This case was last updated from PACER on 11/28/2018 at 15:22:59 (UTC).

Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Sheri Bluebond. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-BK-17502

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Sheri Bluebond

 

Party Details

Debtor

Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo

Paramount, CA 90723

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Jason M Rund (TR)

El Segundo, CA 90245

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Raymond Perez

8607 Imperial Hwy Ste 100

Downey, CA 90242

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423) (Wunsch, Ben) (Entered: 07/23/2017)

#2

(#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo. (Perez, Raymond) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

#6

(#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo. (Perez, Raymond) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

#8

(#8) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Smith, Valerie. (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

#7

(#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/31/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 09/29/2017. Cert. of Financial Management due by 09/29/2017 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Perez, Raymond) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

#1

(#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo (Perez, Raymond) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

#12

(#12) ORDER OF DISCHARGE (BNC) (Gomez, Andrea) (Entered: 10/10/2017)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo. (Perez, Raymond) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

#9

(#9) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 06/23/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

#5

(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo. (Perez, Raymond) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

#11

(#11) Certification About a Financial Management Course for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423) Filed by Debtor Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo. (Perez, Raymond) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

#14

(#14) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#12 ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 7 (CACB AutoDischarge) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 10/12/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/12/2017)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#12 ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 7 (CACB AutoDischarge) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 10/12/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • (#13) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISCHARGE. Order of Discharge in the above referenced case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Auto Closed) (Gomez, Andrea) (Entered: 10/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER OF DISCHARGE (BNC) (Gomez, Andrea) (Entered: 10/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Jason M Rund (TR), having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Pursuant to Fed R Bank P 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Available, Assets Exempt: $ 4130.00, Claims Scheduled: Not Available, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Available. Filed by Trustee Jason M Rund (TR) (RE: related document(s)#7 Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/31/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 09/29/2017. Cert. of Financial Management due by 09/29/2017 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case)). (Rund (TR), Jason) (Entered: 08/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Certification About a Financial Management Course for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423) Filed by Debtor Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo. (Perez, Raymond) (Entered: 07/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Personal Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor 1 (Official Form 423) (Wunsch, Ben) (Entered: 07/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#7 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 7)) No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 06/23/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Smith, Valerie. (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo. (Perez, Raymond) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 07/31/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Objections for Discharge due by 09/29/2017. Cert. of Financial Management due by 09/29/2017 for Debtor and Joint Debtor (if joint case) (Perez, Raymond) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:17-bk-17502) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45051699. Fee amount 335.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo. (Perez, Raymond) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo. (Perez, Raymond) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo. (Perez, Raymond) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo. (Perez, Raymond) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Cynthia Sanchez Vallejo (Perez, Raymond) (Entered: 06/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.