This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:32:40 (UTC).

Claudia Alfaro

Case Summary

On 03/06/2017 Claudia Alfaro was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Neil W. Bason. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-BK-12610

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Neil W. Bason

 

Party Details

Debtor

Claudia Alfaro

Los Angeles, CA 90037

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Kathy A Dockery (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Nicholas M Wajda

Attorney at Wajda Law Group APC

11400 W Olympic Blvd Ste 200

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) Filed by. (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#46

(#46) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#35

No Description Available

#31

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

21 #2

Chapter 13 Plan

21 #1

Main Document

#16

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #3

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

#1

Main Document

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • (#49) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Vandensteen, Nancy) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) Filed by. (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#44 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 07/13/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), 19 Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Rule 2003(e)) (by Trustee/US Trustee - No PDF), #39 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments) (Sumlin, Sharon E.) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) Notice of intent to pay claims . (Dockery (TR), Kathy) (Entered: 06/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) Hearing Held on 4/5/2018 at 11:00 AM. CONTINUED to 6/8/2018 at 11:00 AM. (related docket entry #39 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by (Dockery (TR), Kathy)) (Francis, Dawnette) (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) Hearing Held on 3/8/2018 at 11:00 AM. CONTINUED to 4/5/2018 at 11:00 AM (final continuance) (related docket entry #39 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by (Dockery (TR), Kathy)) (Francis, Dawnette) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Hearing Held on 2/8/2018 at 11:00 AM. CONTINUED to 3/8/2018 at 11:00 AM (related docket entry #39 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by (Dockery (TR), Kathy)) (Francis, Dawnette) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Claudia Alfaro) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/09/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 03/09/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Claudia Alfaro Case Number #17-10928, Chapter 13 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 01/26/2017 , Dismissed for Failure to File Information on 02/13/2017.(Admin) (Entered: 03/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/07/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 04/27/2017 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 07/06/2017. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(2:17-bk-12610) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44365156. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 03/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Claudia Alfaro (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)). (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Claudia Alfaro. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Claudia Alfaro. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Claudia Alfaro. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Claudia Alfaro Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 03/20/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 03/20/2017. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 03/20/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 03/20/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 03/20/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 03/20/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 03/20/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 03/20/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 03/20/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 03/20/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 03/20/2017. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 03/20/2017. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 03/20/2017. Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income (Form 122C-2) Due: 03/20/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 03/20/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 03/20/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 03/20/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 03/20/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 03/20/2017. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less