This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:53:55 (UTC).

Teresa C Iriarte

Case Summary

On 06/21/2018 Teresa C Iriarte was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent P. Zurzolo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-BK-17168

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent P. Zurzolo

 

Party Details

Debtor

Teresa C Iriarte

Palmdale, CA 93551

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Schild, Avi. (Schild, Avi) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

#12

(#12) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#11

(#11) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#10 ORDER and notice of dismissal for failure to file schedules, statements, and/or plan (CACB AutoDismiss) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/11/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

#10

(#10) Order and Notice of Dismissal for Failure to File Schedules, Statements, and/or Plan - DEBTOR Dismissed (BNC) (Fleming, Lachelle) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

#9

(#9) Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Requirements with proof of service. (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 06/28/2018)

#8

(#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Teresa C Iriarte) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/23/2018)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Teresa C Iriarte) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/23/2018)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 06/23/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/23/2018)

#5

(#5) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Smith, Valerie. (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Teresa C Iriarte . (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 06/21/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/26/2018 at 09:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 09/16/2019 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 08/30/2018. (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 06/21/2018)

1 #3

Case Com Def Notice

1 #2

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#1

Main Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) (Vandensteen, Nancy) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Schild, Avi. (Schild, Avi) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#10 ORDER and notice of dismissal for failure to file schedules, statements, and/or plan (CACB AutoDismiss) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/11/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Order and Notice of Dismissal for Failure to File Schedules, Statements, and/or Plan - DEBTOR Dismissed (BNC) (Fleming, Lachelle) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Requirements with proof of service. (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 06/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Teresa C Iriarte) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Teresa C Iriarte) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 06/23/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Smith, Valerie. (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Teresa C Iriarte Case Number #14-15301, Chapter 7 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 03/20/2014 , Dismissed for Other Reason on 06/13/2014; Case Number #17-17476, Chapter 13 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 06/20/2017 , Dismissed for Failure to File Information on 07/12/2017; Case Number #17-20246, Chapter 13 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 08/21/2017 , Dismissed for Other Reason on 11/02/2017.(Admin) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Receipt of Chapter 13 Filing Fee - $310.00 by 03. Receipt Number 20228172. (admin) (Entered: 06/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Teresa C Iriarte . (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 06/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Teresa C Iriarte . (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 06/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/26/2018 at 09:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 09/16/2019 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 08/30/2018. (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 06/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Teresa C Iriarte Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 7/5/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 7/5/2018. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 7/5/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 7/5/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 7/5/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 7/5/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 7/5/2018. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 7/5/2018. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 7/5/2018. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 7/5/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 7/5/2018. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 7/5/2018. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 7/5/2018. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 7/5/2018. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 7/5/2018. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 7/5/2018. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 7/5/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 7/5/2018. (Fierro, Viridiana) (Entered: 06/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less