This case was last updated from PACER on 09/24/2021 at 13:11:49 (UTC).

Venture Investments Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 Venture Investments Group, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory L. Taddonio. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-BK-22561

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory L. Taddonio

 

Party Details

Debtor

Venture Investments Group, Inc.

Po Box 101072

Pittsburgh, PA 15237

Trustee

Natalie Lutz Cardiello

Carnegie, PA 15106

Us Trustee

Office of the United States Trustee

1001 Liberty Avenue, Suite 970

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Christopher M. Frye

Attorney at Steidl & Steinberg

Suite 2830 Gulf Tower, 707 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Trustee Attorney

Natalie Lutz Cardiello

107 Huron Drive

Carnegie, PA 15106

Us Trustee Attorney

Larry E. Wahlquist

Attorney at U.S. Trustee Program/Dept. of Justice

1001 Liberty Avenue, Suite 970

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

204 #2

Final Decree: Notice Recipients

204 #1

Final Decree

#203

(#203) The United States Trustee has reviewed the Chapter 7 Trustees Final Account, Certification the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application of Trustee to be Discharged. The United States Trustee does not object to the relief requested. Filed on the behalf of U.S. Trustee. Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. (on Behalf of the United States Trustee by, Joseph S. Sisca,) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#201

(#201) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): #197 Order of Distribution filed by Trustee Natalie Lutz Cardiello). Notice Date 11/27/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/28/2019)

#200

(#200) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): #196 Order on Application for Compensation). Notice Date 11/27/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/28/2019)

197 #2

BNC PDF Notice: Notice Recipients

197 #1

Main Document

196 #2

BNC PDF Notice: Notice Recipients

196 #1

Main Document

5 #9

Proposed Order

5 #7

Exhibit F

5 #6

Exhibit E

5 #4

Exhibit C

5 #2

Exhibit A

5 #1

Main Document

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Larry E. Wahlquist Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the United States Trustee (Wahlquist, Larry) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor Venture Investments Group, Inc. (Frye, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

#1

(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Venture Investments Group, Inc. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/24/2018. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 07/10/2018. Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/24/2018. Disclosure Statement due by 10/24/2018. Atty Disclosure Statement due 07/10/2018. Declaration of Schedules due 07/10/2018. Employee Income Record or a statement that there is no record due by 07/10/2018. Schedule A/B due 07/10/2018. Schedule D due 07/10/2018. Schedule E/F due 07/10/2018. Schedule G due 07/10/2018. Schedule H due 07/10/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 07/10/2018. Summary of schedules due 07/10/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 07/10/2018. (Frye, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

403 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#205) Bankruptcy Case Closed. (bsil) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#204) Final Decree Signed on 2/25/2020. (bsil) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#203) The United States Trustee has reviewed the Chapter 7 Trustees Final Account, Certification the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application of Trustee to be Discharged. The United States Trustee does not object to the relief requested. Filed on the behalf of U.S. Trustee. Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. (on Behalf of the United States Trustee by, Joseph S. Sisca,) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket(#202) Trustee hereby certifies that in accordance with Fed.R.Bankr.P. 5005(b)(2) the original zero balance bank statements, all other original bank statements received since the Trustee's Final Report and Account, and all cancelled checks received since the Trustee's Final Report and Account for the above-captioned case were forwarded to the Office of the United States Trustee at 970 Liberty Center, Pittsburgh, PA 15222 on 01/29/20. Filed by Natalie Lutz Cardiello. (Cardiello, Natalie) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#201) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): #197 Order of Distribution filed by Trustee Natalie Lutz Cardiello). Notice Date 11/27/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#200) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): #196 Order on Application for Compensation). Notice Date 11/27/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#199) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): #195 Order on Application for Compensation). Notice Date 11/27/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#198) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s): #194 Order on Application for Compensation). Notice Date 11/27/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#197) Default Order of Distribution Signed on 11/25/2019. (bsil) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#196) Default Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc #190) Granting for Natalie Lutz Cardiello, fees awarded: $2177.50, expenses awarded: $0.00 Signed on 11/25/2019. (bsil) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
185 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Order RE: Motion to Allow Debtor to Pay Pre-Existing Employee Wages Filed by Debtor Venture Investments Group, Inc. (RE: related document(s): #7 Application for Approval filed by Debtor Venture Investments Group, Inc.). (Frye, Christopher) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Order RE: Motion to Allow Debtor to Use Existing Bank Accounts Filed by Debtor Venture Investments Group, Inc. (RE: related document(s): #6 Application for Approval filed by Debtor Venture Investments Group, Inc.). (Frye, Christopher) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Order RE: Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Venture Investments Group, Inc. (RE: related document(s): #5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Venture Investments Group, Inc.). (Frye, Christopher) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Expedited Application for Approval for Debtor to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Wages Together with Request for Expedited Hearing Filed by Debtor Venture Investments Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Proposed Order) (Frye, Christopher) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Expedited Application for Approval for Debtor to Use Existing Bank Accounts Together with Request for Expedited Hearing Filed by Debtor Venture Investments Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Frye, Christopher) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Expedited Motion to Use Cash Collateral Together with Request for Expedited Hearing Filed by Debtor Venture Investments Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F #7 Exhibit G #8 Proposed Order) (Frye, Christopher) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Docket(#4) Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11(18-22561) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 13820899, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Larry E. Wahlquist Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the United States Trustee (Wahlquist, Larry) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor Venture Investments Group, Inc. (Frye, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Venture Investments Group, Inc. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/24/2018. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 07/10/2018. Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/24/2018. Disclosure Statement due by 10/24/2018. Atty Disclosure Statement due 07/10/2018. Declaration of Schedules due 07/10/2018. Employee Income Record or a statement that there is no record due by 07/10/2018. Schedule A/B due 07/10/2018. Schedule D due 07/10/2018. Schedule E/F due 07/10/2018. Schedule G due 07/10/2018. Schedule H due 07/10/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 07/10/2018. Summary of schedules due 07/10/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 07/10/2018. (Frye, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURE INVESTMENT GROUP VIG LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry E. Wahlquist