This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:37:19 (UTC).

Arturo Olvera

Case Summary

On 09/19/2017 Arturo Olvera was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark D. Houle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:17-BK-17861

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Mark D. Houle

 

Party Details

Debtor

Arturo Olvera

San Bernardino, CA 92407

Trustees

Rod Danielson (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Rod (MH) Danielson (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

3801 University Avenue, Suite 720

Riverside, CA 92501-3200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

William Radcliffe

Attorney at Law Offices of William Radcliffe

4195 Chino Hills Pkwy #377

Chino Hills, CA 91709

 

Court Documents

#18

No Description Available

#5

(#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera. (Radcliffe, William) (Entered: 09/19/2017)

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#9

No Description Available

#34

(#34) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #31 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Mohammad, Sandy) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER to comply with bankruptcy rule 1007/3015(b) and notice of intent to dismiss case (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera) (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/20/2017)

#2

(#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera. (Radcliffe, William) (Entered: 09/19/2017)

#15

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#1

(#7) ORDER to comply with bankruptcy rule 1007/3015(b) and notice of intent to dismiss case (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera) (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/20/2017)

#36

(#36) Motion to vacate dismissal Filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera (Radcliffe, William) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#16

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#31

(#31) Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case . (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 06/04/2018)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Hearing Held - Off Calendar - Withdrawn. (RE: related document(s)#36 Motion to vacate dismissal filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera) (Cargill, Rita) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Trustee's Comments on or Objection to Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR) (RE: related document(s)#36 Motion to vacate dismissal Filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera). (Danielson (TR), Rod) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#36 Motion to vacate dismissal filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera) The Hearing date is set for 9/27/2018 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 303, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Mark D. Houle (Cargill, Rita) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Motion to vacate dismissal Filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera (Radcliffe, William) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#34 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 07/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #31 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Mohammad, Sandy) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Hearing Held granted - order by attorney (RE: related document(s)#31 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Mohammad, Sandy) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#31 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) The Hearing date is set for 7/23/2018 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 303, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Mark D. Houle (Sandoval, Rosanna) (Entered: 06/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case . (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 06/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2017
  • Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Arturo Olvera Case Number #10-27018, Chapter 7 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 06/02/2010 , Standard Discharge on 02/03/2011.(Admin) (Entered: 09/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER to comply with bankruptcy rule 1007/3015(b) and notice of intent to dismiss case (BNC) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera) (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Case Commencement Deficiency Deadlines (def/deforco) (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera) Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 10/3/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 10/3/2017. (Romero, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/26/2017 at 08:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 10/26/2017 at 12:30 PM at Crtrm 303, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 01/24/2018. (Radcliffe, William) (Entered: 09/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(6:17-bk-17861) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45610007. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 09/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera. (Radcliffe, William) (Entered: 09/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera. (Radcliffe, William) (Entered: 09/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera. (Radcliffe, William) (Entered: 09/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Arturo Olvera. (Radcliffe, William) (Entered: 09/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Arturo Olvera (Radcliffe, William) WARNING: See docket entry #7 and 8 for corrections. Case deficient for Chapter 13 Plan due 10/3/17. Modified on 9/20/2017 (Romero, Kimberly). Modified on 9/20/2017 (Romero, Kimberly). (Entered: 09/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.