This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/17/2022 at 21:55:43 (UTC).

KZMSS Again, LLLP

Case Summary

On 08/15/2011 KZMSS Again, LLLP was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Arthur B. Briskman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:11-BK-12388

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Arthur B. Briskman

 

Party Details

Debtor

KZMSS Again, LLLP

201 West Guava Street

Lady Lake, FL 32159

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - ORL

George C Young Federal Building

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Jimmy D Parrish

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

200 S Orange Avenue, Suntrust Center - Suite 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

Us Trustee Attorney

Jill E Kelso

Attorney at Office of the United States Trustee

400 W. Washington Street, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#179

(#179) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #177)). Notice Date 03/14/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/15/2013)

#178

(#178) Certificate of Service Re: Final Decree Filed by Jimmy D Parrish on behalf of Debtor KZMSS Again, LLLP (related document(s)#177). (Parrish, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/14/2013)

#177

(#177) Final Decree. (Faye) (Entered: 03/12/2013)

#176

(#176) Financial Reports for the Period October 1, 2012 to December 31, 2012. Filed by Jimmy D Parrish on behalf of Debtor KZMSS Again, LLLP. (Parrish, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/31/2013)

#175

(#175) Motion for Final Decree Filed by Jimmy D Parrish on behalf of Debtor KZMSS Again, LLLP (Parrish, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/03/2013)

#174

(#174) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #173)). Notice Date 12/08/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/09/2012)

#173

(#173) Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc #89). Fees awarded to Terry Soifer in the amount of $9942.50, expenses awarded: $0.00, Granting Application For Supplemental Compensation (Related Doc #154). Fees awarded to Terry Soifer in the amount of $6592.50, expenses awarded: $0.00 Signed on 12/6/2012. (Faye) (Entered: 12/06/2012)

#170

(#171) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #170)). Notice Date 11/22/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/23/2012)

#154

(#173) Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc #89). Fees awarded to Terry Soifer in the amount of $9942.50, expenses awarded: $0.00, Granting Application For Supplemental Compensation (Related Doc #154). Fees awarded to Terry Soifer in the amount of $6592.50, expenses awarded: $0.00 Signed on 12/6/2012. (Faye) (Entered: 12/06/2012)

#89

(#173) Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc #89). Fees awarded to Terry Soifer in the amount of $9942.50, expenses awarded: $0.00, Granting Application For Supplemental Compensation (Related Doc #154). Fees awarded to Terry Soifer in the amount of $6592.50, expenses awarded: $0.00 Signed on 12/6/2012. (Faye) (Entered: 12/06/2012)

#8

(#8) Notice Regarding the Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman . (Kim G.) (Entered: 08/16/2011)

#7

(#7) Letter/Memorandum Re: Exhibit A, Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Case Summary, Application & Proposed Order to Retain Attorney (related document(s)#1). (Kim G.) (Entered: 08/16/2011)

#6

(#6) Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. Signed on 8/16/2011 (Kim G.) (Entered: 08/16/2011)

#5

(#5) Order of Retention of Debtor-In-Possession. Signed on 8/16/2011 (Kim G.) (Entered: 08/16/2011)

#4

(#4) Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/12/2011 at 11:00 AM at Orlando, FL (6-60) - 135 West Central Blvd., 6th Floor, Suite 600. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/14/2011. Proofs of Claims due by 12/12/2011. (Kim G.) (Entered: 08/16/2011)

#3

(#3) Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Jimmy D Parrish on behalf of Debtor KZMSS Again, LLLP. (Parrish, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/15/2011)

#2

(#2) Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Electronic Filing Regarding Voluntary Petition; List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims; List of Equity Security Holders; and Verification of Creditor Matrix by Jeffery Mandume Kerina Filed by Jimmy D Parrish on behalf of Debtor KZMSS Again, LLLP (related document(s)#1). (Parrish, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/15/2011)

#1

(#7) Letter/Memorandum Re: Exhibit A, Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Case Summary, Application & Proposed Order to Retain Attorney (related document(s)#1). (Kim G.) (Entered: 08/16/2011)

191 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2013
  • DocketBankruptcy Case Closed. (Faye) (Entered: 03/28/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#179) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #177)). Notice Date 03/14/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/15/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#178) Certificate of Service Re: Final Decree Filed by Jimmy D Parrish on behalf of Debtor KZMSS Again, LLLP (related document(s)#177). (Parrish, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/14/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#177) Final Decree. (Faye) (Entered: 03/12/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#176) Financial Reports for the Period October 1, 2012 to December 31, 2012. Filed by Jimmy D Parrish on behalf of Debtor KZMSS Again, LLLP. (Parrish, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/31/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#175) Motion for Final Decree Filed by Jimmy D Parrish on behalf of Debtor KZMSS Again, LLLP (Parrish, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/03/2013)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#174) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #173)). Notice Date 12/08/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/09/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#173) Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc #89). Fees awarded to Terry Soifer in the amount of $9942.50, expenses awarded: $0.00, Granting Application For Supplemental Compensation (Related Doc #154). Fees awarded to Terry Soifer in the amount of $6592.50, expenses awarded: $0.00 Signed on 12/6/2012. (Faye) (Entered: 12/06/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • DocketChange of address submitted to the Court on December 5, 2012 by attorney Jill E.Kelso, U.S. Department of Justice/Office of the U.S. Trustee, 400 W. Washington Street, Suite 1100, Orlando, FL 32801. (Janice) (Entered: 12/05/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#171) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #170)). Notice Date 11/22/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/23/2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
167 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice Regarding the Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman . (Kim G.) (Entered: 08/16/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter/Memorandum Re: Exhibit A, Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Disclosure of Compensation, Case Summary, Application & Proposed Order to Retain Attorney (related document(s)#1). (Kim G.) (Entered: 08/16/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. Signed on 8/16/2011 (Kim G.) (Entered: 08/16/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order of Retention of Debtor-In-Possession. Signed on 8/16/2011 (Kim G.) (Entered: 08/16/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/12/2011 at 11:00 AM at Orlando, FL (6-60) - 135 West Central Blvd., 6th Floor, Suite 600. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/14/2011. Proofs of Claims due by 12/12/2011. (Kim G.) (Entered: 08/16/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2011
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Arthur B. Briskman, Bankruptcy Judge to this case . (Pat H.) (Entered: 08/16/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Jimmy D Parrish on behalf of Debtor KZMSS Again, LLLP. (Parrish, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/15/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Electronic Filing Regarding Voluntary Petition; List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims; List of Equity Security Holders; and Verification of Creditor Matrix by Jeffery Mandume Kerina Filed by Jimmy D Parrish on behalf of Debtor KZMSS Again, LLLP (related document(s)#1). (Parrish, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/15/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(6:11-bk-12388) [misc,volp11a2] (1039.00). Receipt Number 25700011, Amount Paid $1039.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/15/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. Health Care Business. (Fee Paid.) and List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims; List of Equity Security Holders; and Verification of Creditor Matrix Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statem ent of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Jimmy D Parrish on behalf of KZMSS Again, LLLP. Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/13/2011 Disclosure Statement due by 12/13/2011 (Parrish, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/15/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jill E Kelso