This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:37:30 (UTC).

Tony Lopez, Sr and Nelida Aguilar

Case Summary

On 09/25/2017 Tony Lopez, Sr and Nelida Aguilar was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark D. Houle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:17-BK-18039

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Mark D. Houle

 

Party Details

Debtors

Tony Lopez, Sr

Barstow, CA 92311

Nelida Aguilar

Barstow, CA 92311

Trustees

Rod (MH) Danielson (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Rod Danielson (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

3801 University Avenue, Suite 720

Riverside, CA 92501-3200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Edgar P Lombera

1916 Orange Tree Lane, Suite 450G

Redlands, CA 92374

 

Court Documents

#12

No Description Available

#1

Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(6:17-bk-18039) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45646062. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

#8

(#8) Declaration RE Filing of Tax Returns and Payment of Domestic Support Obligations (Preconfirmation) Filed by Joint Debtor Nelida Aguilar, Debtor Tony Lopez Sr. (Lombera, Edgar) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

#18

No Description Available

#34

(#34) Proof of service Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#21

No Description Available

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor Nelida Aguilar, Debtor Tony Lopez Sr. (Lombera, Edgar) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

#7

(#7) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) Filed by Joint Debtor Nelida Aguilar, Debtor Tony Lopez Sr. (Lombera, Edgar) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

#9

(#29) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Both Debtors Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #26 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Mohammad, Sandy) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#11

No Description Available

#29

(#29) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Both Debtors Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #26 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Mohammad, Sandy) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#6

(#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Joint Debtor Nelida Aguilar, Debtor Tony Lopez Sr. (Lombera, Edgar) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

#16

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#3

(#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Joint Debtor Nelida Aguilar, Debtor Tony Lopez Sr. (Lombera, Edgar) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

#32

(#32) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#17

No Description Available

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • (#35) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Mason, Shari) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Proof of service Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#29 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 07/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Both Debtors Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #26 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Mohammad, Sandy) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Hearing Held granted - order by attorney (RE: related document(s)#26 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Mohammad, Sandy) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#26 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) The Hearing date is set for 7/23/2018 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 303, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Mark D. Houle (Sandoval, Rosanna) (Entered: 06/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case . (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 06/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Declaration RE Filing of Tax Returns and Payment of Domestic Support Obligations (Preconfirmation) Filed by Joint Debtor Nelida Aguilar, Debtor Tony Lopez Sr. (Lombera, Edgar) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) Filed by Joint Debtor Nelida Aguilar, Debtor Tony Lopez Sr. (Lombera, Edgar) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/02/2017 at 08:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/02/2017 at 12:30 PM at Crtrm 303, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 01/31/2018. (Lombera, Edgar) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(6:17-bk-18039) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45646062. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Joint Debtor Nelida Aguilar, Debtor Tony Lopez Sr. (Lombera, Edgar) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Joint Debtor Nelida Aguilar, Debtor Tony Lopez Sr. (Lombera, Edgar) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor Nelida Aguilar, Debtor Tony Lopez Sr. (Lombera, Edgar) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Joint Debtor Nelida Aguilar, Debtor Tony Lopez Sr. (Lombera, Edgar) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Joint Debtor Nelida Aguilar, Debtor Tony Lopez Sr. (Lombera, Edgar) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Tony Lopez Sr, Nelida Aguilar (Lombera, Edgar) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.