This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2019 at 20:09:45 (UTC).

Gracee Arthur and Violet Z. Christopher

Case Summary

On 09/07/2017 Gracee Arthur and Violet Z Christopher was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Peter Carroll. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:17-BK-11622

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Peter Carroll

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Debtor

Violet Z. Christopher

Debtors

Gracee Arthur

Malibu, CA 90264

Violet Z. Christopher

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (ND)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Jeremy W. Faith (TR)

Encino, CA 91436

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul E Gold

Attorney at Dennis P Block & Assoc

5437 Laurel Canyon Blvd

Valley Village, CA 91607

Debtor Attorney

Nicholas M Wajda

Attorney at Wajda Law Group APC

11400 W Olympic Blvd Ste 200

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

6 #2

Ch 7 First Mtg I/J No POC

6 #1

Ch 7 First Mtg I/J No POC

#5

(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Gracee Arthur. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

#15

(#15) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#11 ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 7 (CACB AutoDischarge) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 12/29/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

#9

(#9) Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423) (Dacanay, Mayshiel) (Entered: 09/28/2017)

#13

(#13) Notice of motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations UNLAWFUL DETAINER RE: 26664 Seagull Way, Unit B-106, Malibu, CA 90265 . Fee Amount $181, Filed by Plaintiff Violet Z. Christopher (Gold, Paul) WARNING: See Docket entry no. 14 for corrective actions. Modified on 12/29/2017 (Bertelsen, Susan). (Entered: 12/29/2017)

#8

(#8) Request for special notice Filed by Creditor BMW Financial Services NA, LLC Department. (Barot, Bhagwati) (Entered: 09/12/2017)

#11

(#11) ORDER OF DISCHARGE (BNC) (Fleming, Lachelle) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Gracee Arthur. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Gracee Arthur (Wajda, Nicholas) CLERK'S NOTE: Case management system reflects Debtor's mailing address. Modified on 9/8/2017 (McNabb, Jim). (Entered: 09/07/2017)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)) No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 09/10/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/10/2017)

#2

(#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Gracee Arthur. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#11 ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 7 (CACB AutoDischarge) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 12/29/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Document was filed on a closed case. The court will not take any action on this document. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. (RE: related document(s)#13 Motion for Relief from Stay - Unlawful Detainer filed by Plaintiff Violet Z. Christopher) (Bertelsen, Susan) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay - Unlawful Detainer(9:17-bk-11622-PC) [motion,nmud] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 46201276. Fee amount 181.00. (re: Doc#13) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice of motion and motion for relief from the automatic stay with supporting declarations UNLAWFUL DETAINER RE: 26664 Seagull Way, Unit B-106, Malibu, CA 90265 . Fee Amount $181, Filed by Plaintiff Violet Z. Christopher (Gold, Paul) WARNING: See Docket entry no. 14 for corrective actions. Modified on 12/29/2017 (Bertelsen, Susan). (Entered: 12/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • (#12) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISCHARGE. Order of Discharge in the above referenced case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Auto Closed) (Fleming, Lachelle) (Entered: 12/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER OF DISCHARGE (BNC) (Fleming, Lachelle) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • (#10) Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Jeremy W. Faith (TR), having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 0.00, Assets Exempt: $ 3100.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 103313.98, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 103313.98. Debtor appeared.. (Faith (TR), Jeremy) (Entered: 10/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423) (Dacanay, Mayshiel) (Entered: 09/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for special notice Filed by Creditor BMW Financial Services NA, LLC Department. (Barot, Bhagwati) (Entered: 09/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)) No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 09/10/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/16/2017 at 09:00 AM at 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. Objections for Discharge due by 12/15/2017. Cert. of Financial Management due by 12/15/2017 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(9:17-bk-11622) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45539833. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Gracee Arthur. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Gracee Arthur. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Gracee Arthur. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Gracee Arthur. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Gracee Arthur (Wajda, Nicholas) CLERK'S NOTE: Case management system reflects Debtor's mailing address. Modified on 9/8/2017 (McNabb, Jim). (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.