This case was last updated from PACER on 03/12/2021 at 23:16:11 (UTC).

Darcy L. LaPier

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 Darcy L LaPier was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Florida Middle Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen S. Jennemann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-BK-03643

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

Judge Details

Judge

Karen S. Jennemann

 

Party Details

Debtor

Darcy L. LaPier

Newberg, OR 97132

Us Trustee

United States Trustee - ORL7/13

George C Young Federal Building, 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

Trustee

Marie E. Henkel

Orlando, FL 32806

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Walter J Snell

Attorney at Snell & Snell, P.A.

436 N Peninsula Drive

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Trustee Attorneys

Lydia R Webb

Attorney at Gray Reed McGraw LLP

1601 Elm Street Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

Kristen Henkel

Attorney at M.E. Henkel, P.A.

3560 S Magnolia Avenue

Orlando, FL 32806

Amber M Carson

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw LLP

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

Micheal W Bishop

Attorney at Gray Read & McGraw, LLP

1601 Elm Street, Suite 4600

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#87

(#87) Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy or Settlement Agreement. Related Case and Parties: 6:20-ap-00038-KSJ; Marie E. Henkel, Chapter 7 Trustee and Sterling Rice. Contains negative notice.. Filed by Micheal W Bishop on behalf of Trustee Marie E. Henkel (Bishop, Micheal) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

86 #2

Mailing Matrix

86 #1

Main Document

#85

(#85) Order Approving Motion To Sell Estates Interest in Personal Property, Titled Vehicles, Horses and Financial Accounts, (Related Doc #84). Service Instructions: Marie E. Henkel is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Coleman-Giddens, Faye) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

84 #4

Mailing Matrix

84 #3

Exhibit B

84 #2

Exhibit A

84 #1

Main Document

#83

(#83) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc #82)). Notice Date 11/07/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/08/2020)

#82

(#82) Notice of Denial of Discharge as to Debtor . (Adrienne) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#8

(#8) DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Wrong Case). NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS DOCUMENT. Amended Summary of Assets , Schedule I,Schedule J, Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required., Declaration re: About an Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Walter J Snell on behalf of Debtor Darcy L. LaPier. (Snell, Walter) Modified on 07/05/2018 (Heather) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc #5)). Notice Date 06/21/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

#6

(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #4)). Notice Date 06/21/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

#5

(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc #5)). Notice Date 06/21/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

#4

(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #4)). Notice Date 06/21/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: 05/16/2018. Filed by Walter J Snell on behalf of Debtor Darcy L. LaPier. (Snell, Walter) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7. (Fee Paid.). Schedules A-H and Summary of Assets. Statement of Financial Affairs. Disclosure of Compensation. Statement of Income and Means Test Calculation. Filed by Walter J Snell on behalf of Darcy L. LaPier. (Snell, Walter) Modified on 6/19/2018 (Ahyen). (Entered: 06/18/2018)

95 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) Motion to Approve Compromise of Controversy or Settlement Agreement. Related Case and Parties: 6:20-ap-00038-KSJ; Marie E. Henkel, Chapter 7 Trustee and Sterling Rice. Contains negative notice.. Filed by Micheal W Bishop on behalf of Trustee Marie E. Henkel (Bishop, Micheal) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) Proof of Service of Order approving sale of personal property, horses, titled vehicles and financial accounts. Filed by Trustee Marie E. Henkel (related document(s)#85). (Attachments: #1 Mailing Matrix) (Henkel, Marie E.) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Order Approving Motion To Sell Estates Interest in Personal Property, Titled Vehicles, Horses and Financial Accounts, (Related Doc #84). Service Instructions: Marie E. Henkel is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Coleman-Giddens, Faye) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Motion to Sell. Property description: personal property, titled vehicles, horses & financial accounts. (with 21 days' negative notice). Contains negative notice. Filed by Trustee Marie E. Henkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Mailing Matrix) (Henkel, Marie E.) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAdversary Case 6:18-ap-107 Closed. (Scott) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAdversary Case 6:19-ap-193 Closed. (Adrienne) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc #82)). Notice Date 11/07/2020. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Notice of Denial of Discharge as to Debtor . (Adrienne) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Interim Report Filed by Trustee Marie E. Henkel. (Henkel, Marie E.) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) Certificate of Service Re: Order Approving Settlement with Debtor and Debtor Related Entities. Filed by Micheal W Bishop on behalf of Trustee Marie E. Henkel (related document(s)#79). (Bishop, Micheal) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Wrong Case). NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS DOCUMENT. Amended Summary of Assets , Schedule I,Schedule J, Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required., Declaration re: About an Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Walter J Snell on behalf of Debtor Darcy L. LaPier. (Snell, Walter) Modified on 07/05/2018 (Heather) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest (related document(s) (Related Doc #5)). Notice Date 06/21/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. (related document(s) (Related Doc #4)). Notice Date 06/21/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Deficient Filing. Schedule I,J . (Ahyen) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, and Fixing Deadlines . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/24/2018 at 09:00 AM at Orlando, FL (688) Suite 1202A, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 West Washington Street. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 9/24/2018. (Ahyen) (Entered: 06/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketAssignment of the Honorable Cynthia C. Jackson, Bankruptcy Judge to this case. The Trustee appointed to this case is Marie E. Henkel . (autojtr-orl, orl) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketReceipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(6:18-bk-03643) [misc,volp7a2] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 57423060, Amount Paid $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: 05/16/2018. Filed by Walter J Snell on behalf of Debtor Darcy L. LaPier. (Snell, Walter) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Debtors Social Security Numbers Filed by Walter J Snell on behalf of Debtor Darcy L. LaPier. (Snell, Walter) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7. (Fee Paid.). Schedules A-H and Summary of Assets. Statement of Financial Affairs. Disclosure of Compensation. Statement of Income and Means Test Calculation. Filed by Walter J Snell on behalf of Darcy L. LaPier. (Snell, Walter) Modified on 6/19/2018 (Ahyen). (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lydia Rogers Webb