This case was last updated from PACER on 12/11/2019 at 05:44:10 (UTC).

Neil D Gitnick and Anita Marton

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 Neil D Gitnick and Anita Marton was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen Tighe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-BK-11870

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Maureen Tighe

 

Party Details

Debtors

Neil D Gitnick

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Anita Marton

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Trustee

Amy L Goldman (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Nina Z Javan

Attorney at Styskal, Wiese & Melchione, LLP

550 N. Brand Blvd., Suite 550

Glendale, CA 91203

James R Selth

Attorney at Weintraub & Selth APC

11766 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1170

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#1

Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload(1:17-bk-11870) [caseupld,1027u] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45199779. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling (Case Upload) filed by James R Selth of Weintraub & Selth APC on behalf of Neil D Gitnick, Anita Marton. (Selth, James) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

#7

(#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)) No. of Notices: 60. Notice Date 07/16/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/16/2017)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Neil D Gitnick, Joint Debtor Anita Marton. (Selth, James) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

#5

(#5) Attorney's Disclosure of Compensation Arrangement in Individual Chapter 7 Case (LBR Form F2090-1) Filed by Debtor Neil D Gitnick, Joint Debtor Anita Marton. (Selth, James) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

#6

(#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Neil D Gitnick, Joint Debtor Anita Marton. (Selth, James) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

#8

(#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)) No. of Notices: 60. Notice Date 07/16/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/16/2017)

#9

(#9) Request for special notice Filed by Creditor BMW Bank of North America Department. (Barot, Bhagwati) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

#135

(#135) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#134 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/08/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/08/2019)

#134

(#134) Order Closing Bankruptcy Case (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/6/2019 (RE: related document(s)#102 Motion to Reopen Case filed by Debtor Neil D Gitnick, Joint Debtor Anita Marton). (Gonzalez, Emma) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#102

(#134) Order Closing Bankruptcy Case (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/6/2019 (RE: related document(s)#102 Motion to Reopen Case filed by Debtor Neil D Gitnick, Joint Debtor Anita Marton). (Gonzalez, Emma) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#120

(#133) Bankruptcy Case Re-Closed - CHAPTER 7 ASSET. Pursuant to the Trustee's Final Account and Distribution Report Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application to be Discharged, it is ordered that the above case be closed. No objections having been made by the United States Trustee, the trustee is discharged and the bond is exonerated. (RE: related document(s) 109 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, #120 Transcript, #122 Motion to Reconsider filed by Attorney Maximilian Lee) (Gonzalez, Emma) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#122

(#129) Opposition to (related document(s): #122 Motion to Reconsider (related documents #115 Order on Motion for Contempt (BNC-PDF)) Motion For New Trial And For Reconsideration Of Order Holding Martin Cohen And Maximilian Lee In Contempt For Violation Of The Discharge filed by Attorney Maximilian Lee) Filed by Debtor Neil D Gitnick, Joint Debtor Anita Marton (Javan, Nina) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#131

(#131) Order Reconsiding and determining that Maximilian Lee and Martin Cohen shall not be held in contempt and Vacating Order to Show Cause for Violation of The Discharge: (BNC-PDF) Signed on 1/4/2019 (RE: related document(s)#122 Motion to Reconsider filed by Attorney Maximilian Lee, #123 Generic Motion filed by Attorney Maximilian Lee). (Gonzalez, Emma) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#132

(#132) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#131 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/06/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/06/2019)

#123

(#126) Order Granting Motion to Stay Order Holding Martin Cohen and Maximilian Lee in Contempt for Violation of the Discharge and Request for a Hearing (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #123 ) Signed on 11/27/2018 (Gasparian, Ana) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#130

(#130) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Marth, Angie. (Marth, Angie) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#135) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#134 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/08/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#134) Order Closing Bankruptcy Case (BNC-PDF) Signed on 6/6/2019 (RE: related document(s)#102 Motion to Reopen Case filed by Debtor Neil D Gitnick, Joint Debtor Anita Marton). (Gonzalez, Emma) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#133) Bankruptcy Case Re-Closed - CHAPTER 7 ASSET. Pursuant to the Trustee's Final Account and Distribution Report Certification that the Estate has been Fully Administered and Application to be Discharged, it is ordered that the above case be closed. No objections having been made by the United States Trustee, the trustee is discharged and the bond is exonerated. (RE: related document(s) 109 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set, #120 Transcript, #122 Motion to Reconsider filed by Attorney Maximilian Lee) (Gonzalez, Emma) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#132) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#131 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/06/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#131) Order Reconsiding and determining that Maximilian Lee and Martin Cohen shall not be held in contempt and Vacating Order to Show Cause for Violation of The Discharge: (BNC-PDF) Signed on 1/4/2019 (RE: related document(s)#122 Motion to Reconsider filed by Attorney Maximilian Lee, #123 Generic Motion filed by Attorney Maximilian Lee). (Gonzalez, Emma) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#130) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Marth, Angie. (Marth, Angie) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#129) Opposition to (related document(s): #122 Motion to Reconsider (related documents #115 Order on Motion for Contempt (BNC-PDF)) Motion For New Trial And For Reconsideration Of Order Holding Martin Cohen And Maximilian Lee In Contempt For Violation Of The Discharge filed by Attorney Maximilian Lee) Filed by Debtor Neil D Gitnick, Joint Debtor Anita Marton (Javan, Nina) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#126 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/29/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#127) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#124 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/29/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#126) Order Granting Motion to Stay Order Holding Martin Cohen and Maximilian Lee in Contempt for Violation of the Discharge and Request for a Hearing (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #123 ) Signed on 11/27/2018 (Gasparian, Ana) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request for special notice Filed by Creditor BMW Bank of North America Department. (Barot, Bhagwati) (Entered: 07/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)) No. of Notices: 60. Notice Date 07/16/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Neil D Gitnick, Joint Debtor Anita Marton. (Selth, James) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Attorney's Disclosure of Compensation Arrangement in Individual Chapter 7 Case (LBR Form F2090-1) Filed by Debtor Neil D Gitnick, Joint Debtor Anita Marton. (Selth, James) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Neil D Gitnick, Joint Debtor Anita Marton. (Selth, James) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload(1:17-bk-11870) [caseupld,1027u] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45199779. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Neil D Gitnick, Joint Debtor Anita Marton. (Selth, James) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/11/2017 at 10:30 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. Objections for Discharge due by 10/10/2017. Cert. of Financial Management due by 10/10/2017 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Selth, James) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Credit Counseling (Case Upload) filed by James R Selth of Weintraub & Selth APC on behalf of Neil D Gitnick, Anita Marton. (Selth, James) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount filed by James R Selth of Weintraub & Selth APC on behalf of Neil D Gitnick, Anita Marton. (Selth, James) (Entered: 07/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.