This case was last updated from U.S. Bankruptcy Courts on 11/09/2018 at 22:52:54 (UTC).

Chad O'Dell Bell and Tiffany Hope Bell

Case Summary

On 09/01/2017 Chad O'Dell Bell and Tiffany Hope Bell was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 7 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, Georgia Northern Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul W. Bonapfel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-BK-65486

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 7

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Paul W. Bonapfel

 

Party Details

Debtors

Chad O'Dell Bell

Riverdale, GA 30274

Tiffany Hope Bell

Riverdale, GA 30274

Us Trustee

Office of the United States Trustee

362 Richard Russell Building, 75 Ted Turner Drive, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30303

Trustee

Cathy L. Scarver

Marietta, GA 30006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Karen King

Attorney at King & King Law LLC

215 Pryor Street, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) Letter to Debtor Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees (Admin.)

#29

(#29) Order Discharging Trustee and Closing Estate. Service by BNC. Entered on 11/28/2017. (ysg)

#27

(#27) Order Dismissing Ch. 7 Case - Failure to Appear at Meeting of Creditors. Service by BNC Entered on 11/9/2017. (related document(s)#25) (yl)

#26

(#26) Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time Notice Date 11/08/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/09/2017)

#25

(#25) Report of debtor's failure to appear at meeting of creditors and requesting dismissal - with Certificate of Service. Filed by Cathy L. Scarver on behalf of Cathy L. Scarver. (Scarver, Cathy)

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#8

(#8) Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7 - Individual - No Asset). 341 Meeting to be held on 10/03/2017 at 01:00 PM at Hearing Room 367, Atlanta. Objections for Discharge due by 12/04/2017. Financial Management Course due: 11/17/2017. Financial Management Course for Joint Debtor due: 11/17/2017. (Admin.)

#7

(#10) Order Granting Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments. Service by BNC. Entered on 9/5/2017. (related document(s)#7) (jsc)

#6

(#6) Payment Advices of Debtor 2, filed by Karen King on behalf of Tiffany Hope Bell. (King, Karen)

#4

(#4) Credit Counseling Service Certificate filed by Karen King on behalf of Tiffany Hope Bell. (King, Karen)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Letter to Debtor Regarding Outstanding Filing Fee Notice Date 12/17/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Letter to Debtor Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees (Admin.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate Notice Date 11/30/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Case Closed (ysg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Order Discharging Trustee and Closing Estate. Service by BNC. Entered on 11/28/2017. (ysg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Cathy L. Scarver, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that this case was dismissed or converted. I have neither received any property nor paid any monies on account of this estate. I hereby certify that the chapter 7 estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered through the date of conversion or dismissal. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. No party in interest has filed a request for an order of dismissal pursuant to 11 USC 521(i)(2). Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 0 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: Not Applicable, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. Filed by Cathy L. Scarver on behalf of Cathy L. Scarver. (Scarver, Cathy)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Dismissing Case Notice Date 11/11/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Order Dismissing Ch. 7 Case - Failure to Appear at Meeting of Creditors. Service by BNC Entered on 11/9/2017. (related document(s)#25) (yl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time Notice Date 11/08/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Report of debtor's failure to appear at meeting of creditors and requesting dismissal - with Certificate of Service. Filed by Cathy L. Scarver on behalf of Cathy L. Scarver. (Scarver, Cathy)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Order Granting Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments. Service by BNC. Entered on 9/5/2017. (related document(s)#7) (jsc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(17-65486) [misc,1011aty] ( 75.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 45802644. Fee Amount 75.00 (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7 - Individual - No Asset). 341 Meeting to be held on 10/03/2017 at 01:00 PM at Hearing Room 367, Atlanta. Objections for Discharge due by 12/04/2017. Financial Management Course due: 11/17/2017. Financial Management Course for Joint Debtor due: 11/17/2017. (Admin.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments filed by Karen King on behalf of Chad O'Dell Bell, Tiffany Hope Bell. (King, Karen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Payment Advices of Debtor 2, filed by Karen King on behalf of Tiffany Hope Bell. (King, Karen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Payment Advices of Debtor, filed by Karen King on behalf of Chad O'Dell Bell. (King, Karen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Credit Counseling Service Certificate filed by Karen King on behalf of Tiffany Hope Bell. (King, Karen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Credit Counseling Service Certificate filed by Karen King on behalf of Chad O'Dell Bell. (King, Karen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Statement of Social Security Number (Official Form B121) (Document is restricted and can only be viewed by Court staff.) filed by Karen King on behalf of Chad O'Dell Bell, Tiffany Hope Bell. (King, Karen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) for Individual(s) Fee $ 75, Filed by Karen King of King & King Law LLC on behalf of Chad O'Dell Bell, Tiffany Hope Bell. Government Proof of Claim due by 2/28/2018. (King, Karen)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen King Esq.