This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:36:58 (UTC).

Parviz Paul Mehdizadeh

Case Summary

On 09/05/2017 Parviz Paul Mehdizadeh was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin R. Barash. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-BK-12377

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Martin R. Barash

 

Party Details

Debtor

Parviz Paul Mehdizadeh

Calabasas, CA 91302

Trustee

Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas (TR)

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Glenn Ward Calsada

Attorney at Law Office of Glenn W Calsada, Esq.

23283 Ventura Boulevard

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

1 #3

Case Com Def Notice

#1

Main Document

#7

(#73) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (RE: related document(s)#7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) (Bever, Sabine) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Parviz Paul Mehdizadeh. (Calsada, Glenn) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Parviz Paul Mehdizadeh. (Calsada, Glenn) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

#8

(#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 09/08/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/08/2017)

#72

(#72) Proof of service Filed by Trustee Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas (TR). (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#71

(#71) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#70

(#70) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) Filed by Trustee Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas (TR). (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#69

(#69) Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor BMW Financial Services NA, LLC. (Parmar, Dipika) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#68

(#68) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#67

(#67) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#66 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/12/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/12/2018)

#66

(#66) Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (BNC-PDF). Debtor Dismissed. (Related Doc #58) Signed on 7/10/2018. (Bever, Sabine) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

#58

(#65) Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) of Trustee Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Dismissing Chapter 13 Proceeding (11 U.S.C. 1307(c)) Filed by Trustee Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas (TR) (RE: related document(s)#58 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments ). (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

#65

(#65) Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) of Trustee Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Dismissing Chapter 13 Proceeding (11 U.S.C. 1307(c)) Filed by Trustee Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas (TR) (RE: related document(s)#58 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments ). (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

#64

(#64) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#62 Order on Motion to Commence Loan Modification Management Prg (LMM) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/30/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/30/2018)

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (RE: related document(s)#7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) (Bever, Sabine) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) Proof of service Filed by Trustee Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas (TR). (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) Filed by Trustee Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas (TR). (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) Notice of Change of Address Filed by Creditor BMW Financial Services NA, LLC. (Parmar, Dipika) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#66 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/12/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (BNC-PDF). Debtor Dismissed. (Related Doc #58) Signed on 7/10/2018. (Bever, Sabine) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) of Trustee Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Dismissing Chapter 13 Proceeding (11 U.S.C. 1307(c)) Filed by Trustee Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas (TR) (RE: related document(s)#58 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments ). (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#62 Order on Motion to Commence Loan Modification Management Prg (LMM) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/30/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 09/08/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules /statements recorded as deficient. THE PROPER DEFICIENCY HAS BEEN ISSUED. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Parviz Paul Mehdizadeh) (Bever, Sabine) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect attorney/creditor/party information was entered at the time of filing. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Parviz Paul Mehdizadeh) (Bever, Sabine) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Parviz Paul Mehdizadeh Case Number #10-19057, Chapter 7 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 07/25/2010 , Standard Discharge on 11/17/2011.(Admin) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(1:17-bk-12377) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45524338. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Parviz Paul Mehdizadeh. (Calsada, Glenn) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Parviz Paul Mehdizadeh. (Calsada, Glenn) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Parviz Paul Mehdizadeh. (Calsada, Glenn) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/18/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/07/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 303, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. Proof of Claim due by 01/16/2018. (Calsada, Glenn) (Entered: 09/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual , Statement of Related Cases, Verification of Master Mailing List with List of Creditors. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Parviz Paul Mehdizadeh Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 09/19/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 09/19/2017. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 09/19/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 09/19/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 09/19/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 09/19/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 09/19/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 09/19/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 09/19/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 09/19/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 09/19/2017. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 09/19/2017. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 09/19/2017. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 09/19/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 09/19/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 09/19/2017. (Calsada, Glenn) CORRECTION: Also deficient for: Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Income was Received due by 09/19/2017. Modified on 9/6/2017 (Bever, Sabine). (Entered: 09/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.