This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:48:44 (UTC).

Rosalba Flores Nava

Case Summary

On 06/12/2018 Rosalba Flores Nava was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine E. Bauer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-BK-12118

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Catherine E. Bauer

 

Party Details

Debtor

Rosalba Flores Nava

Santa Ana, CA 92703

Trustee

Amrane (SA) Cohen (TR)

Orange, CA 92868

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SA)

411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4593

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Proof of service Filed by (RE: related document(s)#13 Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)). (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA)) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#13

(#13) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA)) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#12

(#12) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) Filed by. (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA)) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#11

(#11) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA)) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

#10

(#10) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#7 ORDER and notice of dismissal for failure to file schedules, statements, and/or plan (CACB AutoDismiss) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/04/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/04/2018)

#9

(#9) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Zahradka, Robert. (Zahradka, Robert) (Entered: 07/03/2018)

#8

(#8) Trustee's Notice to the debtor(s) that the case may be dismiss or converted at the confirmation hearing (batch) . (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA)) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

#7

(#7) Order and Notice of Dismissal for Failure to File Schedules, Statements, and/or Plan - DEBTOR Dismissed (BNC) (Fleming, Lachelle) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Rosalba Flores Nava) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/14/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

#5

(#5) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Rosalba Flores Nava) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/14/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

#4

(#4) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 06/14/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/24/2018 at 09:00 AM at RM 1-154, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Confirmation hearing to be held on 09/20/2018 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Proof of Claim due by 08/21/2018. (Nguyen, Vi) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

1 #3

Case Com Def Notice

1 #2

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#1

Main Document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • (#15) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Le, James) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Proof of service Filed by (RE: related document(s)#13 Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)). (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA)) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA)) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) Filed by. (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA)) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA)) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#7 ORDER and notice of dismissal for failure to file schedules, statements, and/or plan (CACB AutoDismiss) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/04/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Zahradka, Robert. (Zahradka, Robert) (Entered: 07/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Trustee's Notice to the debtor(s) that the case may be dismiss or converted at the confirmation hearing (batch) . (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA)) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order and Notice of Dismissal for Failure to File Schedules, Statements, and/or Plan - DEBTOR Dismissed (BNC) (Fleming, Lachelle) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Rosalba Flores Nava) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/14/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Rosalba Flores Nava) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/14/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 06/14/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Receipt of Chapter 13 Filing Fee - $310.00 by 16. Receipt Number 80071537. (admin) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Rosalba Flores Nava . (Nguyen, Vi) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/24/2018 at 09:00 AM at RM 1-154, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Confirmation hearing to be held on 09/20/2018 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Proof of Claim due by 08/21/2018. (Nguyen, Vi) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Rosalba Flores Nava Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 6/26/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 6/26/2018. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 6/26/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 6/26/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 6/26/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 6/26/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 6/26/2018. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 6/26/2018. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 6/26/2018. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 6/26/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 6/26/2018. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 6/26/2018. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 6/26/2018. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 6/26/2018. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 6/26/2018. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 6/26/2018. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 6/26/2018. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 6/26/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 6/26/2018. (Nguyen, Vi) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.