This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 03/01/2022 at 15:40:19 (UTC).

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of B v. Pompart LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2010 Irving H Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of B filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Pompart LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stuart M. Bernstein. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:10-AP-04665

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Stuart M. Bernstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff

Defendants

Pompart LLC

Laura Pomerantz, individually and as Member of Pompart LLC

John Pomerantz, individually and as Member of Pompart LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc Hirschfield

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Palaza

New York, NY 10111

Marc E. Hirschfield

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

 

Court Documents

#1

(#6) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #1, #5) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 03/24/2011)

#2

(#6) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #1, #5) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 03/24/2011)

#3

(#4) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #3, #1) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/10/2011)

#4

(#4) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #3, #1) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/10/2011)

#5

(#6) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #1, #5) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 03/24/2011)

#6

(#6) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #1, #5) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 03/24/2011)

#7

(#7) Statement / Notice of Extended Response Due Date filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 05/23/2011)

#8

No Description Available

#9

(#9) Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Burton R. Lifland to Judge Stuart M. Bernstein. Judge Stuart M. Bernstein added to the case. (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 01/16/2014)

#10

(#10) Request for Clerk's Entry of Default - Trustee's Request to Enter Default (10-04665). (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

#11

(#11) Affidavit of Service regarding Trustee's Request to Enter Default (related document(s)#10) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

#12

(#12) Clerk's Entry of Default against Pompart LLC (related document(s)#10) (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

#13

(#13) Clerk's Entry of Default against Laura Pomerantz (related document(s)#10) (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

#14

(#14) Clerk's Entry of Default against John Pomerantz (related document(s)#10) (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

#15

(#15) Affidavit of Service regarding Clerk's Entry of Default against Pompart LLC, Clerk's Entry of Default against Laura Pomerantz, and Clerk's Entry of Default against John Pomerantz (related document(s)#14, #12, #13) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 09/22/2014)

#16

(#16) Notice of Dismissal /Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 01/02/2015)

#17

(#17) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice (related document(s)#16) Filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2015
  • DocketAdversary Case 1:10-ap-4665 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice (related document(s)#16) Filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 01/05/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice of Dismissal /Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 01/02/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Affidavit of Service regarding Clerk's Entry of Default against Pompart LLC, Clerk's Entry of Default against Laura Pomerantz, and Clerk's Entry of Default against John Pomerantz (related document(s)#14, #12, #13) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 09/22/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Clerk's Entry of Default against John Pomerantz (related document(s)#10) (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Clerk's Entry of Default against Laura Pomerantz (related document(s)#10) (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Clerk's Entry of Default against Pompart LLC (related document(s)#10) (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Affidavit of Service regarding Trustee's Request to Enter Default (related document(s)#10) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk's Entry of Default - Trustee's Request to Enter Default (10-04665). (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 09/18/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Burton R. Lifland to Judge Stuart M. Bernstein. Judge Stuart M. Bernstein added to the case. (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 01/16/2014)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement / Notice of Extended Response Due Date filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 05/23/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #1, #5) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 03/24/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SECOND Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against John Pomerantz Answer Due: 5/23/2011; Laura Pomerantz Answer Due: 5/23/2011; Pompart LLC Answer Due: 5/23/2011. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Campbell, Tiffany) (Entered: 03/22/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2011
  • DocketRequest for a Second Summons filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/25/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #3, #1) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/10/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against John Pomerantz Answer Due: 4/11/2011; Laura Pomerantz Answer Due: 4/11/2011; Pompart LLC Answer Due: 4/11/2011. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Cales, Humberto) (Entered: 02/10/2011)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(10-04665) [cmp,cmp] ( 250.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 635. Fee amount 250.00. (Slinger) (Entered: 12/02/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketJudge Burton R. Lifland added to the case. (Cockerham, Kevin). (Entered: 12/02/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter \ Notice of Applicability of the order approving litigation case management procedures for avoidance actions filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 12/01/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Pompart LLC, Laura Pomerantz, Individually and as Member of Pompart LLC, John Pomerantz, Individually and as Member of Pompart LLC . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Marc Hirschfield, Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 12/01/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, Securities Investor Protection Corporation, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc E. Hirschfield