This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:36:01 (UTC).

Joseph J Nichols

Case Summary

On 07/31/2017 Joseph J Nichols was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia W. Brand. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-BK-19306

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Julia W. Brand

 

Party Details

Debtor

Joseph J Nichols

Long Beach, CA 90806

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Julius Johnson

Attorney at The Law Offices of Julius Johnson

2476 N Lake Ave

Altadena, CA 91001

 

Court Documents

#44

No Description Available

#41

No Description Available

#33

No Description Available

#58

(#58) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#25

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#56

(#56) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #49 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch), #54 Objection filed by Debtor Joseph J Nichols) (Bryant, Sandra R.) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#48

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 08/04/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

#13

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#39

No Description Available

#47

No Description Available

#43

No Description Available

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • (#61) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Vandensteen, Nancy) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#56 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 07/18/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #49 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch), #54 Objection filed by Debtor Joseph J Nichols) (Bryant, Sandra R.) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing (Bk Motion) Continued (RE: related document(s) #49 TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS CASE (BATCH) ) Hearing to be held on 07/11/2018 at 01:30 PM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1375 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for #49 , (Bryant, Sandra R.) (Entered: 06/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#54 Objection filed by Joseph J Nichols) (related document(s): #49 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case) Hearing to be held on 06/13/2018 at 01:30 PM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1375 Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Julia Brand (Pennington-Jones, Patricia) Modified on 5/22/2018 (Pennington-Jones, Patricia). (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor Joseph J Nichols (RE: related document(s)#49 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case Due to a Material Default of a Plan Provision/No Hearing Required. (Curry (TR), Nancy)). (Johnson, Julius) (Entered: 05/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) Objection (related document(s): #49 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case) Filed by Debtor Joseph J Nichols (Johnson, Julius) (Entered: 05/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Joseph J Nichols) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/04/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 08/04/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/30/2017 at 11:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 09/20/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 11/28/2017. (admin, ) (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Joseph J Nichols Case Number #12-34359, Chapter 7 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 07/16/2012 , Dismissed for Failure to File Information on 08/03/2012.(Admin) (Entered: 08/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Filed by Debtor Joseph J Nichols. (Johnson, Julius) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Joseph J Nichols. (Johnson, Julius) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Joseph J Nichols. (Johnson, Julius) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Joseph J Nichols. (Johnson, Julius) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(2:17-bk-19306) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45304274. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Joseph J Nichols Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 08/14/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 08/14/2017. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 08/14/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 08/14/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 08/14/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 08/14/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 08/14/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 08/14/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 08/14/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 08/14/2017. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 08/14/2017. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 08/14/2017. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 08/14/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 08/14/2017. (Johnson, Julius) (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.