This case was last updated from PACER on 11/01/2017 at 13:16:01 (UTC).

Zoila Esperanza Quintana

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 Zoila Esperanza Quintana was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Barry Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-BK-22211

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Barry Russell

 

Party Details

Debtor

Zoila Esperanza Quintana

Hawthorne, CA 90250

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Jason M Rund (TR)

El Segundo, CA 90245

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor, Us Trustee and Trustee Attorney

James M Meizlik

Attorney at Law Office of James M Meizlik

3250 Wilshire Blvd Ste 2003

Los Angeles, CA 90057

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/14/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 4, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 01/16/2018. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/16/2018 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

#15

(#15) Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

#14

(#14) Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Official Form 119) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

#13

(#13) Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Official Form 108) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

#12

(#12) Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

#11

(#11) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

#10

(#10) Attorney's Disclosure of Compensation Arrangement in Individual Chapter 7 Case (LBR Form F2090-1) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

#9

(#9) Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Official Form 106Dec) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Credit Counseling Zoila ESperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

#7

(#7) Exemption is not being requested. (Official Form 122A-1Supp) Zoila ESperanza Quintana, Statement of Financial Affairs for Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

6 #2

Pay Stubs

6 #1

Main Document

#5

(#5) Schedule E/F Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) Zoila Esperanza Quintana, Schedule G Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) Zoila Esperanza Quintana, Schedule H Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) Zoila Esperanza Quintana, Schedule I Individual: Your Income (Official Form 106I) Zoila Esperanza Quintana, Schedule J: Your Expenses (Official Form 106J) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

#4

(#4) Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) Zoila Esperanza Quintana, Schedule A/B Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) Zoila Esperanza Quintana, Schedule C: The Property You Claimed as Exempt (Official Form 106C) Zoila Esperanza Quintana, Schedule D Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals Zoila Esperanza Quintana. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Zoila Esperanza Quintana (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/14/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 4, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 01/16/2018. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/16/2018 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Bankruptcy Petition Preparer's Notice, Declaration, and Signature (Official Form 119) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Official Form 108) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Attorney's Disclosure of Compensation Arrangement in Individual Chapter 7 Case (LBR Form F2090-1) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Official Form 106Dec) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Credit Counseling Zoila ESperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Exemption is not being requested. (Official Form 122A-1Supp) Zoila ESperanza Quintana, Statement of Financial Affairs for Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Attachments: #1 Pay Stubs) (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Schedule E/F Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) Zoila Esperanza Quintana, Schedule G Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) Zoila Esperanza Quintana, Schedule H Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) Zoila Esperanza Quintana, Schedule I Individual: Your Income (Official Form 106I) Zoila Esperanza Quintana, Schedule J: Your Expenses (Official Form 106J) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) Zoila Esperanza Quintana, Schedule A/B Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) Zoila Esperanza Quintana, Schedule C: The Property You Claimed as Exempt (Official Form 106C) Zoila Esperanza Quintana, Schedule D Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) Zoila Esperanza Quintana Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Debtor's Request to Activate Electronic Noticing (DeBN) Filed by Debtor Zoila Esperanza Quintana. (Meizlik, James).WARNING: Item subsequently amended by docket entry #16 Modified on 10/5/2017 (Alcala, Maria). (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:17-bk-22211) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45709157. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals Zoila Esperanza Quintana. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Zoila Esperanza Quintana (Meizlik, James) (Entered: 10/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less