This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:35:24 (UTC).

Gilbert Miguel Castro

Case Summary

On 06/29/2017 Gilbert Miguel Castro was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent P. Zurzolo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-BK-17973

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent P. Zurzolo

 

Party Details

Debtor

Gilbert Miguel Castro

Whittier, CA 90603

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Nicholas M Wajda

Attorney at Wajda Law Group APC

11400 W Olympic Blvd Ste 200

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Main Document

#10

No Description Available

#1

Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Gilbert Miguel Castro) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 7/13/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 7/13/2017. (Carranza, Shemainee) (Entered: 06/30/2017)

#14

No Description Available

#6

(#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Gilbert Miguel Castro. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/29/2017)

18 #2

Exhibit A,B,C

#9

No Description Available

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#20

No Description Available

#2

(#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Gilbert Miguel Castro. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/29/2017)

#17

No Description Available

#3

(#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Gilbert Miguel Castro. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/29/2017)

#7

No Description Available

#34

(#34) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#32

(#32) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#12

No Description Available

#33

(#33) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#23

No Description Available

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • (#35) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Ly, Lynn) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#30 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 07/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s) #24 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Pennington-Jones, Patricia) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#24 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) The Hearing date is set for 7/23/2018 at 10:30 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Vincent P. Zurzolo (Johnson, Tina R.) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect hearing date/time/location was selected. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING WITH CORRECT HEARING INFORMATION. (RE: related document(s)#27 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Gilbert Miguel Castro) (Johnson, Tina R.)CORRECTION: ENTERED DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR. MATTER SET FOR 7-23-18 AT 10:30 A.M.. Modified on 6/26/2018 (Johnson, Tina R.). (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Notice of Hearing Amended Filed by Debtor Gilbert Miguel Castro (RE: related document(s)#24 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case : Notice and Motion to Dismiss Chapter 13 Case/No Hearing Required. (Curry (TR), Nancy)). (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect docket event was used to file this document. Incorrect hearing date/time/location was selected. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING WITH CORRECT HEARING INFORMATION OF: 7-23-18 at 10:30 A.M.. (RE: related document(s)#25 Opposition filed by Debtor Gilbert Miguel Castro) (Johnson, Tina R.) (Entered: 06/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Gilbert Miguel Castro) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 7/13/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 7/13/2017. (Carranza, Shemainee) (Entered: 06/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Gilbert Miguel Castro Case Number #11-26693, Chapter 13 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 04/18/2011 , Standard Discharge on 12/08/2016.(Admin) (Entered: 06/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/26/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/19/2018 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 10/24/2017. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(2:17-bk-17973) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45114820. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Gilbert Miguel Castro. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Gilbert Miguel Castro. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Gilbert Miguel Castro. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Gilbert Miguel Castro. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Gilbert Miguel Castro. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Gilbert Miguel Castro (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.