This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:37:24 (UTC).

Elizabeth Davis

Case Summary

On 09/22/2017 Elizabeth Davis was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott H. Yun. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:17-BK-17946

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Scott H. Yun

 

Party Details

Debtor

Elizabeth Davis

Moreno Valley, CA 92555

Trustees

Rod Danielson (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Rod (MH) Danielson (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Rod (MJ) Danielson (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

3801 University Avenue, Suite 720

Riverside, CA 92501-3200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Suzette Douglas

Attorney at Douglas Law Practice

14726 Ramona Ave, Ste 108

Chino, CA 91710

 

Court Documents

#1

Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(6:17-bk-17946) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45630467. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/22/2017)

#2

(#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis. (Douglas, Suzette) (Entered: 09/22/2017)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis. (Douglas, Suzette) (Entered: 09/22/2017)

#5

(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis. (Douglas, Suzette) (Entered: 09/22/2017)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis. (Douglas, Suzette) (Entered: 09/22/2017)

#7

(#64) Document/Hearing Held - CASE DISMISSED without prejudice - (RE: related document(s)#7 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis) (Jeanmarie, Cynthia) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

doc

(#70) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (RE: related document(s)#doc Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #8 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13, #15 Motion for Relief - Imposing a Stay or Continuing the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis, 34 Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) (by Trustee/US Trustee - No PDF) filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR)) (Jeanmarie, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#15

(#70) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (RE: related document(s)#doc Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #8 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13, #15 Motion for Relief - Imposing a Stay or Continuing the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis, 34 Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) (by Trustee/US Trustee - No PDF) filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR)) (Jeanmarie, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#8

(#70) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (RE: related document(s)#doc Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #8 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13, #15 Motion for Relief - Imposing a Stay or Continuing the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis, 34 Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) (by Trustee/US Trustee - No PDF) filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR)) (Jeanmarie, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#69

(#69) Proof of service Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (SY)) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#68

(#68) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (SY)) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#67

(#67) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (SY)) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#66

(#66) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Danielson (TR), Rod (SY)) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#65

(#65) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#63 ORDER and Notice of arising from Ch 13 db'd req. for vol. dism. (11 U.S.C. Sec. 1307(b)) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 07/26/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

#63

(#63) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from debtor's request for voluntary dismissal of chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307(b)) (RE: related document #62) - Debtor Dismissed. (BNC) (Tapia, Eileen) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

#64

(#64) Document/Hearing Held - CASE DISMISSED without prejudice - (RE: related document(s)#7 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis) (Jeanmarie, Cynthia) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#62

(#62) Debtor's Request for Voluntary Dismissal of Ch 13 Case Filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis. (Douglas, Suzette) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (RE: related document(s)#doc Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #8 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13, #15 Motion for Relief - Imposing a Stay or Continuing the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis, 34 Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) (by Trustee/US Trustee - No PDF) filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR)) (Jeanmarie, Cynthia) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) Proof of service Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (SY)) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (SY)) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (SY)) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Danielson (TR), Rod (SY)) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#63 ORDER and Notice of arising from Ch 13 db'd req. for vol. dism. (11 U.S.C. Sec. 1307(b)) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 07/26/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) Document/Hearing Held - CASE DISMISSED without prejudice - (RE: related document(s)#7 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis) (Jeanmarie, Cynthia) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from debtor's request for voluntary dismissal of chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307(b)) (RE: related document #62) - Debtor Dismissed. (BNC) (Tapia, Eileen) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) Debtor's Request for Voluntary Dismissal of Ch 13 Case Filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis. (Douglas, Suzette) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect docket event was used to file this document. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT USING THE CORRECT EVENT, i.e. BANKRUPTCY>BK-OTHER>VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF MOTION THEN REFILE USING: BANKRUPTCY>OTHER>DEBTOR'S REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CH 13 CASE (RE: related document(s)#60 Dismiss Debtor filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis) (Tapia, Eileen) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2017
  • Judge Meredith A. Jury added to case due to prior related cases 16-16268 MJ and 16-19283 MJ. Involvement of Judge Mark D. Houle Terminated (Cargill, Rita) (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/26/2017 at 08:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 10/26/2017 at 12:30 PM at Crtrm 303, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 01/24/2018. (Douglas, Suzette) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2017 (Cargill, Rita). WARNING: Notice not generated thru BNC due to Judge reassignment. See docket entry no 8 for correct notice. Modified on 9/22/2017 (Cargill, Rita). (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(6:17-bk-17946) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45630467. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) Filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis. (Douglas, Suzette) (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis. (Douglas, Suzette) (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis. (Douglas, Suzette) (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis. (Douglas, Suzette) (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis. (Douglas, Suzette) (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Elizabeth Davis. (Douglas, Suzette) (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Elizabeth Davis (Douglas, Suzette) WARNING: See docket entry no. 9 for corrective actions. Modified on 9/22/2017 (Cargill, Rita). (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.