This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 08/04/2022 at 01:52:58 (UTC).

Michael Dennis Stemnock

Case Summary

On 01/24/2007 Michael Dennis Stemnock was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court. The Judge overseeing this case is K. Rodney May. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:07-BK-00547

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

Judge Details

Judge

K. Rodney May

 

Party Details

Debtor

Michael Dennis Stemnock

St. Petersburg, FL 33704

Trustee

Lauren P Greene

Treasure Island, FL 33708

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - TPA7, 7

Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200, 501 E Polk Street

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Curran K Porto

Attorney at Curran K Porto, PA

410 South Ware Boulevard, Suite 105

Tampa, FL 33619

Trustee Attorney

Stephen L Meininger, Attorney for Trustee

Attorney at Stephen L Meininger P.A.

707 North Franklin Street, Suite 850

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#109

(#109) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #108)). Service Date 02/24/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/25/2010)

#108

(#108) Final Decree. Signed on 2/22/2010 (Sherry) (Entered: 02/22/2010)

#107

(#107) Final Account of Chapter 7 Trustee. The United States Trustee has reviewed the Final Account, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application of Trustee to be Discharged. The United States Trustee does not object to the relief requested. (Burnette, Cynthia) (Entered: 02/20/2010)

#106

(#106) Report of unclaimed Funds Filed by Lauren P. Greene. (Greene, Lauren) (Entered: 11/09/2009)

#105

(#105) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #104)). Service Date 10/16/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/17/2009)

#104

(#104) Amended Order Allowing Administrative Expenses Fees awarded to Lauren P. Greene in the amount of $, expenses awarded: $15.18; Awarded on 10/14/2009 (related document(s)#98, #96). Signed on 10/14/2009 (DELORES) (Entered: 10/14/2009)

#102

(#102) Certificate of Service Re: Trustee's Final Report and Application for Compensation Filed by Lauren P. Greene (related document(s)#101). (Greene, Lauren) (Entered: 08/05/2009)

#98

(#104) Amended Order Allowing Administrative Expenses Fees awarded to Lauren P. Greene in the amount of $, expenses awarded: $15.18; Awarded on 10/14/2009 (related document(s)#98, #96). Signed on 10/14/2009 (DELORES) (Entered: 10/14/2009)

#96

(#104) Amended Order Allowing Administrative Expenses Fees awarded to Lauren P. Greene in the amount of $, expenses awarded: $15.18; Awarded on 10/14/2009 (related document(s)#98, #96). Signed on 10/14/2009 (DELORES) (Entered: 10/14/2009)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on Behalf of eCAST Settlement Corporation. (Weisman, Gilbert) (Entered: 02/05/2007)

#9

(#9) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #8)). Service Date 02/02/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/03/2007)

#8

(#9) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #8)). Service Date 02/02/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/03/2007)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc #5)). Service Date 01/28/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/29/2007)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #4)). Service Date 01/27/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/28/2007)

#5

(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc #5)). Service Date 01/28/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/29/2007)

#4

(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #4)). Service Date 01/27/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/28/2007)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: 01/04/2007. Filed by Curran K Porto on behalf of Debtor Michael Dennis Stemnock. (Tara) (Entered: 01/25/2007)

#1

(#5) Notice of Deficient Filing. Missing Statement of Income and Means Test Calculation (related document(s)#1). Compliance required no later than 2/7/2007. (DELORES) (Entered: 01/26/2007)

99 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (related document(s) (Related Doc #108)). Service Date 02/24/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/25/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • DocketBankruptcy Case Closed. (Sherry) (Entered: 02/22/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) Final Decree. Signed on 2/22/2010 (Sherry) (Entered: 02/22/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) Final Account of Chapter 7 Trustee. The United States Trustee has reviewed the Final Account, Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application of Trustee to be Discharged. The United States Trustee does not object to the relief requested. (Burnette, Cynthia) (Entered: 02/20/2010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) Report of unclaimed Funds Filed by Lauren P. Greene. (Greene, Lauren) (Entered: 11/09/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (related document(s) (Related Doc #104)). Service Date 10/16/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/17/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) Amended Order Allowing Administrative Expenses Fees awarded to Lauren P. Greene in the amount of $, expenses awarded: $15.18; Awarded on 10/14/2009 (related document(s)#98, #96). Signed on 10/14/2009 (DELORES) (Entered: 10/14/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • Docket(#103) Approved Notice of Final Report - Chapter 7 Asset Closing . (DELORES) (Entered: 10/07/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) Certificate of Service Re: Trustee's Final Report and Application for Compensation Filed by Lauren P. Greene (related document(s)#101). (Greene, Lauren) (Entered: 08/05/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) Notice of Final Report of Trustee and Applications for Compensation (NFR) Filed by Lauren P. Greene. (Greene, Lauren) (Entered: 08/05/2009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on Behalf of eCAST Settlement Corporation. (Weisman, Gilbert) (Entered: 02/05/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #8)). Service Date 02/02/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/03/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/27/2007 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL (8-62) - Room 100-C, Timberlake Annex, 501 E. Polk Street. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 4/30/2007. (DELORES) (Entered: 01/31/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc #5)). Service Date 01/28/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/29/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #4)). Service Date 01/27/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/28/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Deficient Filing. Missing Statement of Income and Means Test Calculation (related document(s)#1). Compliance required no later than 2/7/2007. (DELORES) (Entered: 01/26/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/27/2007 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL (8-62) - Room 100-C, Timberlake Annex, 501 E. Polk Street. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 4/30/2007. (Tara) (Entered: 01/25/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: 01/04/2007. Filed by Curran K Porto on behalf of Debtor Michael Dennis Stemnock. (Tara) (Entered: 01/25/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2007
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Debtors Social Security Numbers Filed by Curran K Porto on behalf of Debtor Michael Dennis Stemnock. (Tara) (Entered: 01/25/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7. Filing Fee Paid. Schedules A-J and Summary of Schedules. Statement of Financial Affairs. Statement of Intentions. Disclosure of Compensation. Filed by Curran K Porto on behalf of Michael Dennis Stemnock. (Jankiewicz, Tara) Modified on 1/31/2007 (DELORES). (Entered: 01/25/2007)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant