This case was last updated from PACER on 12/18/2019 at 21:31:58 (UTC).

Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2018 Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, New York Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Stuart M. Bernstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-BK-13648

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Stuart M. Bernstein

 

Party Details

Debtor

Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.

Not Classified By Court

Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent

2335 Alaska Avenue

El Segundo, CA 90245

Us Trustee

United States Trustee

U.S. Federal Office Building, 201 Varick Street, Room 1006

New York, NY 10014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Gary Holtzer

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Kelly DiBlasi

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Robert J. Lemons

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges, LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Richard A. Graham

Attorney at White & Case, LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Michael Smith

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Us Trustee Attorney

Richard C. Morrissey

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Trustee

201 Varick Street, Room 1006

New York, NY 10014

 

Court Documents

#1027

(#1027) Affidavit of Service re: Certificate of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. 1746 Regarding Motion of the Debtors for Entry of a Final Decree Closing Certain of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases (related document(s)#1024) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#1026

(#1026) Notice of Hearing / Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Scheduled for December 17, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (related document(s)#822, #1007, #979) filed by Kelly DiBlasi on behalf of Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.. (DiBlasi, Kelly) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#1024

(#1024) Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 / Certificate of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. 1746 Regarding Motion of the Debtors for Entry of a Final Decree Closing Certain of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases (related document(s)#1007) Filed by Kelly DiBlasi on behalf of Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.. (DiBlasi, Kelly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#1007

(#1024) Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 / Certificate of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. 1746 Regarding Motion of the Debtors for Entry of a Final Decree Closing Certain of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases (related document(s)#1007) Filed by Kelly DiBlasi on behalf of Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.. (DiBlasi, Kelly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#979

(#1026) Notice of Hearing / Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Scheduled for December 17, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (related document(s)#822, #1007, #979) filed by Kelly DiBlasi on behalf of Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.. (DiBlasi, Kelly) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

822 #5

Exhibit D

822 #4

Exhibit C

822 #2

Exhibit A

822 #1

Main Document

#102

(#102) Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 / Certificate of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. 1746 Regarding Motion of Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a), 363, and 507 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 6003 and 6004 for Entry Final Order (I) Authorizing Debtors to (A) Pay Employee Obligations and (B) Continue Employee Benefit Programs, and (II) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Obligations (related document(s)#7) Filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#101

(#101) Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 / Certificate of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. 1746 Regarding Motion of Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105 for Entry of an Order Enforcing the Protections of 11 U.S.C. 362, 365, 525, and 541 (related document(s)#10) Filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#100

(#100) Notice of Hearing / Notice of Change of Time for the Hearing Scheduled for December 20, 2018 from 10:00 a.m. (EST) to 11:00 a.m. (EST) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 12/20/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#99

(#99) Affidavit of Service re Documents Served on December 13, 2018 (related document(s)#79, #84, #83, #78, #80, #85, #81, #77, #82) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#98

(#98) Notice of Appearance / Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents filed by Carey D. Schreiber on behalf of Ankura Trust Company, LLC. (Schreiber, Carey) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#97

(#97) Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing Scheduled for December 20, 2018 (related document(s)#76) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 12/15/2018)

#96

(#96) Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re Documents Served on December 11, 2018 (related document(s)#67, #66, #65, #64, #90) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 12/15/2018)

#95

(#95) Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re Motion of Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, 361, 362, 363, 364, 507, and 552, Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, 4001, 6003, 6004, and 9014, and L. Bankr. R. 2002-1, 4001-2, 9013-1, 9014-1, and 9014-2 for Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Senior Secured Priming Superpriority Postpetition Financing, (B) Grant Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status, and (C) Utilize Cash Collateral; (II) Granting Adequate Protection; (III) Scheduling Final Hearing; and (IV) Granting Related Relief (related document(s)#58, #51) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 12/15/2018)

#94

(#94) Affidavit of Service re Documents Served on December 11, 2018 (related document(s)#74, #75, #71, #70) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 12/15/2018)

1,189 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1027) Affidavit of Service re: Certificate of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. 1746 Regarding Motion of the Debtors for Entry of a Final Decree Closing Certain of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases (related document(s)#1024) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1026) Notice of Hearing / Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Scheduled for December 17, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (related document(s)#822, #1007, #979) filed by Kelly DiBlasi on behalf of Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.. (DiBlasi, Kelly) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1025) Order Signed On 12/13/2019 Re: Granting The Motion Of The Debtors For Entry Of A Final Decree Closing Certain Of The Debtors Chapter 11 Cases (Related Doc #1007) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1024) Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 / Certificate of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. 1746 Regarding Motion of the Debtors for Entry of a Final Decree Closing Certain of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases (related document(s)#1007) Filed by Kelly DiBlasi on behalf of Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.. (DiBlasi, Kelly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1023) Adversary case 19-01448. Complaint against SunTrust Bank, MUFG Union Bank, N.A., Deutsche Bank AG, New York Branch, Barclays Bank PLC, Goldman Sachs Bank USA (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of William Transier, as Plan Administrator for Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd. and its Affiliated Debtors. (Sirota, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1022) Affidavit of Service re: 1) Order Granting Interim and Final Application of KPMG Ireland for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred; and 2) Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Scheduled for December 5, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (related document(s)#1019, #1018) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1021) Affidavit of Service re: 1) Notice of Agenda for Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 5, 2019 at 10:00 a.m.; 2) Certificate of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. 1746 Regarding Interim and Final Fee Application of KPMG Ireland; and 3) Order Granting Interim and Final Application of Watson Farley & Williams LLP for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred (related document(s)#1016, #1017, #1015) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1020) Affidavit of Service re: Certificate of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. 1746 Regarding Interim and Final Fee Application of Watson Farley & Williams LLP (related document(s)#1014) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1019) Notice of Hearing / Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Scheduled for December 5, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (related document(s)#956, #996) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1018) Order signed on 12/3/2019 Granting Interim and Final Application of KPMG Ireland for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred(Related Doc #956)for KPMG, fees awarded: $607,611.63, expense awarded: $0.00. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
903 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 / Certificate of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. 1746 Regarding Motion of Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a), 345(b), 363(c), 364(a), and 503(b) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 6003 and 6004 for Entry of Final Order (I) Authorizing Debtors to (A) Continue Existing Cash Management System, (B) Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations Related to the Use Thereof, and (C) Continue Intercompany Transactions and Provide Administrative Expense Priority for Postpetition Intercompany Claims; (II) Extending Time to Comply with 11 U.S.C. 345(b); and (III) Granting Related Relief (related document(s)#13) Filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 / Certificate of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. 1746 Regarding Motion of Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a), 363, and 507 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 6003 and 6004 for Entry Final Order (I) Authorizing Debtors to (A) Pay Employee Obligations and (B) Continue Employee Benefit Programs, and (II) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related to Such Obligations (related document(s)#7) Filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 / Certificate of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. 1746 Regarding Motion of Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105 for Entry of an Order Enforcing the Protections of 11 U.S.C. 362, 365, 525, and 541 (related document(s)#10) Filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) Notice of Hearing / Notice of Change of Time for the Hearing Scheduled for December 20, 2018 from 10:00 a.m. (EST) to 11:00 a.m. (EST) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Waypoint Leasing Holdings Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 12/20/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) Affidavit of Service re Documents Served on December 13, 2018 (related document(s)#79, #84, #83, #78, #80, #85, #81, #77, #82) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) Notice of Appearance / Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents filed by Carey D. Schreiber on behalf of Ankura Trust Company, LLC. (Schreiber, Carey) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing Scheduled for December 20, 2018 (related document(s)#76) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 12/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re Documents Served on December 11, 2018 (related document(s)#67, #66, #65, #64, #90) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 12/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re Motion of Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, 361, 362, 363, 364, 507, and 552, Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, 4001, 6003, 6004, and 9014, and L. Bankr. R. 2002-1, 4001-2, 9013-1, 9014-1, and 9014-2 for Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Senior Secured Priming Superpriority Postpetition Financing, (B) Grant Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status, and (C) Utilize Cash Collateral; (II) Granting Adequate Protection; (III) Scheduling Final Hearing; and (IV) Granting Related Relief (related document(s)#58, #51) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 12/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) Affidavit of Service re Documents Served on December 11, 2018 (related document(s)#74, #75, #71, #70) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent.(Kass, Albert) (Entered: 12/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard C. Morrissey