This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2018 at 00:08:50 (UTC).

TCCB Investors, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/06/2017 TCCB Investors, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Theodor Albert. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:17-BK-13576

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Theodor Albert

 

Party Details

Debtor

TCCB Investors, LLC

3110 Newport Blvd.

Newport Beach, CA 92663

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SA)

411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4593

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Brian C Andrews

6496 Weathers Pl Ste 200

San Diego, CA 92121

John H Bauer

Attorney at Financial Relief Legal Advocates Inc.

1047 North Antonio Circle

Orange, CA 92869

Us Trustee Attorney

Michael J Hauser

411 W Fourth St Suite 7160

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4593

 

Court Documents

#1

Main Document

1 #2

Ntc of Case Deficient 521

#2

(#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor TCCB Investors, LLC. (Andrews, Brian) DEFICIENT FOR DEBTOR'S AND ATTORNEYS'S HOLOGRAPHIC SIGNATURES. Modified on 9/7/2017 (Roque, Jewell). (Entered: 09/06/2017)

#3

(#3) Proof of service Filed by Debtor TCCB Investors, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (Andrews, Brian) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

#4

(#4) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor TCCB Investors, LLC) (Roque, Jewell) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

#5

(#5) Request for special notice WITH PROOF OF SERVICE Filed by Creditor Plaza Bank. (Casselberry, Steven) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

#6

(#6) Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference for: October 25, 2017 at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom 5B, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Ronald Reagan Federal Building , 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701 (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # doc ) Signed on 9/7/2017 (Steinberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

#8

(#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor TCCB Investors, LLC) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/09/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/09/2017)

#159

(#159) Order Dismissing Case - Debtor Dismissed (BNC-PDF). Signed on 4/2/2018 (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor TCCB Investors, LLC, #11 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, 109 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, 123 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, 141 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued). (Deramus, Glenda) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

#162

(#162) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#159 Order Dismissing Case (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/04/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

#160

(#160) Notice of dismissal Re: Order Granting Motion To Dismiss Case Pursuant To 11 USC 1112(b) (BNC) (Deramus, Glenda) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

#161

(#161) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#160 Notice of dismissal (BNC)) No. of Notices: 21. Notice Date 04/04/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

#11

(#159) Order Dismissing Case - Debtor Dismissed (BNC-PDF). Signed on 4/2/2018 (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor TCCB Investors, LLC, #11 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, 109 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, 123 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, 141 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued). (Deramus, Glenda) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

#148

(#155) Reply to (related document(s): #148 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert Case To One Under Chapter 7 Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 1112(B); And, Request For Judgment For Quarterly Fees Due And Payable To The U.S. Trustee At The Time Of The Hearing; Declaration Of Marilyn Sorensen I filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA)) Filed by Debtor TCCB Investors, LLC (Bauer, John) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

#158

(#158) Notice of lodgment Re:Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1112(b) Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA) (RE: related document(s)#148 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert Case To One Under Chapter 7 Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 1112(B); And, Request For Judgment For Quarterly Fees Due And Payable To The U.S. Trustee At The Time Of The Hearing; Declaration Of Marilyn Sorensen In Support Thereof Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA).). (Hauser, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2018)

#155

(#155) Reply to (related document(s): #148 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert Case To One Under Chapter 7 Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 1112(B); And, Request For Judgment For Quarterly Fees Due And Payable To The U.S. Trustee At The Time Of The Hearing; Declaration Of Marilyn Sorensen I filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA)) Filed by Debtor TCCB Investors, LLC (Bauer, John) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

#154

(#154) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#152 Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/02/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

#152

(#154) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#152 Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/02/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

124 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2018
  • (#163) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing the above referenced case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the case is closed. (Daniels, Sally) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#162) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#159 Order Dismissing Case (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/04/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#161) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#160 Notice of dismissal (BNC)) No. of Notices: 21. Notice Date 04/04/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#160) Notice of dismissal Re: Order Granting Motion To Dismiss Case Pursuant To 11 USC 1112(b) (BNC) (Deramus, Glenda) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#159) Order Dismissing Case - Debtor Dismissed (BNC-PDF). Signed on 4/2/2018 (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor TCCB Investors, LLC, #11 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, 109 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, 123 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued, 141 Hearing (Bk Other) Continued). (Deramus, Glenda) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#158) Notice of lodgment Re:Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1112(b) Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA) (RE: related document(s)#148 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert Case To One Under Chapter 7 Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 1112(B); And, Request For Judgment For Quarterly Fees Due And Payable To The U.S. Trustee At The Time Of The Hearing; Declaration Of Marilyn Sorensen In Support Thereof Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA).). (Hauser, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#157) Hearing Held (Bk Motion) (RE: related document(s) #148 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert) - MOTION IS GRANTED. CASE IS DISMISSED. MOVANT TO SUBMIT ORDER. (Deramus, Glenda) (Entered: 03/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • (#156) Notice to Pay Court Costs Due Sent To: John H Bauer, Attorney for Debtor, Total Amount Due $0 . (Daniels, Sally) (Entered: 03/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#155) Reply to (related document(s): #148 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert Case To One Under Chapter 7 Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 1112(B); And, Request For Judgment For Quarterly Fees Due And Payable To The U.S. Trustee At The Time Of The Hearing; Declaration Of Marilyn Sorensen I filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA)) Filed by Debtor TCCB Investors, LLC (Bauer, John) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#154) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#152 Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/02/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
152 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor TCCB Investors, LLC) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/09/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Hearing Set RE: SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor TCCB Investors, LLC) Status hearing to be held on 10/25/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Steinberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference for: October 25, 2017 at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom 5B, U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Ronald Reagan Federal Building , 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701 (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # doc ) Signed on 9/7/2017 (Steinberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for special notice WITH PROOF OF SERVICE Filed by Creditor Plaza Bank. (Casselberry, Steven) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor TCCB Investors, LLC) (Roque, Jewell) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Judge Theodor Albert added to case, per affiliated case. 8:17-bk-13518-TA - Michael Todd Carson - Managing Member (signed this petition).Involvement of Judge Scott C Clarkson Terminated (Corona, Heidi) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proof of service Filed by Debtor TCCB Investors, LLC (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (Andrews, Brian) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:17-bk-13576) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45532628. Fee amount 1717.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor TCCB Investors, LLC. (Andrews, Brian) DEFICIENT FOR DEBTOR'S AND ATTORNEYS'S HOLOGRAPHIC SIGNATURES. Modified on 9/7/2017 (Roque, Jewell). (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by TCCB Investors, LLC Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 09/20/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 09/20/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 09/20/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 09/20/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 09/20/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 09/20/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 09/20/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 09/20/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 09/20/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 09/20/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 09/20/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 09/20/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 09/20/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 09/20/2017. (Andrews, Brian) WARNING: ADDITIONAL DEFICIENCIES INCLUDES ELECTRONIC FILING DECLARATION (missing holography signatures) due 9/20/2017. CORPORATE RESOLUTION due 9/20/2017. SUMMARY OF ASSETS AND LIABILITIES due 9/20/2017. LIST OF EQUITY SECURITY HOLDERS due 9/20/2017. DOCUMENTS TERMINATED THAT ARE NOT REQUIRED Schedules I, Schedules J and Declaration by Debtor re Employment Income. Modified on 9/7/2017 (Roque, Jewell). (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.