This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 03/15/2019 at 18:03:49 (UTC).

USA Gymnastics

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 USA Gymnastics was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Indiana Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Robyn L. Moberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-BK-09108

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Robyn L. Moberly

 

Party Details

Debtor

USA Gymnastics

130 E. Washington Street, Suite 700

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Not Classified By Court

Tort Claimants Committee

Omni Management Group, Inc.

5955 De Soto Avenue, Suite 100

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Us Trustee

U.S. Trustee

101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Gregory Michael Gotwald

Attorney at Plews Shadley Racher Braun LLP

1346 N. Delaware Strett

Indianapolis, IN 46202-2415

Steven Baldwin

Attorney at Plews Shadley Racher Braun LLP

1346 N. Delaware Street

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Catherine L. Steege

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

John Thomas Piggins

Attorney at Miller Johnson

45 Ottawa Avenue, Sw, Suite 1100, Po Box 306

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0306

Dean Panos

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N. Clark St.

Chicago, IL 60654

Melissa M. Root

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Ilan D Scharf

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

780 Third Avenue, Ste 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Steven W Golden

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

780 Third Avenue, Ste 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Deborah Caruso

Attorney at Rubin & Levin, P.C.

135 N. Pennsylvania St, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Meredith R. Theisen

Attorney at Rubin & Levin, P.C.

135 N. Pennsylvania St., Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kenneth H. Brown

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

150 California Street, 15Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

James I. Stang

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd., Ste 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Us Trustee Attorneys

Ronald J. Moore

Attorney at Office of U.S. Trustee

101 W Ohio St Ste 1000

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Laura A DuVall

Attorney at Office of U.S. Trustee

101 West Ohio Street Suite 1000

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#343

#342

#341

#340

339 #2

Ntc of Deficient Filing (Misc.: Notice Recipients

339 #1

Ntc of Deficient Filing (Misc.

338 #1

Main Document

#337

#301

289 #3

Exhibit B - January 2019 Invoice

289 #2

Exhibit A - December 2018 Invoice

289 #1

Main Document

#288

286 #3

Exhibit Ex. B - January 2019 Invoice

286 #2

Exhibit Ex. A - December 2018 Invoice

286 #1

Main Document

#285

#284

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#343) Appearance filed by John R. Humphrey on behalf of Creditor Stephen D. Penny Jr. (Humphrey, John) (Entered: 03/14/2019) #

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#342) Appearance filed by Michael P. O'Neil on behalf of Creditor Stephen D. Penny Jr. (O'Neil, Michael) (Entered: 03/14/2019) #

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#341) Certificate of Service re: Order Setting Deadline for Filing Proof of Claim or Interest, filed by Noticing Agent on behalf of Debtor USA Gymnastics (re: Doc #301). (Ewing, Scott) (Entered: 03/13/2019) #

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#340) Declaration re: Amended Schedule(s) filed by Catherine L. Steege on behalf of Debtor USA Gymnastics (re: Doc #337). (Steege, Catherine) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#339) Deficiency Notice Issued re: Amended Schedule(s) (re: Doc #337). Deficiency to be cured by 3/26/2019. (jam) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#338) Amended Motion to Extend Time to Assume or Reject filed by Catherine L. Steege on behalf of Debtor USA Gymnastics (re: Doc #326). (Attachments: (1) Exhibit A) (Steege, Catherine) (Entered: 03/11/2019) #

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Amended Schedule(s)(# 18-09108-RLM-11) [misc,amdsch] (31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A29670956. Fee amount 31.00 (re: Doc #337). (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#337) Amended Schedule(s) G (parties added) filed by Catherine L. Steege on behalf of Debtor USA Gymnastics. (Steege, Catherine) (Entered: 03/11/2019) #

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#336) Certificate of Service re: Service List, filed by Noticing Agent on behalf of Debtor USA Gymnastics (re: Doc #328). (Ewing, Scott) (Entered: 03/11/2019) #

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#335) Certificate of Service re: Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period to File Ch 11 Plan/Disclosure Statement, Motion to Extend Time to Assume or Reject, Hearing Notice, filed by Noticing Agent on behalf of Debtor USA Gymnastics (re: Doc #325, #326, #332). (Ewing, Scott) (Entered: 03/11/2019) #

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#294) Order Granting Motion to Assume Executory Contract with Spencer Stuart (re: Doc #223). Attorney for the debtor must distribute this order. (jam) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#293) Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Order Extending Period Within Which It May Remove State Court Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1452 and Rule 9027 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (re: Doc #222). Attorney for the debtor must distribute this order. (jam) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#292) Certificate of Service re: Notice of Draw on Retainer/Payment of Fees or Expenses Pursuant to B-2014-1, filed by John Thomas Piggins on behalf of Debtor USA Gymnastics (re: Doc #288). (Piggins, John) (Entered: 02/25/2019) #

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#291) Request for Transcript filed by James I. Stang, Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Creditor Committee Tort Claimants Committee (re: Doc #287). (Theisen, Meredith) (Entered: 02/25/2019) #

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#290) Certificate of Service re: Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by James P Moloy on behalf of Interested Party Virginia Surety Company, Inc (re: Doc #278). (Moloy, James) (Entered: 02/24/2019) #

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#289) Notice of Draw on Retainer/Payment of Fees or Expenses Pursuant to Local Rule S.D.Ind. B-2014-1 RE: JENNER & BLOCK LLP, filed by Catherine L. Steege on behalf of Debtor USA Gymnastics. OBJECTIONS DUE MARCH 8, 2019 AT 4:00 PM(re: Doc #187). (Attachments: (1) Exhibit A - December 2018 Invoice (2) Exhibit B - January 2019 Invoice) (Steege, Catherine) CORRECTION: Missing docket text added in all capital letters. Modified on 2/25/2019. (jam) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#288) Notice of Draw on Retainer/Payment of Fees or Expenses Pursuant to Local Rule S.D.Ind. B-2014-1 RE: MILLER JOHNSON, filed by John Thomas Piggins on behalf of Debtor USA Gymnastics. OBJECTIONS DUE MARCH 5, 2019 (re: Doc #187). (Piggins, John) CORRECTION: Missing docket text added in all capital letters. Modified on 2/25/2019. (jam) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#286) Notice of Draw on Retainer/Payment of Fees or Expenses Pursuant to Local Rule S.D.Ind. B-2014-1 RE: PLEWS SHADLEY RACHER & BRAUN LLP, filed by Gregory Michael Gotwald on behalf of Debtor USA Gymnastics. OBJECTIONS DUE BY MARCH 7, 2019 AT 4:00 PM (re: Doc #187). (Attachments: (1) Exhibit Ex. A - December 2018 Invoice (2) Exhibit Ex. B - January 2019 Invoice) (Gotwald, Gregory) CORRECTION: Missing docket text added in all capital letters. Modified on 2/25/2019. (jam) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#285) U.S. Trustee 341 Meeting of Creditors Held. (DuVall, Laura) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#284) Appearance filed by Gregory Michael Gotwald on behalf of Debtor USA Gymnastics. (Gotwald, Gregory) (Entered: 02/22/2019) #

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Omni Management Group, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where USA Gymnastics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald J. Moore