This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:54:48 (UTC).

Miguel Morse

Case Summary

On 06/25/2018 Miguel Morse was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Neil W. Bason. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-BK-17291

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Neil W. Bason

 

Party Details

Debtor

Miguel Morse

Los Angeles, CA 90001

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Kathy A Dockery (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#18 Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/12/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/12/2018)

#18

(#18) Order Granting Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #10 ) Signed on 8/10/2018 (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#16

(#16) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Smith, Valerie. (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#15

(#15) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#14

(#14) Notice of Hearing Filed by. (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

#13

(#13) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#12 ORDER and notice of dismissal for failure to file schedules, statements, and/or plan (CACB AutoDismiss) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 07/15/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/15/2018)

#12

(#13) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#12 ORDER and notice of dismissal for failure to file schedules, statements, and/or plan (CACB AutoDismiss) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 07/15/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/15/2018)

#10

(#17) Hearing Held on 08/07/18 at 10:00 a.m.: Granted (RE: related document(s)#10 Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property filed by Creditor Navy Federal Credit Union) (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#8

(#8) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Jafarnia, Merdaud. (Jafarnia, Merdaud) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Miguel Morse) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Miguel Morse) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

#5

(#5) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 06/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Miguel Morse . (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 06/25/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#20) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) (Vandensteen, Nancy) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

1 #3

Case Com Def Notice

1 #2

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) (Vandensteen, Nancy) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Receipt of Photocopies Fee - $2.50 by 02. Receipt Number 80071896. (admin) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Receipt of Certification Fee - $11.00 by 02. Receipt Number 80071896. (admin) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#18 Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/12/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Order Granting Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #10 ) Signed on 8/10/2018 (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Hearing Held on 08/07/18 at 10:00 a.m.: Granted (RE: related document(s)#10 Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property filed by Creditor Navy Federal Credit Union) (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Smith, Valerie. (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Notice of Hearing Filed by. (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#12 ORDER and notice of dismissal for failure to file schedules, statements, and/or plan (CACB AutoDismiss) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 07/15/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Fujimoto, Daniel. (Fujimoto, Daniel) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Jafarnia, Merdaud. (Jafarnia, Merdaud) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Miguel Morse) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Miguel Morse) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 06/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Receipt of Chapter 13 Filing Fee - $310.00 by 01. Receipt Number 20228218. (admin) (Entered: 06/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Miguel Morse . (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 06/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Miguel Morse . (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 06/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/03/2018 at 09:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 08/30/2018 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 09/04/2018. (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 06/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Miguel Morse Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 7/9/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 7/9/2018. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 7/9/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 7/9/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 7/9/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 7/9/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 7/9/2018. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 7/9/2018. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 7/9/2018. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 7/9/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 7/9/2018. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 7/9/2018. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 7/9/2018. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 7/9/2018. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 7/9/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 7/9/2018. (Collins, Kim S.) (Entered: 06/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant