This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/09/2019 at 16:14:48 (UTC).

Official Unsecured Creditors Committee for Liberty v. Tsang et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2017 Official Unsecured Creditors Committee for Liberty filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Tsang. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Ernest M. Robles. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-AP-01525

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

Ernest M. Robles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Official Unsecured Creditors Committee for Liberty Asset Management Corporation

Bradley D. Sharp, Plan Administrator for Liberty Asset Management Corporation

10100 Santa Monica Blvd., 13Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendants

David Tsang

Cathy Tsang

ELSV LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

Steven Tsang

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gail S Greenwood

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

150 California St., 15Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jeremy V Richards

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

10100 Santa Monica Bl Ste 13Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Ralph J Swanson

Attorney at Berliner Cohen

10 Almaden Blvd 11Th Fl

San Jose, CA 95113

Laura Palazzolo

Attorney at Berliner Cohen

10 Almaden Blvd 11Th Fl

San Jose, CA 95113

 

Court Documents

#39

#38

#37

#36

#35

#34

#33

#32

#15

#8

7 #2

Notice of Required Compliance with Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1

7 #1

Main Document

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

Exhibits A through E

1 #2

Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet

#1

Main Document

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • (#40) Adversary Case 2:17-ap-1525 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#38 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/15/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Signed on 9/13/2018 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Official Unsecured Creditors Committee for Liberty Asset Management Corporation, #4 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF), #15 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)). (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Notice of lodgment of Order Approving Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7041 Filed by Plaintiff Bradley D. Sharp (RE: related document(s)#36 Stipulation By Bradley D. Sharp and / Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7041 Filed by Plaintiff Bradley D. Sharp filed by Plaintiff Bradley D. Sharp). (Greenwood, Gail) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Stipulation By Bradley D. Sharp and / Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7041 Filed by Plaintiff Bradley D. Sharp (Greenwood, Gail) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#34 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/24/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Order Approving Joint Stipulation Of Proposed Settlement And Continuance Of Trial. Continued until the week of November 26, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #33 ) Signed on 8/22/2018 (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Stipulation By Bradley D. Sharp and ELSV LLC, Steven Tsang, Cathy Tsang, and David Tsang / Joint Stipulation of Proposed Settlement and Continuance of Trial Filed by Plaintiff Bradley D. Sharp (Greenwood, Gail) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Notice of lodgment Filed by Defendants ELSV LLC, Cathy Tsang, David Tsang, Steven Tsang (RE: related document(s)#31 Brief). (Swanson, Ralph) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Brief DEFENDANTS TRIAL BRIEF Filed by Defendants ELSV LLC, Cathy Tsang, David Tsang, Steven Tsang. (Swanson, Ralph) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#5 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/09/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#4 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/09/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Service Executed on Official Unsecured Creditors Committee for Liberty Asset Management Corporation 11/8/2017 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Required Compliance with Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1) (Greenwood, Gail) (Entered: 11/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Official Unsecured Creditors Committee for Liberty Asset Management Corporation) Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/14/2018 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 8/27/2018 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Re: courtroom procedures. trial week of 8-27-18 at 9:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 11/7/2017 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Official Unsecured Creditors Committee for Liberty Asset Management Corporation). (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Signed on 11/7/2017. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/14/2018 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Discovery due by 7/28/2018. Trial date set for 8/27/2018 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued on ELSV LLC Date Issued 11/7/2017, Answer Due 12/7/2017; Cathy Tsang Date Issued 11/7/2017, Answer Due 12/7/2017; David Tsang Date Issued 11/7/2017, Answer Due 12/7/2017; Steven Tsang Date Issued 11/7/2017, Answer Due 12/7/2017 (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Official Unsecured Creditors Committee for Liberty Asset Management Corporation) Status hearing to be held on 2/13/2018 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Attorney address on the Complaint does not match CM/ECF. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION ON THIS CASE, HOWEVER, THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE PROPER CHANGE OF ADDRESS, IF APPLICABLE. (RE: related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Official Unsecured Creditors Committee for Liberty Asset Management Corporation). Attorney's address changed from 150 California St., 15th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111, 415-263-7000 Fax : 415-263-7010, to 10100 Santa Monica Blvd., 13th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90067, Telephone: 310/277-6910 Facsimile: 310/201-0760 (Lomeli, Lydia R.) (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Complaint(2:17-ap-01525-ER) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45912086. Fee amount 350.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Adversary case 2:17-ap-01525. Complaint by Official Unsecured Creditors Committee for Liberty Asset Management Corporation against Steven Tsang, Cathy Tsang, ELSV LLC. Fee Amount $350 / Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Fraudulent Transfers; Money Had and Received; Unjust Enrichment; And Objection to Claims (Attachments: #1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet #2 Exhibits A through E) Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Greenwood, Gail) (Entered: 11/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gail S Greenwood

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy V Richards