This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 10/21/2021 at 17:38:45 (UTC).

Manty v. Hammerlund's Champion Steel, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 Manty filed a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding lawsuit against Hammerlund's Champion Steel, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Minnesota Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is William J Fisher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-AP-05028

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 Adversary Proceeding

Judge Details

Judge

William J Fisher

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ERP Iron Ore, LLC

7908 Us Highway 169 Suite B

Bovey, MN 55709

Nauni Manty, As trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of ERP Iron Ore, LLC

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Defendants

Hammerlund's Champion Steel, Inc

LEJEUNE STEEL COMPANY

118 W 60Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55419

HAMMERLUND CONSTRUCTION LLC

40 County Rd 63

Grand Rapids, MN 55744

BROCK WHITE COMPANY LLC

2575 Kasota Avenue

St Paul, MN 55108

MINNESOTA INDUSTRIES INC

610 Industrial Avenue

Chisholm, MN 55719

NORTHERN INDUSTRIAL ERECTORS INC

P O Box 308

Grand Rapids, MN 55744

K BUILDING COMPONENTS INC

1955 Highway 37

Hibbing, MN 55746

PRECISION TESTING INC

5559 Enterprise Drive Ne

Virginia, MN 55792

GENERAL WASTE DISPOSAL AND RECOVERY SERVICES INC

P O Box 312

Chisholm, MN 55719

TRANE US INC

3600 Pammel Creek Road

La Crosse, WI 54601

Liquidity Solutions, Inc.

One Univeristy Plaza, Suite 312

Hackensack, NJ 07601

THE JAMAR COMPANY

4701 Mike Colallillo Drive

Duluth, MN 55801

HUNT ELECTRIC CORPORATION

4330 W First Street Ste B

Duluth, MN 55807

TOLTZ KING DUVALL ANDERSON & ASSOCIATES INC

444 Cedar Street Ste 1500

St Paul, MN 55101

JK MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS INC

240 5Th Street

Nashwauk, MN 55768

PARSONS ELECTRIC LLC

5960 Main Street Ne

Minneapolis, MN 55432

RANGE ELECTRIC INC

1102 North Third Street

Superior, WI 54880

Trustee

Nauni J Manty

Minneapolis, MN 55401

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Will R. Tansey

Attorney at Ravich Meyer Kirkman McGrath Nauman & Ta

150 South Fifth Street, Suite 3450

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Manty & Associates PA

401 Second Avenue North, Suite 400

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Other Attorneys

Conrad K. Chiu

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036-6569

Monica L. Clark

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney LLP

50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

Matthew W. Silverman

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036-6569

Natasha Wells

Attorney at Dorsey &Whitney LLP

50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Charles E. Nelson

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

2000 Ids Center, 80 South 8Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Seth H. Lieberman

Attorney at Pryor Cashman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036-6569

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 02/28/2019. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketAdversary case 5:18-ap-5028 closed (Kristin MNBM) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketDisposition of adversary 5:18-ap-5028. Disposition: Dismissed. (Kristin MNBM) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of dismissal filed by Nauni Manty (Camardello, Christopher) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Order To Show Cause (re:#1 Complaint) Hearing scheduled 3/12/2019 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 2B, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Whitney MNB) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 12/20/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order regarding stipulation as to substitution of plaintiff. (re:#9 Stipulation) (Whitney MNB) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Stipulation filed by Nauni J Manty and ERP Iron Ore, LLC. Proposed order. Nature of stipulation: Stipulation as to Substitution of Plaintiff(Manty, Nauni) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by PROGRESS RAIL LEASING CORPORATION and Natasha Wells. Proof of service.. (Wells, Natasha) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by PROGRESS RAIL LEASING CORPORATION and Monica L. Clark. Proof of service.. (Clark, Monica) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB and Matthew W. Silverman.. (Silverman, Matthew) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB and Seth H. Lieberman.. (Lieberman, Seth) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB and Conrad K. Chiu.. (Chiu, Conrad) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB and Charles E. Nelson.. (Nelson, Charles) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons issued on AW KUETTEL & SONS INC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; BROCK WHITE COMPANY LLC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; GENERAL WASTE DISPOSAL AND RECOVERY SERVICES INC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; HAMMERLUND CONSTRUCTION LLC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; HUNT ELECTRIC CORPORATION Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; Hammerlund's Champion Steel, Inc. Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; Ironman Concrete Pumping, Inc. Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; JK MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS INC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; JOHN J MORGAN COMPANY Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; K BUILDING COMPONENTS INC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; LEJEUNE STEEL COMPANY Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; Liquidity Solutions, Inc. Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; MINNESOTA INDUSTRIES INC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; NORAMCO ENGINEERING CORPORATION Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; NORTHERN INDUSTRIAL ERECTORS INC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; PARSONS ELECTRIC LLC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; PRECISION TESTING INC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; PROGRESS RAIL LEASING CORPORATION Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; RANGE ELECTRIC INC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; RAPIDS PROCESS EQUIPMENT INC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; SCHECK INDUSTRIAL CORPORATION Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; THE JAMAR COMPANY Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; TOLTZ KING DUVALL ANDERSON & ASSOCIATES INC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; TRANE US INC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; ULLAND BROTHERS INC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA) Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; VIKING ELECTRIC Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC. Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018; WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB Date Issued 11/19/2018, Answer Due 12/19/2018 (Kristin MNBM) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketReceipt of Complaint(18-05028) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10916772. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Adversary case 18-05028. (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by ERP Iron Ore, LLC against Hammerlund's Champion Steel, Inc., HAMMERLUND CONSTRUCTION LLC, WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC., TOLTZ KING DUVALL ANDERSON & ASSOCIATES INC, TRANE US INC, ULLAND BROTHERS INC, BROCK WHITE COMPANY LLC, GENERAL WASTE DISPOSAL AND RECOVERY SERVICES INC, FERGUSON ENTERPRISES INC, PRECISION TESTING INC, RAPIDS PROCESS EQUIPMENT INC, MINNESOTA INDUSTRIES INC, NORAMCO ENGINEERING CORPORATION, VIKING ELECTRIC, PARSONS ELECTRIC LLC, HUNT ELECTRIC CORPORATION, THE JAMAR COMPANY, LEJEUNE STEEL COMPANY, UNITED RENTALS (NORTH AMERICA), AW KUETTEL & SONS INC, Ironman Concrete Pumping, Inc., JK MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS INC, JOHN J MORGAN COMPANY, K BUILDING COMPONENTS INC, NORTHERN INDUSTRIAL ERECTORS INC, RANGE ELECTRIC INC, SCHECK INDUSTRIAL CORPORATION, Liquidity Solutions, Inc., WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY FSB, PROGRESS RAIL LEASING CORPORATION. Fee Amount $350 (Tansey, Will) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hammerlund Construction, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Jamar Company is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANE US INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monica L. Clark