson Date Issued 9/15/2020, Answer Due 10/15/2020; O.K., LLC Date Issued 9/15/2020, Answer Due 10/15/2020 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff 1116 Maple Street, LLC) Status hearing to be held on 11/10/2020 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1668, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Barry Russell (Fortier, Stacey) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 2:20-ap-01622. Complaint by 1116 Maple Street, LLC against Nazaret Chakrian, Alex Nelson, Dzina Nelson, 1st Point Lending, Inc., O.K., LLC, Oleg Khersonsky. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Complaint for: 1. Breach of Loan Agreement; 2. Breach of Fiduciary Duty; 3. Negligent Misrepresentation; 4. Fraud (Intentional Misrepresentation); 5. Negligence; 6. Cancellation of Instruments; 7. Negligence Notary Public; and 8. Declaratory Relief (Attachments: #1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet) Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) (Faith, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less