This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:36:27 (UTC).

Armando Montoya, Jr. and Isabel Anne Montoya

Case Summary

On 08/14/2017 Armando Montoya, Jr and Isabel Anne Montoya was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark D. Houle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:17-BK-16759

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Mark D. Houle

 

Party Details

Debtors

Armando Montoya, Jr.

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91701

Isabel Anne Montoya

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91701

Trustees

Rod Danielson (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Rod (MJ) Danielson (TR)

Riverside, CA 92501

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (RS)

3801 University Avenue, Suite 720

Riverside, CA 92501-3200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Aruna P Rodrigo

Attorney at Rodrigo Law Firm

10390 Commerce Center Drive, Ste 130

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

 

Court Documents

#24

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#28

(#29) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#28 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) The Hearing date is set for 7/23/2018 at 01:00PM at Crtrm 303, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The hearing judge is Mark D. Houle (Cargill, Rita) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#19

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#4

(#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Armando Montoya Jr.. (Rodrigo, Aruna) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

#23

No Description Available

#35

(#35) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#16

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#8

(#8) Declaration RE Filing of Tax Returns and Payment of Domestic Support Obligations (Preconfirmation) Filed by Debtor Armando Montoya Jr., Joint Debtor Isabel Anne Montoya. (Rodrigo, Aruna) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

#34

(#34) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#26

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#5

(#5) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor Isabel Anne Montoya. (Rodrigo, Aruna) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • (#38) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Mason, Shari) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Proof of service Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account Filed by Trustee Rod Danielson (TR). (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted . (Danielson (TR), Rod (MH)) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#32 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 28. Notice Date 07/27/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Both Debtors Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s)#13 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13), #10 Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) filed by Debtor Armando Montoya, Joint Debtor Isabel Anne Montoya, #28 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Mohammad, Sandy) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Hearing Held - granted - order by attorney (RE: related document(s)#28 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) (Mohammad, Sandy) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • (#30) In accordance with the Administrative Order 18-02 dated 3/26/18, this case is hereby reassigned from Judge Meredith A. Jury to Judge Mark D. Houle. (Eudy, Debra) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)#28 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)) The Hearing date is set for 7/23/2018 at 01:00PM at Crtrm 303, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The hearing judge is Mark D. Houle (Cargill, Rita) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Declaration RE Filing of Tax Returns and Payment of Domestic Support Obligations (Preconfirmation) Filed by Debtor Armando Montoya Jr., Joint Debtor Isabel Anne Montoya. (Rodrigo, Aruna) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 09/25/2017 at 08:00 AM at RM 101, 3801 University Ave., Riverside, CA 92501. Confirmation hearing to be held on 09/25/2017 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 301, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. Proof of Claim due by 12/26/2017. (Rodrigo, Aruna) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(6:17-bk-16759) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45386918. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Debtor(s) Received Income From an Employer Within 60 Days of Petition (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Armando Montoya Jr., Joint Debtor Isabel Anne Montoya. (Rodrigo, Aruna) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Armando Montoya Jr., Joint Debtor Isabel Anne Montoya. (Rodrigo, Aruna) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joint Debtor Isabel Anne Montoya. (Rodrigo, Aruna) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Armando Montoya Jr.. (Rodrigo, Aruna) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rights and responsibilities agreement between chapter 13 debtors and their attorneys Filed by Debtor Armando Montoya Jr., Joint Debtor Isabel Anne Montoya. (Rodrigo, Aruna) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Armando Montoya Jr., Joint Debtor Isabel Anne Montoya. (Rodrigo, Aruna) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Armando Montoya Jr., Isabel Anne Montoya (Rodrigo, Aruna) (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.