This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:47:25 (UTC).

Stacy Edward Haynes, Jr

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 Stacy Edward Haynes, Jr was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Wayne E. Johnson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-BK-14782

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Wayne E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Debtor

Stacy Edward Haynes, Jr

Sun City, CA 92585

Trustee

Rod Danielson (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

3801 University Avenue, Suite 720

Riverside, CA 92501-3200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Stephen S Smyth

Attorney at SW SMYTH LLP

4929 Wilshire Blvd Ste 690

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) Proof of service Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (WJ)) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#37

(#37) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (WJ)) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#36

(#36) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (WJ)) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#35

(#35) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Danielson (TR), Rod (WJ)) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#31

(#31) Document Hearing Held Re: Status conference regarding confirmation of the chapter 13 plan. Vacated. Case Dismissed 7-16-18. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Stacy Edward Haynes) (Jefferson, Angie) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#30

(#30) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#29 ORDER and Notice of arising from Ch 13 db'd req. for vol. dism. (11 U.S.C. Sec. 1307(b)) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 36. Notice Date 07/18/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#29

(#30) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#29 ORDER and Notice of arising from Ch 13 db'd req. for vol. dism. (11 U.S.C. Sec. 1307(b)) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 36. Notice Date 07/18/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#20

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#15

(#33) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#15 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) filed by Debtor Stacy Edward Haynes) Confirmation hearing to be held on 8/1/2018 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (Gooch, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

#14

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#8

(#8) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Smith, Valerie. (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

#4

(#4) Chapter 13 procedures order Signed on 6/5/2018 (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Stacy Edward Haynes). (Gooch, Yvonne) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

(#31) Document Hearing Held Re: Status conference regarding confirmation of the chapter 13 plan. Vacated. Case Dismissed 7-16-18. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Stacy Edward Haynes) (Jefferson, Angie) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (RE: related document(s)#15 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) filed by Debtor Stacy Edward Haynes) (Hawkinson, Susan) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Proof of service Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (WJ)) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (WJ)) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (WJ)) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Danielson (TR), Rod (WJ)) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Document - Hearing Held re confirmation of plan - case dismissed 7/16/18 (RE: related document(s)#15 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) filed by Debtor Stacy Edward Haynes) (Aguilar, Arleen) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#15 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) filed by Debtor Stacy Edward Haynes) Confirmation hearing to be held on 8/1/2018 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (Gooch, Yvonne) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Document / Hearing Held - vacated; rescheduling order entered 7-6-18; matter rescheduled from 1:30 P.M. to 3:30 P.M (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Stacy Edward Haynes) (Hawkinson, Susan) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Document Hearing Held Re: Status conference regarding confirmation of the chapter 13 plan. Vacated. Case Dismissed 7-16-18. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Stacy Edward Haynes) (Jefferson, Angie) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#29 ORDER and Notice of arising from Ch 13 db'd req. for vol. dism. (11 U.S.C. Sec. 1307(b)) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 36. Notice Date 07/18/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Smith, Valerie. (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules /statements recorded as deficient. THE PROPER DEFICIENCY HAS BEEN ISSUED. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Stacy Edward Haynes) (Jefferson, Angie) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Stacy Edward Haynes, Jr Case Number #14-55411, Chapter 13 filed in Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court on 09/30/2014 , Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 03/27/2018.(Admin) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Stacy Edward Haynes) Status hearing to be held on 7/18/2018 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Wayne E. Johnson (Gooch, Yvonne) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Chapter 13 procedures order Signed on 6/5/2018 (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Stacy Edward Haynes). (Gooch, Yvonne) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(6:18-bk-14782) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 47124646. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/18/2018 at 09:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 08/01/2018 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 304, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 08/14/2018. (Smyth, Stephen) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Stacy Edward Haynes Jr. (Smyth, Stephen) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Stacy Edward Haynes Jr. (Smyth, Stephen) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Stacy Edward Haynes Jr Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 06/19/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 06/19/2018. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 06/19/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 06/19/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 06/19/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 06/19/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 06/19/2018. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 06/19/2018. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 06/19/2018. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 06/19/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 06/19/2018. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 06/19/2018. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 06/19/2018. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 06/19/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 06/19/2018. (Smyth, Stephen)WARNING: Case Also Deficient for Means Calculation(Form 122C-2) due 06/19/2018. See docket entry no. 6 for corrective actions. Modified on 6/6/2018 (Jefferson, Angie). (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.