This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 12/01/2023 at 06:53:05 (UTC).

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of B v. Legacy Capital Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2010 Irving H Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of B filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Legacy Capital Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecelia G. Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:10-AP-05286

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2010

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Cecelia G. Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff

Defendants

Legacy Capital Ltd.

Isaac Jimmy Mayer

Rafael Mayer

David Mayer

Khronos LLC

Khronos Capital Research LLC

BNP Paribas Securities Corp.

HCH Management Company Ltd.

Montpellier Resources Ltd.

Inversiones Coque S.A.

Aurora Resources Ltd.

Olympus Assets LDC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melissa Kosack

David J. Sheehan

Oren Warshavsky

Nicholas Cremona

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Fisher

Nicholas F. Kajon

Christopher L. Barnett

Carlos J Canino

Harold D. Moorefield, Jr.

Eugene Ernest Stearns

Jonathan C. Vair

Lawrence B. Friedman

Ari MacKinnon

Breon Peace

 

Court Documents

#288

(#288) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#287) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

#287

(#287) Letter to the Honorable Cecelia G. Morris re: Adjournment of the November 16, 2023 Hearing to Consider Order Amending Stipulated Case Management Plan (related document(s) 284 ) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. with hearing to be held on 11/29/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

#285

(#285) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#282) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

283 #4

Exhibit C

283 #3

Exhibit B

283 #2

Exhibit A

283 #1

Main Document

282 #2

Exhibit A

282 #1

Main Document

2 #4

Exhibit C

2 #3

Exhibit B

#2

Exhibit A

2 #1

Main Document

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

Main Document

#1

Case Caption

457 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#288) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#287) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#287) Letter to the Honorable Cecelia G. Morris re: Adjournment of the November 16, 2023 Hearing to Consider Order Amending Stipulated Case Management Plan (related document(s) 284 ) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. with hearing to be held on 11/29/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023

Docket(#286) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Notice of Hearing to consider Order Amending Stipulated Case Management Plan filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff and Objection / Objection of Legacy Capital to the Trustee's Proposed Order Amending Case Management Order filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Legacy Capital Ltd. (related document(s)282, 283) filed by Clerk of Court, United States Bankruptcy Court, SDNY(related document(s): 284 Notice of Hearing filed by Clerk of Court, United States Bankruptcy Court, SDNY'; hearing not held and adjourned to11/29/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (VanessaAshmeade) (Entered: 11/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#285) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#282) Filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#284) Notice of Hearing to consider Order Amending Stipulated Case Management Plan filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff and Objection / Objection of Legacy Capital to the Trustee's Proposed Order Amending Case Management Order filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Legacy Capital Ltd. (related document(s)#282, #283) filed by Clerk of Court, United States Bankruptcy Court, SDNY. with hearing to be held on 11/16/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (Ashmeade, Vanessa) (Entered: 11/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#283) Objection / Objection of Legacy Capital to the Trustee's Proposed Order Amending Case Management Order filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Legacy Capital Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 10/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#282) Notice of Presentment of Order Amending Stipulated Case Management Plan filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. with presentment to be held on 11/1/2023 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (CGM - NYC) Objections due by 10/31/2023, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#281) Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 10/18/2023 At 10:00 AM RE: Letter to the Honorable Cecelia G. Morris re Trustees Application for an Extension of Time. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/18/2024. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) #276, #277). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/27/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/13/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/20/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/18/2024. (Ramos, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#280) ORDERED that the Trustee is directed to submit a proposed order amending the stipulated case management plan consistent with the Court's ruling on the record of the October 18, 2023 hearing and Local Rule 9074-1(a). So Ordered. /s/ Cecelia G. Morris (related document(s)#276) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.The moving party is to serve this order on parties not receiving electronic notice but entitled to notice pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002 and other applicable law.File the Certificate of Service and relate it to this Order entry. (Ashmeade, Vanessa) Modified on 10/19/2023 (Fredericks, Frances). (Entered: 10/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023

DocketPending Deadlines Terminated RE: Letter to the Honorable Cecelia G. Morris re Trustees Application for an Extension of Time (related document(s)272) Filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Legacy Capital Ltd. (related doc. 276); hearing held, requested granted; submit order as indicated in the record. (Ashmeade, Vanessa). (Entered: 10/18/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
280 More Docket Entries
03/23/2011
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) (Disregard. See Corrected Entry Below.) Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Aurora Resources Ltd. Answer Due: 4/22/2011; BNP Paribas Securities Corp. Answer Due: 4/22/2011; David Mayer Answer Due: 4/22/2011; HCH Management Company Ltd. Answer Due: 4/22/2011; Inversiones Coque S.A. Answer Due: 4/22/2011; Isaac Jimmy Mayer Answer Due: 4/22/2011; Khronos Capital Research LLC Answer Due: 4/22/2011; Khronos LLC Answer Due: 4/22/2011; Legacy Capital Ltd. Answer Due: 4/22/2011; Montpellier Resources Ltd. Answer Due: 4/22/2011; Olympus Assets LDC Answer Due: 4/22/2011; Rafael Mayer Answer Due: 4/22/2011. Filed by Clerk's Office of the United States Bankruptcy Court. (Campbell, Tiffany) Modified on 3/24/2011 (Gomez, Jessica). (Entered: 03/23/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2011
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Order Extending The Time For Proper Service Of A Summons And The Time For Defendants To Serve An Answer Under Rules 7004(E) And 7012(A) Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure (Related Doc #4) signed on 3/10/2011. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 03/10/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2011

DocketMotion to Extend Time Extending The Time For Proper Service Of A Summons And The Time For Defendants To Serve An Answer Under Rules 7004(E) And 7012(A) Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure(This administrative entry was entered to reflect the accurate docket event code) (related document(s)#4) filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 03/10/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2011
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#4) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 03/08/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2011
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Notice of Presentment Of Trustee's Motion For An Order Extending The Time For Proper Service Of A Summons And The Time For Foreign Defendants To Serve An Answer Under Rules 7004(E) And 7012(A) Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. with presentment to be held on 3/7/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 3/7/2011, (Attachments: #1 Motion to Extend#2 Proposed Order)(Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/24/2011)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2010
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Statement with Complaint (Filed Under Seal) (related document(s)#2, #1) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 12/08/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2010

DocketJudge Burton R. Lifland added to the case. (Cockerham, Kevin). (Entered: 12/07/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2010

DocketReceipt of Complaint(10-05286) [cmp,cmp] ( 250.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 635. Fee amount 250.00. (Slinger) (Entered: 12/07/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2010
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Statement / Complaint against Legacy Capital Ltd., Isaac Jimmy Mayer, Rafael Mayer, David Mayer, Khronos LLC, Khronos Capital Research LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., HCH Management Company Ltd., Montpellier Resources Ltd., Inversiones Coque S.A., Aurora Resources Ltd., and Olympus Assets LDC [(Redacted)] filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 12/07/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2010
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) (This document is unsealed pursuant to an order signed on 4/18/2011 and is now available for view, see document no. #12) Complaint against Legacy Capital Ltd., Isaac Jimmy Mayer, Rafael Mayer, David Mayer, Khronos LLC, Khronos Capital Research LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., HCH Management Company Ltd., Montpellier Resources Ltd., Inversiones Coque S.A., Aurora Resources Ltd., Olympus Assets LDC . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by David J. Sheehan, David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Sheehan, David) (Receipt #635) Modified on 12/7/2010 (Richards, Beverly). Additional attachment(s) added on 4/19/2011 (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 12/06/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less