This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:36:22 (UTC).

Christian Giovanni Pilona

Case Summary

On 08/08/2017 Christian Giovanni Pilona was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin R. Barash. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-BK-12103

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Martin R. Barash

 

Party Details

Debtor

Christian Giovanni Pilona

Arleta, CA 91331

Trustee

Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas (TR)

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (SV)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Kevin T Simon

Attorney at Law Offices of Kevin T. Simon, APC

21241 Ventura Blvd., Suite 253

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

 

Court Documents

#1

Main Document

1 #2

Case Com Def Notice

1 #3

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#2

(#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Christian Giovanni Pilona. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

#3

(#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Christian Giovanni Pilona. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Christian Giovanni Pilona. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#59) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #52 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments) (Ogier, Kathy) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 08/11/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/11/2017)

#66

(#66) Proof of service Filed by Trustee Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas (TR). (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#65

(#65) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#64

(#64) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) Filed by Trustee Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas (TR). (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#63

(#63) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#62

(#62) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#59 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 07/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#59

(#59) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #52 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments) (Ogier, Kathy) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#61

(#61) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#60 Notice of dismissal (BNC)) No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 07/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#60

(#60) Notice of dismissal (BNC) (Ogier, Kathy) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#52

(#59) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #52 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments) (Ogier, Kathy) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • (#67) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Bever, Sabine) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) Proof of service Filed by Trustee Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas (TR). (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) Filed by Trustee Elizabeth (SV) F Rojas (TR). (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Rojas (TR), Elizabeth (SV)) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#59 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 07/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#60 Notice of dismissal (BNC)) No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 07/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) Notice of dismissal (BNC) (Ogier, Kathy) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #52 Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments) (Ogier, Kathy) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) Notice of Change of Address . (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 06/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Christian Giovanni Pilona) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/11/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 08/11/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Christian Giovanni Pilona Case Number #11-23868, Chapter 13 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 12/01/2011 , Standard Discharge on 04/20/2017.(Admin) (Entered: 08/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 09/20/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 100, 21041 Burbank Blvd., Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6003. Confirmation hearing to be held on 11/02/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 303, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. Proof of Claim due by 12/19/2017. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(1:17-bk-12103) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45359046. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Christian Giovanni Pilona. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Christian Giovanni Pilona. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Christian Giovanni Pilona. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Christian Giovanni Pilona. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Christian Giovanni Pilona Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 08/22/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 08/22/2017. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 08/22/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 08/22/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 08/22/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 08/22/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 08/22/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 08/22/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 08/22/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 08/22/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 08/22/2017. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 08/22/2017. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 08/22/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 08/22/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 08/22/2017. (Simon, Kevin) (Entered: 08/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.