This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 09/27/2021 at 06:55:27 (UTC).

Galena Pharmacy, LLC DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE. Jointly administered under 17-32186. This message does not apply to proofs of claims.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2017 Galena Pharmacy, LLC DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE Jointly administered under 17-32186 This message does not apply to proofs of claims was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 11 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Texas Southern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Marvin Isgur. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:17-BK-32222

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 11

Judge Details

Judge

Marvin Isgur

 

Party Details

Debtors

Galena Pharmacy, LLC DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE. Jointly administered under 17-32186. This message does not apply to proofs of claims.

Galena Pharmacy, LLC

10855 South Riverfront Parkway

South Jordan, UT 84095

Trustee

Ronald L Glass

Atlanta, GA 30326

Us Trustee

US Trustee

515 Rusk Ave, Ste 3516

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Elizabeth A Green

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

200 S. Orange Ave., Suntrust Center, Suite 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Declaration re: (Filed By Galena Pharmacy, LLC ).(Related document(s):#6 Schedule A/B, Schedule D - Creditors Holding Secured Claims, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, #7 Statement of Financial Affairs) (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual (Filed By Galena Pharmacy, LLC ). (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H Non-Individual- Codebtors and Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Filed By Galena Pharmacy, LLC ). (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BNC Certificate of Mailing. (Related document(s):#2 Order for Joint Administration) No. of Notices: 364. Notice Date 04/12/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration re: Electronic Filing of Bankruptcy Petition, Consolidated 20 Largest Unsecured List and Master Mailing List (Matrix) (Filed By Galena Pharmacy, LLC ).(Related document(s):#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)) (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Docket(#3) DO NOT DOCKET IN THIS CASE. An order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the joint administration of this case with the chapter 11 cases of Uplift Rx, LLC. The docket in the case of Uplift Rx LLC, Case No. 17-32186, should be consulted for all further documents filed and all matters affecting this case. (ltie) (Entered: 04/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order Granting Complex Case Treatment and Order Directing Joint Administration of Cases under Case No. 17-32186 Signed on 4/10/2017. (ltie) (Entered: 04/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2017
  • DocketReceipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(17-32222) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18900446. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 04/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Galena Pharmacy, LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 05/8/2017 (Green, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth A. Green