Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2019 at 23:57:40 (UTC).

Jeries Rabie

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 Jeries Rabie was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Barry Russell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-BK-20517

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Barry Russell

 

Party Details

Debtor

Jeries Rabie

Torrance, CA 90504

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Howard M Ehrenberg (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Joseph L Pittera

1308 Sartori Avenue Suite 109

Torrance, CA 90501

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#31 ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 7 (CACB AutoDischarge) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 12/28/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#31

(#31) ORDER OF DISCHARGE (BNC) (Fleming, Lachelle) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#30

(#30) Certification About a Financial Management Course for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423) Filed by Debtor Jeries Rabie (RE: related document(s)#19 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)). (Pittera, Joseph) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#26

(#26) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Redmond, Elizabeth. (Redmond, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#25

(#25) Addendum to voluntary petition Filed by Debtor Jeries Rabie. (Pittera, Joseph) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#24

(#24) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Schild, Avi. (Schild, Avi) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#22

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#19

(#30) Certification About a Financial Management Course for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423) Filed by Debtor Jeries Rabie (RE: related document(s)#19 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)). (Pittera, Joseph) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#5

(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Jeries Rabie. (Pittera, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

(#2) Declaration re: Filed by Debtor Jeries Rabie. (Pittera, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#1

Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Jeries Rabie) Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 9/24/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 9/24/2018. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 9/24/2018. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 9/24/2018. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 9/24/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 9/24/2018. (Fortier, Stacey) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#31 ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 7 (CACB AutoDischarge) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 12/28/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • (#32) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISCHARGE. Order of Discharge in the above referenced case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Auto Closed) (Fleming, Lachelle) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER OF DISCHARGE (BNC) (Fleming, Lachelle) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Certification About a Financial Management Course for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423) Filed by Debtor Jeries Rabie (RE: related document(s)#19 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)). (Pittera, Joseph) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • (#29) Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Howard M Ehrenberg (TR), having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 2 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 0.00, Assets Exempt: $ 600.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 167347.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 167347.00. Debtor appeared.. (Ehrenberg (TR), Howard) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Notice of continued meeting of creditors and appearance of debtor (11 USC 341(a)) Filed by Trustee Howard M Ehrenberg (TR). (Ehrenberg (TR), Howard) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • (#27) Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) (Trustee's 341 Filings) 341(a) Meeting Continued to be held on 11/13/2018 at 08:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Debtor absent. (Ehrenberg (TR), Howard) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Redmond, Elizabeth. (Redmond, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Addendum to voluntary petition Filed by Debtor Jeries Rabie. (Pittera, Joseph) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Schild, Avi. (Schild, Avi) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Jeries Rabie) Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 9/24/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 9/24/2018. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 9/24/2018. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 9/24/2018. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 9/24/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 9/24/2018. (Fortier, Stacey) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (ccdn) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Jeries Rabie) Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 9/24/2018. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 9/24/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 9/24/2018. (Fortier, Stacey) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Document filed without holographic signature. All documents requiring debtor(s) signature in the petition and all other deficient documents must be holographic as of 12/1/2017, pursuant to LBR 9011-1/Court Manual Section 3.4. When filing Voluntary Petition (Pages 1-7)), Please select Bankruptcy . BK-Other. then select Addendum to Vol Pet. All additional deficient document(s) use the assigned event code associates with each deficiency. . THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER SIGNATURES. (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor Jeries Rabie) (Fortier, Stacey) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/17/2018 at 08:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 12/17/2018. Cert. of Financial Management due by 12/17/2018 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Pittera, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:18-bk-20517) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 47674698. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Jeries Rabie. (Pittera, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Jeries Rabie. (Pittera, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Jeries Rabie. (Pittera, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Declaration re: Filed by Debtor Jeries Rabie. (Pittera, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Jeries Rabie (Pittera, Joseph) Warning: See docket entry no. 7, 8, 9. for corrective actions. Case also deficient for: Voluntary Petition for Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Official Form 101 dated 12/15 was filed without debtor(s) holographic signature. Attorney is required to refile pages 1 through 7 of voluntary petition with proper signature of debtor due by 9/13/2018. Statement of Relates Case (LBR Form F1015-2) due 9/24/2018. Statement of Intention for Individuals Filing Under Chapter 7 (Form 108) due 10/10/2018; Verification of Creditors Matrix due 9/24/2018; Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 9/24/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 9/24/2018. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 9/24/2018. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 9/24/2018. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 9/24/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 9/24/2018. Modified on 9/10/2018 (Fortier, Stacey). (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant