This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2018 at 23:15:52 (UTC).

Jari Mousessian

Case Summary

On 09/25/2017 Jari Mousessian was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Sandra R. Klein. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-BK-21727

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Sandra R. Klein

 

Party Details

Debtor

Jari Mousessian

Glendale, CA 91208

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Kathy A Dockery (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

1 #3

Case Com Def Notice

#1

Main Document

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling; filed by Debtor Jari Mousessian . (Milano, Sonny) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

#5

(#5) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 09/27/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/27/2017)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Jari Mousessian) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/27/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/27/2017)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Jari Mousessian) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/27/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/27/2017)

#8

(#8) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Delmotte, Joseph. (Delmotte, Joseph) (Entered: 10/05/2017)

9 #1

Main Document

#2

(#20) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #9 Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.) (Ly, Lynn) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

9 #2

Exhibit 1-7

#18

(#18) Order Granting Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #9 ) Signed on 12/14/2017 (May, Thais D.) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#19

(#19) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#18 Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/16/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/16/2017)

#17

(#17) Notice of Intent to Proceed with In Rem Motion for Relief Notwithstanding Dismissal, with proof of service Filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (RE: related document(s)#9 Notice of motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations REAL PROPERTY RE: 2715 Canada Boulevard, Glendale, California 91208-2001 with proof of service. Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)). (Delmotte, Joseph) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

#16

(#16) Notice of Hearing , Continued, with proof of service Filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (RE: related document(s)#9 Notice of motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations REAL PROPERTY RE: 2715 Canada Boulevard, Glendale, California 91208-2001 with proof of service. Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)). (Delmotte, Joseph) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

#14

(#14) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 11/03/2017)

#15

(#15) Proof of service Filed by (RE: related document(s)#14 Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)). (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 11/03/2017)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #9 Motion for Relief from Stay - Real Property filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.) (Ly, Lynn) (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Receipt of Photocopies Fee - $1.50 by 01. Receipt Number 20224150. (admin) (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Receipt of Certification Fee - $11.00 by 01. Receipt Number 20224150. (admin) (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#18 Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/16/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Order Granting Motion for relief from the automatic stay REAL PROPERTY (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #9 ) Signed on 12/14/2017 (May, Thais D.) (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Notice of Intent to Proceed with In Rem Motion for Relief Notwithstanding Dismissal, with proof of service Filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (RE: related document(s)#9 Notice of motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations REAL PROPERTY RE: 2715 Canada Boulevard, Glendale, California 91208-2001 with proof of service. Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)). (Delmotte, Joseph) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Notice of Hearing , Continued, with proof of service Filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (RE: related document(s)#9 Notice of motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations REAL PROPERTY RE: 2715 Canada Boulevard, Glendale, California 91208-2001 with proof of service. Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)). (Delmotte, Joseph) (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing (Bk Motion) Continued (RE: related document(s) #9 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY - REAL PROPERTY filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.) Hearing to be held on 12/13/2017 at 08:30 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1575 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for #9 , (May, Thais D.) (Entered: 11/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Proof of service Filed by (RE: related document(s)#14 Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)). (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Delmotte, Joseph. (Delmotte, Joseph) (Entered: 10/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Jari Mousessian) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/27/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Jari Mousessian) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/27/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#2 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 09/27/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Jari Mousessian Case Number #11-47489, Chapter 13 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 09/01/2011 , Dismissed for Failure to File Information on 09/22/2011; Case Number #16-10505, Chapter 13 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 01/15/2016 , Dismissed for Other Reason on 03/25/2016; Case Number #13-16277, Chapter 13 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 03/11/2013 , Dismissed for Failure to File Information on 04/05/2013.(Admin) (Entered: 09/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Receipt of Chapter 13 Filing Fee - $310.00 by 71. Receipt Number 20222022. (admin) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling; filed by Debtor Jari Mousessian . (Milano, Sonny) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121); filed by Debtor Jari Mousessian . (Milano, Sonny) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/03/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 12/14/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1575, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 02/01/2018. (Milano, Sonny) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual - Fee Amount: $310.00; filed by Jari Mousessian - Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 10/10/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 10/10/2017. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 10/10/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 10/10/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 10/10/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 10/10/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 10/10/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 10/10/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 10/10/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 10/10/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 10/10/2017. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 10/10/2017. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 10/10/2017. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 10/10/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 10/10/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 10/10/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 10/10/2017. (Milano, Sonny) (Entered: 09/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.