This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:36:53 (UTC).

Tawanda Evans

Case Summary

On 09/01/2017 Tawanda Evans was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent P. Zurzolo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-BK-20806

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent P. Zurzolo

 

Party Details

Debtor

Tawanda Evans

Loss Angeles, CA 90044-2303

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Renee E Sanders

Attorney at Law Offices of Renee Estelle Sanders

3450 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1215

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#1

Main Document

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) Certification About a Financial Management Course for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423) Filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans. (Sanders, Renee). Warning: Incorrect event used. Correct event code is: Certificate of Credit Counseling . Modified on 9/5/2017 (Ly, Lynn). Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2017 (Ly, Lynn). Certificate of Credit Counseling form has been uploaded correctly. Modified on 9/5/2017 (Ly, Lynn). (Entered: 09/01/2017)

#4

(#4) Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) , List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans. (Sanders, Renee) (Entered: 09/01/2017)

#5

(#5) Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . Case is deficient for Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 9/8/2017. (Ly, Lynn) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

#6

(#6) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) Case is also deficient for Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 09/15/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 09/15/2017. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans) (Ly, Lynn) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

#7

(#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/17/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/07/2019 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 01/16/2018. (admin, ) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

#8

(#8) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans. (Sanders, Renee) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

#82

(#82) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#81

(#81) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#80

(#80) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#79

(#79) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#78 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 07/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#78

(#78) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#50 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Pennington-Jones, Patricia) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#50

(#78) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#50 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Pennington-Jones, Patricia) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#77

(#77) Declaration Setting Forth Postpetition, Preconfirmation Payments On: 1. Deeds of Trust (or Mortgages), 2. Leases of Personal Property; 3. Purchase Money Security Liens on Personal Property and proof of service Filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans. (Sanders, Renee) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

#76

(#76) Declaration re: Declaration of Contribution to Chapter 13 Plan and Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans (RE: related document(s)#69 Amended Chapter 13 Plan). (Sanders, Renee) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

#69

(#75) Declaration re: Declaration of Contribution to Chapter 13 Plan and Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans (RE: related document(s)#69 Amended Chapter 13 Plan). (Sanders, Renee) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • (#83) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Ly, Lynn) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#78 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 07/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#50 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Pennington-Jones, Patricia) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) Declaration Setting Forth Postpetition, Preconfirmation Payments On: 1. Deeds of Trust (or Mortgages), 2. Leases of Personal Property; 3. Purchase Money Security Liens on Personal Property and proof of service Filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans. (Sanders, Renee) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) Declaration re: Declaration of Contribution to Chapter 13 Plan and Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans (RE: related document(s)#69 Amended Chapter 13 Plan). (Sanders, Renee) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) Declaration re: Declaration of Contribution to Chapter 13 Plan and Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans (RE: related document(s)#69 Amended Chapter 13 Plan). (Sanders, Renee) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT PDF IMMEDIATELY. (RE: related document(s)#71 Declaration filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans, #72 Declaration filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans) Correction: Proof of service Required (Jones, Phyllis R.) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/07/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans. (Sanders, Renee) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/17/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/07/2019 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 01/16/2018. (admin, ) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) Case is also deficient for Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 09/15/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 09/15/2017. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans) (Ly, Lynn) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . Case is deficient for Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 9/8/2017. (Ly, Lynn) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) , List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans. (Sanders, Renee) (Entered: 09/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certification About a Financial Management Course for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423) Filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans. (Sanders, Renee). Warning: Incorrect event used. Correct event code is: Certificate of Credit Counseling . Modified on 9/5/2017 (Ly, Lynn). Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2017 (Ly, Lynn). Certificate of Credit Counseling form has been uploaded correctly. Modified on 9/5/2017 (Ly, Lynn). (Entered: 09/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Tawanda Evans. (Sanders, Renee) (Entered: 09/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(2:17-bk-20806) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45513648. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Tawanda Evans Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 09/15/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 09/15/2017. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 09/15/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 09/15/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 09/15/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 09/15/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 09/15/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 09/15/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 09/15/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 09/15/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 09/15/2017. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 09/15/2017. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 09/15/2017. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 09/15/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 09/15/2017. (Sanders, Renee). Warning: Case also deficient for Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 09/15/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 09/15/2017. Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 9/8/2017. And Run Judge/Trustee assignment. Modified on 9/5/2017 (Ly, Lynn). (Entered: 09/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.