Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2018 at 05:12:40 (UTC).

Khristen Carter

Case Summary

On 10/26/2018 Khristen Carter was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Wayne E. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-BK-19097

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Wayne E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Debtor

Khristen Carter

Corona, CA 92882

Trustee

Todd A. Frealy (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

3801 University Avenue, Suite 720

Riverside, CA 92501-3200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

William Huestis

4000 Macarthur Blvd. #600

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER to comply with bankruptcy rule 1007/3015(b) and notice of intent to dismiss case (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Khristen Carter) (Sandoval, Rosanna) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#11

(#11) Original Holographic signature page Statement of Related Cases Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#10

(#10) Statement of Intention with Original Holographic signature page Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#9

(#9) Statement of Financial Affairs with Original Holographic signature page. Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#8

(#8) Amended Verification of Creditor Matrix with Original Holographic signature page. Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#7

(#7) Amended Voluntary Petition Form 101 with Original Holographic signature page. Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#6

(#6) Original Holographic signature page Dec. About Ind. Schedules Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#15

(#15) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/27/2018 at 10:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Objections for Discharge due by 01/28/2019. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/28/2019 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#5

(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#2

(#2) Declaration re: Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Khristen Carter (Huestis, William) WARNING: See docket entry #14 for Correction. Case is deficient for: Exemption of Presumption of Abuse (Official Form 122A-1Supp) due 11/9/2018. Means Test Calculation (Official Form 122A-2) due 11/9/2018. Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Official Form 122A-1) due 11/9/2018. See Order to Comply docket entry #13. Modified on 10/26/2018 (Sandoval, Rosanna). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Petition was filed as complete, but schedules or statements are deficient. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE THE DEFICIENT DOCUMENTS. The Proper deficiency has been issued. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Khristen Carter) (Sandoval, Rosanna) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER to comply with bankruptcy rule 1007/3015(b) and notice of intent to dismiss case (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Khristen Carter) (Sandoval, Rosanna) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Khristen Carter) (Sandoval, Rosanna) CORRECTION: Docket entry entered in error. See Order to Comply docket entry #13 for correct deficiency notice. Modified on 10/26/2018 (Sandoval, Rosanna). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Original Holographic signature page Statement of Related Cases Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Statement of Intention with Original Holographic signature page Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Statement of Financial Affairs with Original Holographic signature page. Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Amended Verification of Creditor Matrix with Original Holographic signature page. Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Amended Voluntary Petition Form 101 with Original Holographic signature page. Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Original Holographic signature page Dec. About Ind. Schedules Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/27/2018 at 10:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Objections for Discharge due by 01/28/2019. Cert. of Financial Management due by 01/28/2019 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Declaration re: Filed by Debtor Khristen Carter. (Huestis, William) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Khristen Carter (Huestis, William) WARNING: See docket entry #14 for Correction. Case is deficient for: Exemption of Presumption of Abuse (Official Form 122A-1Supp) due 11/9/2018. Means Test Calculation (Official Form 122A-2) due 11/9/2018. Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Official Form 122A-1) due 11/9/2018. See Order to Comply docket entry #13. Modified on 10/26/2018 (Sandoval, Rosanna). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Huestis