This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:36:47 (UTC).

Daniel L. Kenton

Case Summary

On 08/29/2017 Daniel L Kenton was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark S Wallace. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:17-BK-13454

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Mark S Wallace

 

Party Details

Debtor

Daniel L. Kenton

San Clemente, CA 92673

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SA)

411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4593

Trustee

Amrane (SA) Cohen (TR)

Orange, CA 92868

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Joseph A Weber

1503 South Coast Dr, Ste 209

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Fritz J Firman

Attorney at Weber Firman

1503 S Coast Dr, Ste 209

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#16

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#31

No Description Available

#37

(#37) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#35 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 22. Notice Date 07/14/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/14/2018)

#10

(#10) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/03/2017 at 11:00 AM at RM 1-154, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/08/2017 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Proof of Claim due by 01/02/2018. (Weber, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Daniel L. Kenton. (Weber, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

#4

(#4) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Daniel L. Kenton. (Weber, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

#30

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#2

(#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) Filed by Debtor Daniel L. Kenton. (Weber, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

#14

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#8

(#8) Debtor's notice of section 341(a) meeting and hearing on confirmation of chapter 13 plan with copy of chapter 13 plan Filed by Debtor Daniel L. Kenton. (Weber, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • (#42) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Le, James) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Proof of service Filed by (RE: related document(s)#40 Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)). (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA)) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA)) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) Filed by. (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA)) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Cohen (TR), Amrane (SA)) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#35 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 22. Notice Date 07/14/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s#32 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 07/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Hearing Held (RE: related document(s)#32 Hearing RE: Trustee's Verified Motion For Order Dismissing Chapter 13 Proceeding For Failure To Make Plan Payments) MOTION GRANTED - CASE DISMISS (Le, James) (Entered: 07/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#32 Trustees Verified Motion For Order Dismissing Chapter 13 Proceeding (11 U.S.C. 1307(c) (batch)) The Hearing date is set for 7/11/2018 at 03:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Mark S Wallace (Bolte, Nickie) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Opposition to (related document(s): #32 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case failure to make plan payments) Filed by Debtor Daniel L. Kenton (Weber, Joseph) (Entered: 04/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Debtor's notice of section 341(a) meeting and hearing on confirmation of chapter 13 plan with copy of chapter 13 plan Filed by Debtor Daniel L. Kenton. (Weber, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/03/2017 at 11:00 AM at RM 1-154, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/08/2017 at 02:00 PM at Crtrm 6C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. Proof of Claim due by 01/02/2018. (Weber, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(8:17-bk-13454) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45481596. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Daniel L. Kenton. (Weber, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Daniel L. Kenton. (Weber, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Daniel L. Kenton. (Weber, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Daniel L. Kenton. (Weber, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Daniel L. Kenton. (Weber, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) Filed by Debtor Daniel L. Kenton. (Weber, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Daniel L. Kenton (Weber, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.