This case was last updated from PACER on 08/09/2019 at 17:24:07 (UTC).

Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 Randal D Haworth M D Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia W. Brand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-BK-16306

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Julia W. Brand

 

Party Details

Debtor

Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc.

465 N. Roxbury Drive, Suite 901

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Not Classified By Court

Proposed Attorneys for Official Committee of Creditors Holding Unsecured Claims, Proposed Attorneys for Official Committee of Creditors Holding Unsecured Claims

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Stella A Havkin

Attorney at Havkin & Shrago

5950 Canoga Avenue, Ste 400

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Us Trustee Attorney

Alvin Mar

915 Wilshire Boulevard, Ste 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Brian T Harvey

Attorney at Buchalter, A Professional Corporation

1000 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2457

 

Court Documents

#216

(#216) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#215 Order Approving Disclosure Statement (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/28/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/28/2019)

#215

(#215) Order Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Describing Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization and Setting Hearing on Confirmation of Plan (BNC-PDF) Signed on 7/26/2019 (RE: related document(s)#208 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc.). Confirmation hearing to be held on 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand Last day to Object to Confirmation 8/26/2019. (Vandensteen, Nancy) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#214

(#214) Statement Professional Fee Statement No. 8 for the month of July 2019 with proof of service Filed by Health Care Ombudsman Elliot M. Hirsh, MD. (Terzian, Tamar) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#213

(#213) Ombudsman Report for the period of 05/01/19 through 07/01/19 Filed by Health Care Ombudsman Elliot M. Hirsh, MD. (Terzian, Tamar) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#212

(#212) Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 11. For the Month Ending June, 2019 Wells Fargo Account Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc.. (Havkin, Stella) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#211

(#211) Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 11. For the Month Ending June, 2019 Citi National Account Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc.. (Havkin, Stella) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#210

(#210) Amended Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc. (RE: related document(s)#188 Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc..). (Havkin, Stella) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#209

(#209) Notice of lodgment of Order approving corrected disclsoure statement Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc. (RE: related document(s)#208 Disclosure Statement). (Havkin, Stella) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#208

(#208) Disclosure Statement Corrected; Declarations of Randal D. Haworth and Stella Havkin Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc.. (Havkin, Stella) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#188

(#210) Amended Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc. (RE: related document(s)#188 Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc..). (Havkin, Stella) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#8

Receipt of Amending Schedules D and/or E/F (Official Form 106D, 106E/F, 206D, or 206E/F) (Fee)(2:18-bk-16306-WB) [misc,amdsch] ( 31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 47173023. Fee amount 31.00. (re: Doc#8) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

#7

(#7) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/13/2018 at 01:15 PM at RM 7, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 9/11/2018. Proofs of Claims due by 10/11/2018. (Ventura, Olivia) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

#6

(#6) Order Directing the Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman Pursuant to 11 USC Section 333(a)(1) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/12/2018. (Kaaumoana, William) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

#5

(#5) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc.) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/06/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

#4

(#4) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc.) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/06/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

#3

(#3) Notice of lodgment Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA) (RE: related document(s)#2 Stipulation By United States Trustee (LA) and Debtor re Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman). (Mar, Alvin) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

#2

(#3) Notice of lodgment Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA) (RE: related document(s)#2 Stipulation By United States Trustee (LA) and Debtor re Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman). (Mar, Alvin) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

#1

(#8) Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) , List of Equity Security Holders , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Amending Schedules (D) (E/F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (Havkin, Stella) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

203 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#216) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#215 Order Approving Disclosure Statement (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/28/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#215) Order Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Describing Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization and Setting Hearing on Confirmation of Plan (BNC-PDF) Signed on 7/26/2019 (RE: related document(s)#208 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc.). Confirmation hearing to be held on 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Julia W. Brand Last day to Object to Confirmation 8/26/2019. (Vandensteen, Nancy) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#214) Statement Professional Fee Statement No. 8 for the month of July 2019 with proof of service Filed by Health Care Ombudsman Elliot M. Hirsh, MD. (Terzian, Tamar) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#213) Ombudsman Report for the period of 05/01/19 through 07/01/19 Filed by Health Care Ombudsman Elliot M. Hirsh, MD. (Terzian, Tamar) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#212) Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 11. For the Month Ending June, 2019 Wells Fargo Account Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc.. (Havkin, Stella) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#211) Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 11. For the Month Ending June, 2019 Citi National Account Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc.. (Havkin, Stella) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#210) Amended Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc. (RE: related document(s)#188 Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc..). (Havkin, Stella) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#209) Notice of lodgment of Order approving corrected disclsoure statement Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc. (RE: related document(s)#208 Disclosure Statement). (Havkin, Stella) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#208) Disclosure Statement Corrected; Declarations of Randal D. Haworth and Stella Havkin Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc.. (Havkin, Stella) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#207) Statement Amended Professional Fee Statement of Patient Care Ombudsman, Statement Number 5 for the Month of February 2019 with proof of service Filed by Health Care Ombudsman Elliot M. Hirsh, MD. (Terzian, Tamar) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
212 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Amending Schedules D and/or E/F (Official Form 106D, 106E/F, 206D, or 206E/F) (Fee)(2:18-bk-16306-WB) [misc,amdsch] ( 31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 47173023. Fee amount 31.00. (re: Doc#8) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) , List of Equity Security Holders , Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Amending Schedules (D) (E/F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Official Form 2030) , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) , Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)). (Havkin, Stella) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/13/2018 at 01:15 PM at RM 7, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 9/11/2018. Proofs of Claims due by 10/11/2018. (Ventura, Olivia) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Directing the Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman Pursuant to 11 USC Section 333(a)(1) (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/12/2018. (Kaaumoana, William) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc.) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/06/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc.) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/06/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of lodgment Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA) (RE: related document(s)#2 Stipulation By United States Trustee (LA) and Debtor re Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman). (Mar, Alvin) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Stipulation By United States Trustee (LA) and Debtor re Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA) (Mar, Alvin) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:18-bk-16306) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 47098563. Fee amount 1717.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 05/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Randal D. Haworth M.D. Inc. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 06/14/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 06/14/2018. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 06/14/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 06/14/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 06/14/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 06/14/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 06/14/2018. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 06/14/2018. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 06/14/2018. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 06/14/2018. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 06/14/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 06/14/2018. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122B) Due: 06/14/2018. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 06/14/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 06/14/2018.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 07/2/2018 (Havkin, Stella) (Entered: 05/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RANDAL D. HAWORTH M.D. INC is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian T Harvey