This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:47:30 (UTC).

Juan F Hernandez

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 Juan F Hernandez was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Neil W. Bason. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-BK-16493

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Neil W. Bason

 

Party Details

Debtor

Juan F Hernandez

Los Angeles, CA 90044

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Kathy A Dockery (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#40 Order on Motion to Reopen Case (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/20/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/20/2018)

#40

(#40) Order Denying Motion To Reopen Case...with certificate of service made by deputy clerk (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #38) Signed on 10/18/2018. (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#39

(#39) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#37 ORDER vacating an order (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/17/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#38

(#38) Motion to Reopen Chapter 13 Case . Fee Amount $235 - Fees not paid. Filed by Interested Party Brenda Orea (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#37

(#37) Order denying motion to reconsider (1) Dismissal and/or (2) Closing of this case and/or (3) Order granting motion for relief from automatic stay....with certificate of service made by deputy clerk (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #36 ) Signed on 10/15/2018 (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

36 #5

Declaration

36 #4

Exhibits Pt. III

36 #3

Exhibit Pt. II

36 #2

Exhibits Pt. I

#7

(#7) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) Filed by Debtor Juan F Hernandez (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Juan F Hernandez Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 6/19/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 6/19/2018. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 6/19/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 6/19/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 6/19/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 6/19/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 6/19/2018. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 6/19/2018. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 6/19/2018. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 6/19/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 6/19/2018. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 6/19/2018. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 6/19/2018. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 6/19/2018. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 6/19/2018. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 6/19/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 6/19/2018.). (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 06/15/2018)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Juan F Hernandez) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/07/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

#5

(#5) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Juan F Hernandez) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/07/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

#4

(#4) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 06/07/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#4) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 06/07/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

1 #3

Case Com Def Notice

1 #2

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#1

Main Document

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#40 Order on Motion to Reopen Case (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/20/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Receipt of Forms - $3.00 by 03. Receipt Number 20230684. (admin) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Receipt of Certification Fee - $11.00 by 03. Receipt Number 20230684. (admin) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Receipt of Reopen Chapter 13 Filing Fee - $235.00 by 03. Receipt Number 20230683. (admin) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Receipt of Photocopies Fee - $4.00 by 22. Receipt Number 60144071. (admin) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Receipt of Certification Fee - $11.00 by 22. Receipt Number 60144071. (admin) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Order Denying Motion To Reopen Case...with certificate of service made by deputy clerk (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #38) Signed on 10/18/2018. (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#37 ORDER vacating an order (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/17/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Motion to Reopen Chapter 13 Case . Fee Amount $235 - Fees not paid. Filed by Interested Party Brenda Orea (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Order denying motion to reconsider (1) Dismissal and/or (2) Closing of this case and/or (3) Order granting motion for relief from automatic stay....with certificate of service made by deputy clerk (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #36 ) Signed on 10/15/2018 (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Juan F Hernandez (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)). (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 06/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Juan F Hernandez (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)). (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 06/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) Filed by Debtor Juan F Hernandez (RE: related document(s)#1 Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Juan F Hernandez Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 6/19/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 6/19/2018. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 6/19/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 6/19/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 6/19/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 6/19/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 6/19/2018. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 6/19/2018. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 6/19/2018. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 6/19/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 6/19/2018. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 6/19/2018. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 6/19/2018. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 6/19/2018. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 6/19/2018. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 6/19/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 6/19/2018.). (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) (Entered: 06/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Juan F Hernandez) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/07/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Juan F Hernandez) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/07/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 06/07/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Receipt of Chapter 13 Filing Fee - $310.00 by 19. Receipt Number 20227775. (admin) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Juan F Hernandez . (Serrano, Vera) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/13/2018 at 11:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 08/30/2018 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 08/14/2018. (Serrano, Vera) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Juan F Hernandez Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 6/19/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 6/19/2018. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 6/19/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 6/19/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 6/19/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 6/19/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 6/19/2018. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 6/19/2018. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 6/19/2018. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 6/19/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 6/19/2018. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 6/19/2018. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 6/19/2018. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 6/19/2018. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 6/19/2018. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 6/19/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 6/19/2018. (Serrano, Vera) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.