This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:36:16 (UTC).

Devin Smith

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 Devin Smith was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Julia W. Brand. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-BK-19609

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Julia W. Brand

 

Party Details

Debtor

Devin Smith

Duarte, CA 91010

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Barry E Borowitz

Attorney at Borowitz & Clark LLP

100 N Barranca Ave Ste 250

West Covina, CA 91791-1600

Michael E Clark

Attorney at Borowitz & Clark LLP

100 N Barranca Ave Ste 250

West Covina, CA 91791-1600

 

Court Documents

#1

Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(2:17-bk-19609) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45338578. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

#2

(#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) Filed by Debtor Devin Smith. (Clark, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

#3

(#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Devin Smith. (Clark, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Devin Smith. (Clark, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Devin Smith. (Clark, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

#10

(#37) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#10 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #12 Motion for Relief - Imposing a Stay or Continuing the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Devin Smith, #31 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Bryant, Sandra R.) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#7

(#7) Debtor's notice of section 341(a) meeting and hearing on confirmation of chapter 13 plan with copy of chapter 13 plan Filed by Debtor Devin Smith. (Clark, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2017)

#41

(#41) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#40

(#40) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#39

(#39) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#37

(#37) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#10 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #12 Motion for Relief - Imposing a Stay or Continuing the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Devin Smith, #31 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Bryant, Sandra R.) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#38

(#38) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#37 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 07/18/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#12

(#37) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#10 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #12 Motion for Relief - Imposing a Stay or Continuing the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Devin Smith, #31 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Bryant, Sandra R.) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#31

Hearing (Bk Motion) Continued (RE: related document(s) #31 TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS CASE (BATCH) ) Hearing to be held on 07/11/2018 at 01:30 PM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1375 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for #31 , (Bryant, Sandra R.) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

#36

(#36) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#35 Order on Application for Compensation (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/04/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/04/2018)

#35

(#35) Order Granting Application For Compensation (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #30) for Barry E Borowitz, fees awarded: $333.00, expenses awarded: $ Signed on 5/2/2018. (Kaaumoana, William) (Entered: 05/02/2018)

#30

(#34) Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) Filed by Debtor Devin Smith (RE: related document(s)#30 Application for Compensation for Supplemental Fees for Barry E Borowitz, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 11/8/2017 to 3/27/2018, Fee: $333.00, Expenses: $.). (Borowitz, Barry) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • (#42) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Ly, Lynn) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#37 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 07/18/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#10 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #12 Motion for Relief - Imposing a Stay or Continuing the Automatic Stay filed by Debtor Devin Smith, #31 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Bryant, Sandra R.) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing (Bk Motion) Continued (RE: related document(s) #31 TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS CASE (BATCH) ) Hearing to be held on 07/11/2018 at 01:30 PM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1375 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for #31 , (Bryant, Sandra R.) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#35 Order on Application for Compensation (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/04/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Order Granting Application For Compensation (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #30) for Barry E Borowitz, fees awarded: $333.00, expenses awarded: $ Signed on 5/2/2018. (Kaaumoana, William) (Entered: 05/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) Filed by Debtor Devin Smith (RE: related document(s)#30 Application for Compensation for Supplemental Fees for Barry E Borowitz, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 11/8/2017 to 3/27/2018, Fee: $333.00, Expenses: $.). (Borowitz, Barry) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Debtor's notice of section 341(a) meeting and hearing on confirmation of chapter 13 plan with copy of chapter 13 plan Filed by Debtor Devin Smith. (Clark, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Devin Smith Case Number #17-14390, Chapter 13 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 04/10/2017 , Dismissed for Other Reason on 07/19/2017.(Admin) (Entered: 08/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 09/05/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 10/11/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1375, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 12/04/2017. (Clark, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(2:17-bk-19609) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45338578. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Devin Smith. (Clark, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Devin Smith. (Clark, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Devin Smith. (Clark, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Devin Smith. (Clark, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) Filed by Debtor Devin Smith. (Clark, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Devin Smith (Clark, Michael) (Entered: 08/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.