This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 03/01/2022 at 15:30:32 (UTC).

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of B v. Roth

Case Summary

On 12/02/2010 Irving H Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of B filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Roth. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Stuart M. Bernstein. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:10-AP-05132

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Stuart M. Bernstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Defendant

Amy R. Roth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc E. Hirschfield

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Geraldine Ponto

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Defendant Attorneys

David A. Blansky

Attorney at LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP

3305 Jerusalem Avenue, Suite 201

Wantagh, NY 11793

Gary Frederick Herbst

Attorney at LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco

3305 Jerusalem Avenue

Wantagh, NY 11793

Michele L. Pahmer

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) Order of U.S. District Court Judge Denying Motion to Withdraw the Reference signed on 8/1/14 (White, Greg) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

#38

(#38) So Ordered Stipulation signed on 1/26/2017 For Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice. (Gomez, Jessica) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

37 #2

Notice of Bankruptcy Filing

37 #1

Main Document

#36

(#36) Affidavit of Service of Amended Case Management Notice (related document(s)#35) Filed by Heather J. McDonald on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (McDonald, Heather) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#35

(#35) Statement /Amended Case Management Notice filed by Heather J. McDonald on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (McDonald, Heather) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

#34

(#34) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#33) filed by Heather J. McDonald on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (McDonald, Heather) (Entered: 09/25/2014)

#33

(#33) Statement /Case Management Notice filed by Heather J. McDonald on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (McDonald, Heather) (Entered: 09/24/2014)

32 #2

Affidavit of Service

32 #1

Main Document

#8

(#8) Stipulation / Stipulation Extending Time to Respond filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 09/22/2011)

#7

(#7) Stipulation Extending Time To Respond And Designating Email Address Upon Which To Serve Defendants (related document(s)#3, #1) filed by Heather J. McDonald on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (McDonald, Heather) (Entered: 07/18/2011)

#6

(#6) Affidavit of Service Notice of Extended Response Due Date (related document(s)#5) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 05/05/2011)

#5

(#6) Affidavit of Service Notice of Extended Response Due Date (related document(s)#5) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 05/05/2011)

#4

(#4) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #3, #1) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 03/07/2011)

#3

(#7) Stipulation Extending Time To Respond And Designating Email Address Upon Which To Serve Defendants (related document(s)#3, #1) filed by Heather J. McDonald on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (McDonald, Heather) (Entered: 07/18/2011)

#2

(#4) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #3, #1) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 03/07/2011)

#1

(#7) Stipulation Extending Time To Respond And Designating Email Address Upon Which To Serve Defendants (related document(s)#3, #1) filed by Heather J. McDonald on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (McDonald, Heather) (Entered: 07/18/2011)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2017
  • DocketAdversary Case 1:10-ap-5132 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Order of U.S. District Court Judge Denying Motion to Withdraw the Reference signed on 8/1/14 (White, Greg) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) So Ordered Stipulation signed on 1/26/2017 For Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice. (Gomez, Jessica) (Entered: 01/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Letter reporting that the Defendant, Amy R. Roth, filed a voluntary petition under Chapter 13 in the US Bankruptcy Court, Southern District of Florida under case no. 15-26251, resulting in automatic stay Filed by David A. Blansky on behalf of Amy R. Roth. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Bankruptcy Filing)(Blansky, David) (Entered: 09/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Affidavit of Service of Amended Case Management Notice (related document(s)#35) Filed by Heather J. McDonald on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (McDonald, Heather) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Statement /Amended Case Management Notice filed by Heather J. McDonald on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (McDonald, Heather) (Entered: 05/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#33) filed by Heather J. McDonald on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (McDonald, Heather) (Entered: 09/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Statement /Case Management Notice filed by Heather J. McDonald on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (McDonald, Heather) (Entered: 09/24/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Notice of Appearance And Demand for Service of Papers filed by Gary Frederick Herbst on behalf of Amy R. Roth. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Herbst, Gary) (Entered: 08/25/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 7/1/2014. Re: Extending The Initial Case Conference Period to July 18, 2014 (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 07/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Stipulation / Stipulation Extending Time to Respond filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 09/22/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Stipulation Extending Time To Respond And Designating Email Address Upon Which To Serve Defendants (related document(s)#3, #1) filed by Heather J. McDonald on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (McDonald, Heather) (Entered: 07/18/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Affidavit of Service Notice of Extended Response Due Date (related document(s)#5) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 05/05/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement Notice of Extended Response Due Date filed by Heather J. McDonald on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (McDonald, Heather) (Entered: 05/03/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #3, #1) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 03/07/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Amy R. Roth Answer Due: 5/6/2011. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Cales, Humberto) (Entered: 03/07/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • DocketJudge Burton R. Lifland added to the case. (Cales, Humberto). (Entered: 12/03/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(10-05132) [cmp,cmp] ( 250.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 635. Fee amount 250.00. (Slinger) (Entered: 12/03/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter /Notice of Applicability of the Order Approving Litigation Case Management Procedures for Avoidance Actions filed by Geraldine Ponto on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Ponto, Geraldine) (Entered: 12/02/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Amy R. Roth . Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Geraldine Ponto, Geraldine Ponto on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Ponto, Geraldine) (Entered: 12/02/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, Securities Investor Protection Corporation, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary F. Herbst

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Adam Blansky