This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/10/2022 at 16:50:04 (UTC).

Zurn Industries Inc v. Allstate Insurance Co, et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Zurn Industries Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3032

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

GRANITE STATE INSURANCE CO

ALLSTATE INSURANCE CO, individually and as successor in interest toNorthbrook Excess and Surplus InsuranceCompany (formerly Northbrook InsuranceCompany)

TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY CO, individually and as successor in interest tothe Aetna Casualty and Surety Company formerly known as THE AETNA CASUALTY AND SURETYCOMPANY

FIRST STATE INSURANCE CO, a subsidiary of The Hartford FinancialServices Group, Inc. doing business as Arrowhead Indemnity Company formerly known as Royal Indemnity

NEW ENGLAND INSURANCE CO, a subsidiary of The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.

Appellees and Not Classified By Court

LEXINGTON INSURANCE CO

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO

Plaintiff / Appellee

ZURN INDUSTRIES INC

Defendant / Appellant

AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE CO

Appellee and Not Yet Classified

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee, Defendant / Appellant, Defendant, Appellee and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Gavin Fung Esq.

Attorney at Kennedys CMK

1600 Market Street, Suite 1410

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Robert R. Anderson Esq. III

Attorney at Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dyn Ltd

70 West Madison Street, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60602

Christopher A. Johnson Esq.

Attorney at Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dyn Ltd

70 West Madison Street, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60602

Timothy R. Smith Esq.

Attorney at Pion Nerone Girman Winslow & Smith

1500 One Gateway Center, 420 Fort Duquesne Boulevard

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Daniel A. Waitzman Esq.

Attorney at Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dyn Ltd

70 West Madison Street, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60602

Mark A. Martini Esq.

Attorney at Robb Leonard & Mulvihill

500 Grant Street, Bny Mellon Center, Suite 2300

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

M. Keith Moskowitz Esq.

233 Souther Wacker Drive, Suite 5900

Chicago, IL 60606

Samantha Wenger Esq.

Attorney at Dentons Us

4520 Main Street, Suite 1100

Kansas City, MO 64111

Sarah E. Dlugoszewski Esq.

Attorney at Shipman & Goodwin

One Constitution Plaza

Hartford, CT 06103

Michele Backus Konigsberg Esq.

Attorney at Shipman & Goodwin

1875 K Street, N.W., Suite 600

Washington, DC 20006

Edward B. Parks Esq. II

Attorney at Shipman & Goodwin

1875 K Street, N.W., Suite 600

Washington, DC 20006

Christopher Quinlan Esq.

Attorney at Shipman & Goodwin

1875 K Street, N.W., Suite 600

Washington, DC 20006

James P. Ruggeri Esq.

Attorney at Shipman & Goodwin

1875 K Street, N.W., Suite 600

Washington, DC 20006

Michael A. Shiner Esq.

Attorney at Tucker Arensberg

1500 One Ppg Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Benjamin J. Galloway Esq.

Attorney at McVey & Parsky

30 North Lasalle Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60602

Patrick J. Murphy Esq.

Attorney at Quarles & Brady

411 East Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 2400

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Mark E. Parsky Esq.

Attorney at McVey & Parsky

30 North Lasalle Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60602

Alexandra W. Shortridge Esq.

Attorney at Quarles & Brady

101 East Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 3400

Tampa, FL 33602

Jonathan R. Sichtermann Esq.

Attorney at McVey & Parsky

30 North Lasalle Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60602

Beth A. Slagle Esq.

Attorney at Meyer Unkovic & Scott

535 Smithfield Street, 1300 Oliver Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mark A. Martini, Esq. for Travelers Casualty & Surety Co, M. Keith Moskowitz, Esq. for Travelers Casualty & Surety Co and Samantha Wenger, Esq. for Travelers Casualty & Surety Co in 21-3032, 21-3119 requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 12/16/2021. [21-3032, 21-3119] (SB) [Entered: 12/02/2021 10:54 AM]

#31

(#31) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee First State Insurance Co in 21-3119. [21-3119, 21-3032] (MAS) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:21 PM]

#28

(#28) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees First State Insurance Co and New England Insurance Co to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 11/18/2021. [21-3032] (MAS) [Entered: 11/19/2021 04:10 PM]

#27

(#27) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mark A. Martini, Esq., M. Keith Moskowitz, Esq. and Samantha Wenger, Esq. for Travelers Casualty & Surety Co requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement on or before 12/03/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 11/19/2021 08:59 AM]

#26

(#26) ECF FILER: RESPONSE filed by Appellees First State Insurance Co and New England Insurance Co. to Clerk's 11/04/21 Order. Certificate of Service dated 11/18/2021 by Email. [21-3032]--[Edited 11/19/2021 by CJG] (MAS) [Entered: 11/18/2021 08:49 PM]

#14

(#25) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Zurn Industries Inc in 21-3032 to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 11/18/2021. [21-3032, 21-3119] (PJM) [Entered: 11/18/2021 05:44 PM]

#13

(#24) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Patrick Murphy on behalf of Appellee(s) Zurn Industries, LLC. [21-3032, 21-3119] (PJM) [Entered: 11/18/2021 05:39 PM]

#12

(#23) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Zurn Industries Inc in 21-3032. [21-3032, 21-3119] (PJM) [Entered: 11/18/2021 05:37 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER (Clerk) Appellant seeks review of the District Court orders and opinion entered October 1, 2021. The orders appealed from do not dismiss all claims as to all parties and have not been certified under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). In addition, the orders may not be immediately appealable under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(a)(1). See Ramara, Inc. v. Westfield Insurance Company, 814 F.3d. 660 (3d Cir. 2016). All parties must file written responses addressing this Courts authority over the appeal, with a certificate of service attached, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. (SB) [Entered: 11/04/2021 11:07 AM]

1 #9

Notice of Docketing to District Court

1 #8

Case Opening Letter

1 #7

Standing Order

1 #6

Case Caption

1 #5

District Court Memorandum Order

1 #4

District Court Order

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #2

District Court Order

#1

Civil Case Docketed

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mark A. Martini, Esq. for Travelers Casualty & Surety Co, M. Keith Moskowitz, Esq. for Travelers Casualty & Surety Co and Samantha Wenger, Esq. for Travelers Casualty & Surety Co in 21-3032, 21-3119 requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 12/16/2021. [21-3032, 21-3119] (SB) [Entered: 12/02/2021 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee First State Insurance Co in 21-3119. [21-3119, 21-3032] (MAS) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docket(#30) Attorney Bar status modified for Ralph J. Luongo, Esq. for American Home Assurance Co and Granite State Insurance Co and Lexington Insurance Co in 21-3032, 21-3119. Status is now active. [21-3032, 21-3119] (TMK) [Entered: 11/30/2021 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY STATUS for APPEARANCE FORM filed by Attorney Ralph J. Luongo, Esq. for Appellant American Home Assurance Co and Not Parties Granite State Insurance Co and Lexington Insurance Co in 21-3032. Counsel's current status in this Court's attorney rolls is inactive. An attorney must have active status in order to appear before this Court. R.A.D.E. 17.3. If you wish to return to active status or if you believe that you have been marked inactive in error, please complete the Attorney Admission Renewal/Adjustment of Status Form available on this Court's website by 12/14/2021. Future filings will not be accepted from an attorney in inactive status. [21-3032, 21-3119] (TMK) [Entered: 11/30/2021 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees First State Insurance Co and New England Insurance Co to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 11/18/2021. [21-3032] (MAS) [Entered: 11/19/2021 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Mark A. Martini, Esq., M. Keith Moskowitz, Esq. and Samantha Wenger, Esq. for Travelers Casualty & Surety Co requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement on or before 12/03/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 11/19/2021 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ECF FILER: RESPONSE filed by Appellees First State Insurance Co and New England Insurance Co. to Clerk's 11/04/21 Order. Certificate of Service dated 11/18/2021 by Email. [21-3032]--[Edited 11/19/2021 by CJG] (MAS) [Entered: 11/18/2021 08:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee Zurn Industries Inc in 21-3032 to clerk order. Certificate of Service dated 11/18/2021. [21-3032, 21-3119] (PJM) [Entered: 11/18/2021 05:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Patrick Murphy on behalf of Appellee(s) Zurn Industries, LLC. [21-3032, 21-3119] (PJM) [Entered: 11/18/2021 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Zurn Industries Inc in 21-3032. [21-3032, 21-3119] (PJM) [Entered: 11/18/2021 05:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ralph J. Luongo on behalf of Appellant(s) American Home Assurance Company. [21-3032, 21-3119] (RJL) [Entered: 11/18/2021 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Allstate Insurance Co in 21-3032, 21-3119. [21-3032, 21-3119] (CAJ) [Entered: 11/18/2021 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert R. Anderson III on behalf of Appellee(s) Allstate Insurance Company, solely as successor in interest to Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, formerly known as Northbrook Insurance Company. [21-3032, 21-3119] (RRA) [Entered: 11/18/2021 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christopher A. Johnson on behalf of Appellee(s) Allstate Insurance Company, solely as successor in interest to Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, formerly known as Northbrook Insurance Company.--[Edited 11/18/2021 by TMM] (CAJ) [Entered: 11/18/2021 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: NOT PARTICIPATING: Allison R. Radocha, Esq. advising that Appellee Liberty Mutual Insurance Co in 21-3032, 21-3119 will not participate in this appeal, received. [21-3032, 21-3119]--[Edited 11/19/2021 by CJG] (ARR) [Entered: 11/18/2021 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Timothy Smith on behalf of Appellant(s) Allstate Insurance Company, solely as successor in interest to Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company. [21-3032, 21-3119] (TRS) [Entered: 11/18/2021 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Gavin Fung on behalf of Appellant(s) American Home Assurance Company. [21-3032, 21-3119] (GF) [Entered: 11/18/2021 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) Appellant seeks review of the District Court orders and opinion entered October 1, 2021. The orders appealed from do not dismiss all claims as to all parties and have not been certified under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). In addition, the orders may not be immediately appealable under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(a)(1). See Ramara, Inc. v. Westfield Insurance Company, 814 F.3d. 660 (3d Cir. 2016). All parties must file written responses addressing this Courts authority over the appeal, with a certificate of service attached, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. (SB) [Entered: 11/04/2021 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 11/04/2021 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant American Home Assurance Co in District Court No. 1-18-cv-00299. (SB) [Entered: 11/04/2021 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New England Reinsurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where First State Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ZURN INDUSTRIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant