This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 03/01/2022 at 15:41:11 (UTC).

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of B v. Shetland Fund Limited Partnership et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2010 Irving H Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of B filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Shetland Fund Limited Partnership. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stuart M. Bernstein. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:10-AP-04579

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Stuart M. Bernstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff

Defendants

Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Robert I. Lappin, in his capacity as General Partner of the Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

U/W/O Louis Zaiger Residue Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Marion L. Lappin, in her capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Nancy J. Lappin, in her capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Peter J. Lappin, in his capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Barton Realty Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Shetland Associates Limited Partnership, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Lappin Grandchildrens Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Shetland Properties, Inc., it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Shetland Investments Limited Partnership, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Lappin Family Limited Partnership, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Nancy Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Peter Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Andrew Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Nancy Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Peter Lappin, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Andrew Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

Marion L. Lappin Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc Hirschfield

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Palaza

New York, NY 10111

Marc E. Hirschfield

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Defendant Attorney

Howard Kleinhendler

Attorney at Wachtel & Masyr, LLP

110 East 59Th Street

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) Copy of Order of U.S. District Court Judge Jed S. Rakoff signed on 8/1/2014. The Clerk of Court is directed to close all the civil cases seeking to withdraw the reference related to this matter (related document(s)#14) (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/06/2016)

#41

(#41) So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 9/1/2016. Re: VoluntaryDismissal Of Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 09/02/2016)

#40

(#40) Affidavit of Service for the Amended Case Management Notice (related document(s)#39) Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

#39

(#39) Statement /Amended Case Management Notice filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

#38

(#38) Affidavit of Service of the Case Management Notice (related document(s)#37) Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

#37

(#37) Statement /Case Management Notice filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

#36

(#36) Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1) filed by Howard Kleinhendler on behalf of Andrew Lappin, in his capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Barton Realty Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Lappin Family Limited Partnership, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Lappin Grandchildrens Trust FBO Danielle F. Lappin, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Lappin Grandchildrens Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Marion L. Lappin Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Marion L. Lappin, in her capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Nancy J. Lappin, in her capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Peter J. Lappin, in his capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Andrew Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Nancy Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Peter Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Andrew Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Nancy Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Peter Lappin, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin, in his capacity as General Partner of the Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Shetland Associates Limited Partnership, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Shetland Investments Limited Partnership, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Shetland Properties, Inc., it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, U/W/O Louis Zaiger Residue Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership. (Kleinhendler, Howard) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

#35

(#35) Order Signed On 7/16/2015 Re: Granting In Part And Denying In PartDefendants Motions To Dismiss (Greene, Chantel). (Entered: 07/16/2015)

#34

(#34) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Settlement of an Order Regarding June 2, 2015 Decision re: Omnibus Motions to Dismiss (related document(s)#33) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

#14

(#42) Copy of Order of U.S. District Court Judge Jed S. Rakoff signed on 8/1/2014. The Clerk of Court is directed to close all the civil cases seeking to withdraw the reference related to this matter (related document(s)#14) (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/06/2016)

#8

(#8) Statement Second Notice of Extended Response Due Date filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 06/01/2011)

#7

(#7) Affidavit of Service Amended Affidavit of Service of Extended Response Due Date (related document(s)#6) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/24/2011)

#6

(#7) Affidavit of Service Amended Affidavit of Service of Extended Response Due Date (related document(s)#6) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/24/2011)

#5

(#6) Affidavit of Service of Extended Response Due Date (related document(s)#5) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/24/2011)

#4

(#4) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #3, #1) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/04/2011)

#3

(#5) Statement / Notice of Extended Response Due Date (related document(s)#3, #1) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/18/2011)

#2

(#4) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #3, #1) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/04/2011)

#1

(#36) Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1) filed by Howard Kleinhendler on behalf of Andrew Lappin, in his capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Barton Realty Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Lappin Family Limited Partnership, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Lappin Grandchildrens Trust FBO Danielle F. Lappin, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Lappin Grandchildrens Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Marion L. Lappin Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Marion L. Lappin, in her capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Nancy J. Lappin, in her capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Peter J. Lappin, in his capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Andrew Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Nancy Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Peter Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Andrew Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Nancy Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Peter Lappin, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin, in his capacity as General Partner of the Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Shetland Associates Limited Partnership, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Shetland Investments Limited Partnership, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Shetland Properties, Inc., it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, U/W/O Louis Zaiger Residue Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership. (Kleinhendler, Howard) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketAdversary Case 1:10-ap-4579 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Copy of Order of U.S. District Court Judge Jed S. Rakoff signed on 8/1/2014. The Clerk of Court is directed to close all the civil cases seeking to withdraw the reference related to this matter (related document(s)#14) (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 9/1/2016. Re: VoluntaryDismissal Of Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 09/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Affidavit of Service for the Amended Case Management Notice (related document(s)#39) Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Statement /Amended Case Management Notice filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Affidavit of Service of the Case Management Notice (related document(s)#37) Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Statement /Case Management Notice filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1) filed by Howard Kleinhendler on behalf of Andrew Lappin, in his capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Barton Realty Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Lappin Family Limited Partnership, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Lappin Grandchildrens Trust FBO Danielle F. Lappin, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Lappin Grandchildrens Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Marion L. Lappin Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Marion L. Lappin, in her capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Nancy J. Lappin, in her capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Peter J. Lappin, in his capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Andrew Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Nancy Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Peter Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Andrew Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Nancy Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Peter Lappin, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin, in his capacity as General Partner of the Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Shetland Associates Limited Partnership, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Shetland Investments Limited Partnership, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Shetland Properties, Inc., it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, U/W/O Louis Zaiger Residue Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership. (Kleinhendler, Howard) (Entered: 08/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Order Signed On 7/16/2015 Re: Granting In Part And Denying In PartDefendants Motions To Dismiss (Greene, Chantel). (Entered: 07/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Settlement of an Order Regarding June 2, 2015 Decision re: Omnibus Motions to Dismiss (related document(s)#33) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 06/16/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Statement Second Notice of Extended Response Due Date filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 06/01/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Affidavit of Service Amended Affidavit of Service of Extended Response Due Date (related document(s)#6) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Affidavit of Service of Extended Response Due Date (related document(s)#5) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/24/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement / Notice of Extended Response Due Date (related document(s)#3, #1) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/18/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #3, #1) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/04/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Andrew Lappin, in his capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Barton Realty Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Lappin Family Limited Partnership, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Lappin Grandchildrens Trust FBO Danielle F. Lappin, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Lappin Grandchildrens Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Marion L. Lappin Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Marion L. Lappin, in her capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Nancy J. Lappin, in her capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Peter J. Lappin, in his capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Andrew Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Nancy Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Peter Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Andrew Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Nancy Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Peter Lappin, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Robert I. Lappin, in his capacity as General Partner of the Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Shetland Associates Limited Partnership, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Shetland Investments Limited Partnership, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Shetland Properties, Inc., it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011; U/W/O Louis Zaiger Residue Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership Answer Due: 4/4/2011. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Gomez, Jessica) (Entered: 02/03/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(10-04579) [cmp,cmp] ( 250.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 635. Fee amount 250.00. (Slinger) (Entered: 12/02/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • DocketJudge Burton R. Lifland added to the case. (Cockerham, Kevin). (Entered: 12/01/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter \ Notice of Applicability of the order approving litigation case management procedures for avoidance actions filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 12/01/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin, in his capacity as General Partner of the Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, U/W/O Louis Zaiger Residue Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Marion L. Lappin, in her capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Nancy J. Lappin, in her capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Peter J. Lappin, in his capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Barton Realty Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Shetland Associates Limited Partnership, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Lappin Grandchildrens Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Shetland Properties, Inc., it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Shetland Investments Limited Partnership, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Lappin Family Limited Partnership, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Nancy Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Peter Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin 1972 Family Trust FBO Andrew Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Nancy Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Peter Lappin, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Robert I. Lappin Irrevocable 1976 Family Trust FBO Andrew Lappin, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Marion L. Lappin Trust, in its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Andrew Lappin, in his capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership, Lappin Grandchildrens Trust FBO Danielle F. Lappin, it its capacity as a Limited Partner of Shetland Fund Limited Partnership . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Marc Hirschfield, Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 12/01/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, Securities Investor Protection Corporation, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard Kleinhendler