This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 06:36:37 (UTC).

Alfred M Velina

Case Summary

On 08/17/2017 Alfred M Velina was filed as a Bankruptcy - Chapter 13 lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Bankruptcy Courts, California Central Bankruptcy. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent P. Zurzolo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-BK-20115

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Chapter 13

  • Court:

    U.S. Bankruptcy Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent P. Zurzolo

 

Party Details

Debtor

Alfred M Velina

Glendale, CA 91205

Us Trustee

United States Trustee (LA)

915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Trustee

Nancy K Curry (TR)

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorney

Thomas B Ure

Attorney at Ure Law Firm

800 West 6Th Street, Ste. 940

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Ord to comply-BR1007/3015

#1

Main Document

1 #3

Case Com Def Notice

#2

(#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Alfred M Velina. (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2017)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Alfred M Velina. (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2017)

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 08/20/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/20/2017)

#5

(#5) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Smith, Valerie. (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 08/18/2017)

#7

(#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 08/20/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/20/2017)

#54

(#54) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#53

(#53) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#52

(#52) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#50

(#50) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s) #31) Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch), (Pennington-Jones, Patricia) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

#51

(#51) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#50 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 07/26/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

#31

(#50) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s) #31) Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch), (Pennington-Jones, Patricia) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

#48

(#48) Order Granting Application For Compensation (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #45) for Thomas B Ure, fees awarded: $1,619.50, expenses awarded: $36.96 Signed on 7/16/2018. (Pennington-Jones, Patricia) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#49

(#49) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#48 Order on Application for Compensation (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/18/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#45

(#46) Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)) Filed by Debtor Alfred M Velina (RE: related document(s)#45 Application for Compensation Application of Attorney for Debtor for Additional Fees and Related Expenses In A Pending Chapter 13 Case Subject to A Rights and Responsibilities Agreement (RARA) [11 U.S.C. 330(a)(4)(B); LBR 3015-1(v)(2)] for Thomas B Ure, Debtor's Attorney, Period: to, Fee: $1,619.50, Expenses: $36.96. Filed by Debtor Alfred M Velina). (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • (#55) Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISMISSED. An Order dismissing this case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required and that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. (Garcia, Elaine L.) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account . (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) Declaration re: non-receipt of obj to trustee's final report (Dismissed/Converted Chapter 13 Cases) with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) Notice of Intent to File Trustees Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 Dismissed/Converted with proof of service Filed by Trustee Nancy K Curry (TR). (Curry (TR), Nancy) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#50 ORDER and Notice of Dismissal arising from Motion to dism Ch 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) (BNC)) No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 07/26/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) ORDER and Notice of dismissal arising from Motion to dismiss chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. Section 1307) - Debtor Dismissed.(BNC) (RE: related document(s) #31) Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch), (Pennington-Jones, Patricia) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. (RE: related document(s)#48 Order on Application for Compensation (BNC-PDF)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/18/2018. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) Order Granting Application For Compensation (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #45) for Thomas B Ure, fees awarded: $1,619.50, expenses awarded: $36.96 Signed on 7/16/2018. (Pennington-Jones, Patricia) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) Filed by Debtor Alfred M Velina (RE: related document(s)#45 Application for Compensation Application of Attorney for Debtor for Additional Fees and Related Expenses In A Pending Chapter 13 Case Subject to A Rights and Responsibilities Agreement (RARA) [11 U.S.C. 330(a)(4)(B); LBR 3015-1(v)(2)] f). (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) Notice of Opportunity To Request a Hearing On Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)) Filed by Debtor Alfred M Velina (RE: related document(s)#45 Application for Compensation Application of Attorney for Debtor for Additional Fees and Related Expenses In A Pending Chapter 13 Case Subject to A Rights and Responsibilities Agreement (RARA) [11 U.S.C. 330(a)(4)(B); LBR 3015-1(v)(2)] for Thomas B Ure, Debtor's Attorney, Period: to, Fee: $1,619.50, Expenses: $36.96. Filed by Debtor Alfred M Velina). (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Alfred M Velina) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/20/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)#6 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)) No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 08/20/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(2:17-bk-20115) [misc,volp13] ( 310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45424365. Fee amount 310.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Smith, Valerie. (Smith, Valerie) (Entered: 08/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Alfred M Velina Case Number #88-50531, Chapter 13 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 02/04/1988; Case Number #11-38371, Chapter 7 filed in California Central Bankruptcy on 06/30/2011 , Standard Discharge on 11/10/2011.(Admin) (Entered: 08/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 09/13/2017 at 11:00 AM at RM 1, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, , Los Angeles, CA 90017. Confirmation hearing to be held on 01/07/2019 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Proof of Claim due by 12/12/2017. (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) Filed by Debtor Alfred M Velina. (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Debtor Alfred M Velina. (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Alfred M Velina. (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual . Fee Amount $310 Filed by Alfred M Velina Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 08/31/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 08/31/2017. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 08/31/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 08/31/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 08/31/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 08/31/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 08/31/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 08/31/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 08/31/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 08/31/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 08/31/2017. Chapter 13 Plan (LBR F3015-1) due by 08/31/2017. Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1) Due: 08/31/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 08/31/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 08/31/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 08/31/2017. (Ure, Thomas) (Entered: 08/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.