This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 06/28/2022 at 06:32:40 (UTC).

Reagor-Dykes Motors, LP

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 Reagor-Dykes Motors, LP was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Northern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert L. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-BK-50214

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Robert L. Jones

 

Party Details

Debtor

Reagor-Dykes Motors, LP

1215 Ave. J

Lubbock, TX 79401

Trustee

Dennis S. Faulkner

Dallas, TX 75201

Us Trustee

United States Trustee

1100 Commerce Street, Room 976

Dallas, TX 75242

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor and Trustee Attorneys

Emily Frances Shanks

Attorney at Foley Gardere/Foley & Lardner, LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Melina Bales

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 2000

Dallas, TX 75201

Brad W. Odell

Attorney at Mullin Hoard & Brown, L.L.P.

P.O. Box 2585

Lubbock, TX 79408

Thomas C. Scannell

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Ste. 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Andrew R. Seger

Attorney at The Seger Firm, P.C.

P.O. Box 98433

Lubbock, TX 79406

Stricklin Law Firm, P.C.

Bracewell LLP

Attorney at Bradley J Benoit

711 Louisiana Street, Suite 2300

Houston, TX 77002-2770

C. Ashley Ellis

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

2021 Mckinney Ave., Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Foley Gardere

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suiute 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Marcus Alan Helt

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

2501 North Harwood Street, Suite 1900

Dallas, TX 75201

Andrew S. Hicks

Attorney at Schiffer Hicks Johnson, PLLC

700 Louisiana Street, Suite 2650

Houston, TX 77002

David R. Langston

Attorney at Mullin, Hoard & Brown

P.O. Box 2585

Lubbock, TX 79408-2585

The Consortium Law Firms

Russell Hale Neilson

Attorney at Parkins Lee & Rubio LLP

700 Milam St, Suite 1300

Houston, TX 77002

Us Trustee Attorney

Stephen McKitt

Attorney at United States Trustees

1100 Commerce Street, Room 976

Dallas, TX 75242

 

Court Documents

#2631

(#2631) Notice of Agenda for hearings on June 22, 2022 filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner (RE: related document(s)#2287 Objection to claim(s) of Creditor(s) Sixth Omnibus Objection.. Filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner. Responses due by 12/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Ellis, C.) Modified to reopen for hearing on 2/17/2022 (Bibbs-Samuels, P.)., #2453 Omnibus Objection to claim(s) of Creditor(s) Seventeenth Omnibus Objection: Consumer Claims.. Filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner. Responses due by 3/11/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #2459 Objection to claim(s) of Creditor(s) Daniel Semisi and Sam Fehoko.. Filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner. Responses due by 3/14/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)). (Ellis, C.)

2459 #2

Proposed Order

2459 #1

Main Document

2453 #4

Proposed Order

2453 #3

Exhibit B

2453 #2

Exhibit A

2453 #1

Main Document

2287 #2

Proposed Order

2287 #1

Main Document

#8

7 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

7 #1

Main Document

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

3,067 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2631) Notice of Agenda for hearings on June 22, 2022 filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner (RE: related document(s)#2287 Objection to claim(s) of Creditor(s) Sixth Omnibus Objection.. Filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner. Responses due by 12/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Ellis, C.) Modified to reopen for hearing on 2/17/2022 (Bibbs-Samuels, P.)., #2453 Omnibus Objection to claim(s) of Creditor(s) Seventeenth Omnibus Objection: Consumer Claims.. Filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner. Responses due by 3/11/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order), #2459 Objection to claim(s) of Creditor(s) Daniel Semisi and Sam Fehoko.. Filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner. Responses due by 3/14/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)). (Ellis, C.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2630) Support/supplemental document filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., Online Vehicle Exchange, L.L.C. (RE: related document(s)#2425 Response to objection to claim). (Davidson, Benjamin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2629) Certificate of service re: Agreed Order Regarding Reagor-Dykes Auto Group Creditors Liquidating Trusts Objection to Claims of Coin Data LLC, Reyna Capital Corporation, The Reynolds and Reynolds Company, and Keyrak, Inc. (Docket No. 2620) and Notice of Hearing (Status Conference) (Docket No. 2625) Filed by Claims Agent Stretto (related document(s)#2620 Order regarding objection to claim number(s) (RE: related document(s)#2360 Objection to claim filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner). Entered on 6/9/2022 (Bibbs-Samuels, P.), #2625 Notice of hearing (Status Conference) filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner (RE: related document(s)#2453 Omnibus Objection to claim(s) of Creditor(s) Seventeenth Omnibus Objection: Consumer Claims.. Filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner. Responses due by 3/11/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order)). Hearing to be held on 6/22/2022 at 01:30 PM VIDEO CONFERENCE for #2453, Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2022 at 01:30 PM VIDEO CONFERENCE. filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner). (Vandell, Travis)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2628) Withdrawal of claim(s): 143 Filed by Creditor Sam Fehoko. (Bustos, Fernando)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2627) BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#2623 Order regarding objection to claim number(s) (RE: related document(s)#2394 Objection to claim filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner). Entered on 6/9/2022 (Bibbs-Samuels, P.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/11/2022. (Admin.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2626) BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. (RE: related document(s)#2621 Order regarding objection to claim number(s) (RE: related document(s)#2360 Objection to claim filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner). Entered on 6/9/2022 (Bibbs-Samuels, P.)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/11/2022. (Admin.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2625) Notice of hearing (Status Conference) filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner (RE: related document(s)#2453 Omnibus Objection to claim(s) of Creditor(s) Seventeenth Omnibus Objection: Consumer Claims.. Filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner. Responses due by 3/11/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order)). Hearing to be held on 6/22/2022 at 01:30 PM VIDEO CONFERENCE for #2453, Status Conference to be held on 6/22/2022 at 01:30 PM VIDEO CONFERENCE. (Shanks, Emily)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2624) Support/supplemental document filed by Manheim Remarketing, Inc., Online Vehicle Exchange, L.L.C. (RE: related document(s)#2425 Response to objection to claim). (Davidson, Benjamin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2623) Order regarding objection to claim number(s) (RE: related document(s)#2394 Objection to claim filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner). Entered on 6/9/2022 (Bibbs-Samuels, P.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2622) Order regarding objection to claim number(s) (RE: related document(s)#2394 Objection to claim filed by Trustee Dennis S. Faulkner). Entered on 6/9/2022 (Bibbs-Samuels, P.)

    Read MoreRead Less
2,769 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to use cash collateral (Emergency) Filed by Debtor Reagor-Dykes Motors, LP (Langston, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice(18-50214-rlj11) [motion,mprohac] ( 25.00). Receipt number 25496944, amount $ 25.00 (re: Doc#7). (U.S. Treasury)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to appear pro hac vice for Jimmy D. Parrish. Fee Amount $25 Filed by Creditor Gulf States Toyota, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Parrish, Jimmy)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Donald Hogan Cram III filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Cram, Donald)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Laura Jane Monroe filed by Creditor Lubbock Central Appraisal District. (Monroe, Laura)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by John F. Massouh filed by Creditor FirstCapital Bank of Texas. (Massouh, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Papers by Brandon Kevin Bains filed by Interested Party Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC. (Bains, Brandon)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 8/15/2018. Schedule D due 8/15/2018. Schedule E/F due 8/15/2018. Schedule G due 8/15/2018. Schedule H due 8/15/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 8/15/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 8/15/2018. Creditor matrix due 8/3/2018. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 8/3/2018. (Chambers, Deanna)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11)(18-50214-11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 25489150, amount $1717.00 (re: Doc#1). (U.S. Treasury)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Reagor-Dykes Motors, LP (Langston, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Reagor-Dykes Motors, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen McKitt