This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/03/2022 at 13:37:36 (UTC).

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of B v. Konigsberg et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2010 Irving H Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of B filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Konigsberg. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecelia G. Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:10-AP-04394

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Cecelia G. Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff

Defendants

Frederic Z. Konigsberg

Susan M. Konigsberg

Bradermak, Ltd.

Bradermak Equities Corp.

Lee Rautenberg

Jan Stahl

Geri Stahl

H. Peter Steil

APO Health, Inc. PSP F/B/O H. Peter Steil

APO Health, Inc. PSP F/B/O Jan Stahl

Buyer's Alternatives, Inc. PSP F/B/O Jan Stahl

PJS Trading, Inc. PSP F/B/O Jan Stahl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stacey Ann Bell

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plz

New York, NY 10111

Nicholas Cremona

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Marc Hirschfield

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Palaza

New York, NY 10111

Marc E. Hirschfield

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Melissa Kosack

Attorney at Baker Hostetler

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

David J. Sheehan

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Amy Vanderwal

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey L. Bernfeld

Attorney at Bernfeld DeMatteo & Bernfeld, LLP

600 Third Avenue, 15Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

John E. Lawlor

Attorney at John E. Lawlor, Esq

129 Third Street

Mineola, NY 11501

 

Court Documents

#107

(#107) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#106) Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#106

(#106) Stipulation Extending Time to Conclude Mediation Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#105

(#105) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#104) Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#104

(#104) Stipulation Extending Time to Conclude Mediation Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#103

(#103) Stipulation Extending Time to Conclude Mediation Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#102

(#102) Certificate of Service of Stipulation Extending Time to Conclude Mediation (related document(s)#101) Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#101

(#101) Stipulation Extending Time to Conclude Mediation Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#100

(#100) Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment (related document(s) (Related Doc #99)) . Notice Date 02/28/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

99 #1

Case Reassignment Notice

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by John E. Lawlor on behalf of H. Peter Steil. (Lawlor, John) (Entered: 04/04/2011)

#8

(#8) Notice of Appearance filed by John E. Lawlor on behalf of Buyer's Alternatives, Inc. PSP F/B/O Jan Stahl. (Lawlor, John) (Entered: 04/04/2011)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by John E. Lawlor on behalf of APO Health, Inc. PSP F/B/O H. Peter Steil. (Lawlor, John) (Entered: 04/04/2011)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by John E. Lawlor on behalf of Jan Stahl. (Lawlor, John) (Entered: 04/04/2011)

#5

(#5) Statement Notice of Extended Response Due Date filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 04/04/2011)

#4

(#4) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #1, #3) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/02/2011)

#3

(#4) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #1, #3) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/02/2011)

#2

(#4) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #1, #3) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/02/2011)

#1

(#4) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #1, #3) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/02/2011)

267 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#106) Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) Stipulation Extending Time to Conclude Mediation Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) Certificate of Service (related document(s)#104) Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) Stipulation Extending Time to Conclude Mediation Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) Stipulation Extending Time to Conclude Mediation Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) Certificate of Service of Stipulation Extending Time to Conclude Mediation (related document(s)#101) Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) Stipulation Extending Time to Conclude Mediation Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment (related document(s) (Related Doc #99)) . Notice Date 02/28/2021. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Stuart M. Bernstein to Judge Cecelia G. Morris. Judge Cecelia G. Morris added to the case. (Acosta, Annya). (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) Stipulation Extending Time to Conclude Mediation Filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by John E. Lawlor on behalf of H. Peter Steil. (Lawlor, John) (Entered: 04/04/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance filed by John E. Lawlor on behalf of Buyer's Alternatives, Inc. PSP F/B/O Jan Stahl. (Lawlor, John) (Entered: 04/04/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by John E. Lawlor on behalf of APO Health, Inc. PSP F/B/O H. Peter Steil. (Lawlor, John) (Entered: 04/04/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by John E. Lawlor on behalf of Jan Stahl. (Lawlor, John) (Entered: 04/04/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement Notice of Extended Response Due Date filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 04/04/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit of Service (related document(s)#2, #1, #3) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against APO Health, Inc. PSP F/B/O H. Peter Steil Answer Due: 4/4/2011; APO Health, Inc. PSP F/B/O Jan Stahl Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Bradermak Equities Corp. Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Bradermak, Ltd. Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Buyer's Alternatives, Inc. PSP F/B/O Jan Stahl Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Frederic Z. Konigsberg Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Susan M. Konigsberg Answer Due: 4/4/2011; PJS Trading, Inc. PSP F/B/O Jan Stahl Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Lee Rautenberg Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Geri Stahl Answer Due: 4/4/2011; Jan Stahl Answer Due: 4/4/2011; H. Peter Steil Answer Due: 4/4/2011. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Gomez, Jessica) (Entered: 02/02/2011)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(10-04394) [cmp,cmp] ( 250.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 635. Fee amount 250.00. (Slinger) (Entered: 12/02/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter \ Notice of Applicability of the order approving litigation case management procedures for avoidance actions filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 11/30/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Frederic Z. Konigsberg, Susan M. Konigsberg, Bradermak, Ltd., Bradermak Equities Corp., Lee Rautenberg, Jan Stahl, Geri Stahl, H. Peter Steil, APO Health, Inc. PSP F/B/O H. Peter Steil, APO Health, Inc. PSP F/B/O Jan Stahl, Buyer's Alternatives, Inc. Psp F/B/O Jan Stahl, PJS Trading, Inc. PSP F/B/O Jan Stahl . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Filing fee $250.00, Receipt # 635 CHARGE TO THE ESTATE) Filed by Marc Hirschfield, Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) Modified on 12/2/2010 (Slinger, Kathy). (Entered: 11/30/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, Securities Investor Protection Corporation, is a litigant