This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:40:04 (UTC).

Rosa M Mezquita

Case Summary

On 02/02/2018 Rosa M Mezquita was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent P. Zurzolo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-BK-11174

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent P. Zurzolo

 

Party Details

Debtor

Rosa M Mezquita

Los Angeles, CA 90040

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

William W Tiffany

5801 E Washington Blvd Ste 101

Commerce, CA 90040

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#32

(#32) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#31

(#31) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#30

(#30) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#29 ORDER and Notice of arising from Ch 13 db'd req. for vol. dism. (11 U.S.C. Sec. 1307(b)) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 07/13/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

#29

(#29) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from debtor's request for voluntary dismissal of chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307(b)) - Debtor Dismissed. (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#4 Meeting (RE: Related document(s)#26). (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) (Johnson, Tina R.) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

#26

(#26) Debtor's Request for Voluntary Dismissal of Ch 13 Case Filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita. (Tiffany, William) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

#25

(#25) Objection to Confirmation of Plan (Amended Plan) Filed by Creditor Trinity Financial Services LLC (RE: related document(s)#21 Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita (RE: related document(s)#14 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) Filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Rosa M Mezquita Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 02/16/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 02/16/2018. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 02/16/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 02/16/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 02/16/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 02/16/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 02/16/2018. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 02/16/2018. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 02/16/2018. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 02/16/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 02/16/2018. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 02/16/2018. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 02/16/2018. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 02/16/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 02/16/2018.).).). (Garcia-Salgado, Rafael) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

#21

(#25) Objection to Confirmation of Plan (Amended Plan) Filed by Creditor Trinity Financial Services LLC (RE: related document(s)#21 Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita (RE: related document(s)#14 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) Filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Rosa M Mezquita Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 02/16/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 02/16/2018. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 02/16/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 02/16/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 02/16/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 02/16/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 02/16/2018. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 02/16/2018. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 02/16/2018. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 02/16/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 02/16/2018. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 02/16/2018. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 02/16/2018. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 02/16/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 02/16/2018.).).). (Garcia-Salgado, Rafael) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

#14

(#25) Objection to Confirmation of Plan (Amended Plan) Filed by Creditor Trinity Financial Services LLC (RE: related document(s)#21 Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita (RE: related document(s)#14 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) Filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Rosa M Mezquita Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 02/16/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 02/16/2018. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 02/16/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 02/16/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 02/16/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 02/16/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 02/16/2018. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 02/16/2018. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 02/16/2018. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 02/16/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 02/16/2018. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 02/16/2018. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 02/16/2018. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 02/16/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 02/16/2018.).).). (Garcia-Salgado, Rafael) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/04/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2018)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#4 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 02/04/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2018)

#5

(#5) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Smith, Valerie. (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 02/04/2018)

#4

(#29) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from debtor's request for voluntary dismissal of chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307(b)) - Debtor Dismissed. (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#4 Meeting (RE: Related document(s)#26). (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) (Johnson, Tina R.) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita. (Tiffany, William) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

1 #3

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

#1

Main Document

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • (#34) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Ly, Lynn) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#29 ORDER and Notice of arising from Ch 13 db'd req. for vol. dism. (11 U.S.C. Sec. 1307(b)) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 07/13/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from debtor's request for voluntary dismissal of chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307(b)) - Debtor Dismissed. (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#4 Meeting (RE: Related document(s)#26). (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) (Johnson, Tina R.) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Debtor's Request for Voluntary Dismissal of Ch 13 Case Filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita. (Tiffany, William) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Objection to Confirmation of Plan (Amended Plan) Filed by Creditor Trinity Financial Services LLC (RE: related document(s)#21 Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita (RE: related document(s)#14 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) Filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Rosa M Mezquita Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 02/16/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 02/16/2018. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 02/16/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 02/16/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 02/16/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 02/16/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 02/16/2018. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 02/16/2018. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 02/16/2018. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 02/16/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 02/16/2018. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 02/16/2018. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 02/16/2018. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 02/16/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 02/16/2018.).).). (Garcia-Salgado, Rafael) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#23 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Auto VAN-105) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Auto VAN-105) (BNC). (AutoDocket, User) (Entered: 04/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(2:18-bk-11174) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 46402431. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Rosa M Mezquita Case Number #11-21135, Chapter 7 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 03/15/2011 , Standard Discharge on 07/18/2011.(Admin) (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/04/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/04/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#4 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 02/04/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Smith, Valerie. (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 02/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/08/2018 at 09:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 05/13/2019 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 04/13/2018. (Tiffany, William) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita. (Tiffany, William) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Rosa M Mezquita. (Tiffany, William) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Rosa M Mezquita Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 02/16/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 02/16/2018. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 02/16/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 02/16/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 02/16/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 02/16/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 02/16/2018. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 02/16/2018. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 02/16/2018. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 02/16/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 02/16/2018. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 02/16/2018. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 02/16/2018. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 02/16/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 02/16/2018. (Tiffany, William) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less