This case was last updated from PACER on 11/28/2018 at 11:26:14 (UTC).

Scott Dwain Brumett and Myra Lavette Brumett

Case Summary

On 07/31/2017 Scott Dwain Brumett and Myra Lavette Brumett was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent P. Zurzolo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-BK-19333

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent P. Zurzolo

 

Party Details

Debtors

Scott Dwain Brumett

Lancaster, CA 93535

Myra Lavette Brumett

Lancaster, CA 93535

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Gregory M Shanfeld

Attorney at Wadhwani & Shanfeld, a Prof Law Corp

15233 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1000

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

 

Court Documents

#17

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#37

(#37) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#13

No Description Available

#5

(#5) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor Myra Lavette Brumett, Debtor Scott Dwain Brumett. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

#10

No Description Available

#35

(#35) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#8

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#32

(#32) Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) With Proof of Service Filed by Joint Debtor Myra Lavette Brumett, Debtor Scott Dwain Brumett (RE: related document(s)#28 Application for Compensation in a "RARA" Chapter 13 Case in Which a Plan was Not Confirmed and The Case was Dismissed for Gregory M Shanfeld, Debtor's Attorney, Period: to, Fee: $3,500.00, Expenses: $.). (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#4

(#4) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Joint Debtor Myra Lavette Brumett, Debtor Scott Dwain Brumett. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

#16

No Description Available

#36

(#36) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#28

(#29) Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)) with proof of service Filed by Joint Debtor Myra Lavette Brumett, Debtor Scott Dwain Brumett (RE: related document(s)#28 Application for Compensation in a "RARA" Chapter 13 Case in Which a Plan was Not Confirmed and The Case was Dismissed for Gregory M Shanfeld, Debtor's Attorney, Period: to, Fee: $3,500.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Attorney Gregory M Shanfeld). (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#9

(#9) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/30/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/07/2019 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 11/28/2017. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

#3

(#3) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Joint Debtor Myra Lavette Brumett, Debtor Scott Dwain Brumett. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

#23

No Description Available

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • (#38) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Ly, Lynn) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#33 Order on Application for Compensation (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/08/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Order Granting Application of Attorney For Debtor For Allowance of Fees And Expenses Following Dismissal or Conversion of Chapter 13 Case Subject to a Rights And Responsibilities Agreement (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #28) for Gregory M Shanfeld, fees awarded: $3500.00, expenses awarded: $0 Signed on 9/6/2018. (Carranza, Shemainee) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) With Proof of Service Filed by Joint Debtor Myra Lavette Brumett, Debtor Scott Dwain Brumett (RE: related document(s)#28 Application for Compensation in a "RARA" Chapter 13 Case in Which a Plan was Not Confirmed and The Case was Dismissed for Gregory M Shanfeld, Debtor's Attorney, Period: to, Fee: $3,500.00, Expenses: $.). (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Proof of service (Amended to correct Proof of Service Form) Filed by Joint Debtor Myra Lavette Brumett, Debtor Scott Dwain Brumett (RE: related document(s)#28 Application for Compensation in a "RARA" Chapter 13 Case in Which a Plan was Not Confirmed and The Case was Dismissed for Gregory M Shanfeld, Debtor's Attorney, Period: to, Fee: $3,500.00, Expenses: $.). (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry. Proof of Service Not on Current Mandatory Form. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT PDF IMMEDIATELY. (RE: related document(s)#28 Application for Compensation filed by Debtor Scott Dwain Brumett, Joint Debtor Myra Lavette Brumett) (Carranza, Shemainee) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)) with proof of service Filed by Joint Debtor Myra Lavette Brumett, Debtor Scott Dwain Brumett (RE: related document(s)#28 Application for Compensation in a "RARA" Chapter 13 Case in Which a Plan was Not Confirmed and The Case was Dismissed for Gregory M Shanfeld, Debtor's Attorney, Period: to, Fee: $3,500.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Attorney Gregory M Shanfeld). (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors Scott Dwain Brumett and Myra Lavette Brumett Case Number #09-17530, Chapter 13 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 06/18/2009 , Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 08/10/2009; Case Number #12-33727, Chapter 7 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 07/10/2012 , Dismissed for Other Reason on 10/05/2012.(Admin) (Entered: 08/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/30/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/07/2019 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 11/28/2017. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(2:17-bk-19333) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45305550. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Joint Debtor Myra Lavette Brumett, Debtor Scott Dwain Brumett. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Joint Debtor Myra Lavette Brumett, Debtor Scott Dwain Brumett. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor Myra Lavette Brumett, Debtor Scott Dwain Brumett. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Joint Debtor Myra Lavette Brumett, Debtor Scott Dwain Brumett. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Joint Debtor Myra Lavette Brumett, Debtor Scott Dwain Brumett. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) Filed by Joint Debtor Myra Lavette Brumett, Debtor Scott Dwain Brumett. (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Scott Dwain Brumett, Myra Lavette Brumett (Shanfeld, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.