This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/08/2022 at 06:02:57 (UTC).

Zinter v. Salvaggio

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 Zinter filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Salvaggio. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-50700

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Russell Zinter

Jack Miller

Brian Howd

James A. Mead

Joseph Brandon Pierce

Mark Brown

David Bailey

Juan Gonzales, Jr.

Kevin Egan

Jonathon Green

James Springer

Theresa C. Richard

Jason Green

Greg Gardiner

Selena Herrara

Defendant / Appellants

Chief Joseph Salvaggio

Detective Jim Wells

Officer L. Farias, Badge 534

Lieutenant David Anderson

Officer Johnny Vasquez, #552, ID1176

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Brandon Grable

Attorney at Grable Grimshaw, P.L.L.C.

1603 Babcock Road

San Antonio, TX 78229

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Charles Straith Frigerio

Attorney at Law Offices of Charles S. Frigerio, P.C.

111 Soledad Street, Riverview Towers

San Antonio, TX 78205-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. David Anderson, NFN Azar, NFN Castro, Mr. Brandon Evans, Mr. L. Farias, Mr. Uziel Hernandez, Mr. Chad Mandry, Mr. Joseph Salvaggio, NFN Tacquard, NFN Urdiales, Mr. Johnny Vasquez, Mr. Jim Wells and NFN Yarbrough [22-50700] (CAS) [Entered: 08/09/2022 01:18 PM]

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Cross appeal filed. [9911995-2] Parties updated: Appellants/Cross-Appellees Joseph Salvaggio, Jim Wells, L. Farias, David Anderson, Johnny Vasquez, Chad Mandry, Brandon Evans, Uziel Hernandez, Yarbrough, Azar, Urdiales, Castro and Tacquard, Appellees/Cross-Appellants Russell Zinter, Jack Miller, Brian Howd, James A. Mead, Mark Brown, David Bailey, Juan Gonzales Jr., Kevin Egan, Jonathon Green, James Springer, Theresa C. Richard, Jason Green and Greg Gardiner in 22-50700. NOA filed by Appellees Mr. David Bailey, Mr. Mark Brown, Mr. Kevin Egan, Mr. Greg Gardiner, Mr. Juan Gonzales, Jr., Mr. Jason Green, Mr. Jonathon Green, Mr. Brian Howd, Mr. James A. Mead, Mr. Jack Miller, Ms. Theresa C. Richard, Mr. James Springer and Mr. Russell Zinter. [9911995-1] [22-50700] (CAS) [Entered: 08/09/2022 03:10 PM]

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Letter

Open Document #2

DKT-1 Letter

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Brandon Grable for Mr. David Bailey, Mr. Mark Brown, Mr. Kevin Egan, Mr. Greg Gardiner, Mr. Juan Gonzales, Jr., Mr. Jason Green, Mr. Jonathon Green, Mr. Brian Howd, Mr. James A. Mead, Mr. Jack Miller, Ms. Theresa C. Richard, Mr. James Springer and Mr. Russell Zinter and Mr. Brandon Grable for Mr. David Bailey, Mr. Mark Brown, Mr. Kevin Egan, Mr. Greg Gardiner, Mr. Juan Gonzales, Jr., Mr. Jason Green, Mr. Jonathon Green, Mr. Brian Howd, Mr. James A. Mead, Mr. Jack Miller, Ms. Theresa C. Richard, Mr. James Springer and Mr. Russell Zinter for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50700] (Brandon Grable ) [Entered: 08/15/2022 12:56 PM]

Open Document

ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Mr. David Bailey, Mr. Mark Brown, Mr. Kevin Egan, Mr. Greg Gardiner, Mr. Juan Gonzales, Jr., Mr. Jason Green, Mr. Jonathon Green, Mr. Brian Howd, Mr. James A. Mead, Mr. Jack Miller, Ms. Theresa C. Richard, Mr. James Springer and Mr. Russell Zinterfor the Court to process. Date of service: 09/06/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant/Cross-Appellee: Frigerio; Attorney for Appellee/Cross-Appellant: Grable. [22-50700] (Brandon Grable ) [Entered: 09/06/2022 10:35 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50700] (Charles Straith Frigerio ) [Entered: 09/06/2022 11:19 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [22-50700] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants/Cross-Appellees Mr. David Anderson, NFN Azar, NFN Castro, Mr. Brandon Evans, Mr. L. Farias, Mr. Uziel Hernandez, Mr. Chad Mandry, Mr. Joseph Salvaggio, NFN Tacquard, NFN Urdiales, Mr. Johnny Vasquez, Mr. Jim Wells and NFN Yarbrough advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 09/06/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant/Cross-Appellee: Frigerio; Attorney for Appellee/Cross-Appellant: Grable [22-50700] (Charles Straith Frigerio ) [Entered: 09/06/2022 11:25 AM]

Open Document

LETTER filed - atty Brandon Grable's unavailabe dates . [22-50700] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Mr. David Bailey, Mr. Mark Brown, Mr. Kevin Egan, Mr. Greg Gardiner, Mr. Juan Gonzales, Jr., Mr. Jason Green, Mr. Jonathon Green, Mr. Brian Howd, Mr. James A. Mead, Mr. Russell Zinter, Mr. James Springer, Ms. Theresa C. Richard and Mr. Jack Miller Date of Service: 09/09/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant/Cross-Appellee: Frigerio; Attorney for Appellee/Cross-Appellant: Grable [22-50700] (Brandon Grable ) [Entered: 09/09/2022 11:02 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/07/2022 for Appellants/Cross-Appellees David Anderson, Azar, Castro, Brandon Evans, L. Farias, Uziel Hernandez, Chad Mandry, Joseph Salvaggio, Tacquard, Urdiales, Johnny Vasquez, Jim Wells and Yarbrough. [22-50700] (CMB) [Entered: 09/26/2022 09:22 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/07/2022 for Appellants/Cross-Appellees David Anderson, Azar, Castro, Brandon Evans, L. Farias, Uziel Hernandez, Chad Mandry, Joseph Salvaggio, Tacquard, Urdiales, Johnny Vasquez, Jim Wells and Yarbrough. [22-50700] (CMB) [Entered: 09/26/2022 09:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-50700] (CMB) [Entered: 09/26/2022 09:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER filed - atty Brandon Grable's unavailabe dates . [22-50700] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Mr. David Bailey, Mr. Mark Brown, Mr. Kevin Egan, Mr. Greg Gardiner, Mr. Juan Gonzales, Jr., Mr. Jason Green, Mr. Jonathon Green, Mr. Brian Howd, Mr. James A. Mead, Mr. Russell Zinter, Mr. James Springer, Ms. Theresa C. Richard and Mr. Jack Miller Date of Service: 09/09/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant/Cross-Appellee: Frigerio; Attorney for Appellee/Cross-Appellant: Grable [22-50700] (Brandon Grable ) [Entered: 09/09/2022 11:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 5:18-CV-680. Electronic ROA due on 09/23/2022. [22-50700] (MBC) [Entered: 09/08/2022 12:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellees/Cross-Appellants Mr. David Bailey, Mr. Mark Brown, Mr. Kevin Egan, Mr. Greg Gardiner, Mr. Juan Gonzales, Jr., Mr. Jason Green, Mr. Jonathon Green, Mr. Brian Howd, Mr. James A. Mead, Mr. Jack Miller, Ms. Theresa C. Richard, Mr. James Springer and Mr. Russell Zinter advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [22-50700] (MBC) [Entered: 09/08/2022 12:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Charles Straith Frigerio for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Tacquard in 22-50700, Attorney Charles Straith Frigerio for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Castro in 22-50700, Attorney Charles Straith Frigerio for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Urdiales in 22-50700, Attorney Charles Straith Frigerio for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Azar in 22-50700, Attorney Charles Straith Frigerio for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Yarbrough in 22-50700, Attorney Charles Straith Frigerio for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Uziel Hernandez in 22-50700, Attorney Charles Straith Frigerio for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Brandon Evans in 22-50700, Attorney Charles Straith Frigerio for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Chad Mandry in 22-50700, Attorney Charles Straith Frigerio for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Johnny Vasquez in 22-50700, Attorney Charles Straith Frigerio for Appellant/Cross-Appellee David Anderson in 22-50700, Attorney Charles Straith Frigerio for Appellant/Cross-Appellee L. Farias in 22-50700, Attorney Charles Straith Frigerio for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Jim Wells in 22-50700, Attorney Charles Straith Frigerio for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Joseph Salvaggio in 22-50700 [22-50700] (RSM) [Entered: 09/07/2022 01:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [22-50700] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants/Cross-Appellees Mr. David Anderson, NFN Azar, NFN Castro, Mr. Brandon Evans, Mr. L. Farias, Mr. Uziel Hernandez, Mr. Chad Mandry, Mr. Joseph Salvaggio, NFN Tacquard, NFN Urdiales, Mr. Johnny Vasquez, Mr. Jim Wells and NFN Yarbrough advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 09/06/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant/Cross-Appellee: Frigerio; Attorney for Appellee/Cross-Appellant: Grable [22-50700] (Charles Straith Frigerio ) [Entered: 09/06/2022 11:25 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50700] (Charles Straith Frigerio ) [Entered: 09/06/2022 11:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketFEE PAID by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Mr. David Bailey, Mr. Mark Brown, Mr. Kevin Egan, Mr. Greg Gardiner, Mr. Juan Gonzales, Jr., Mr. Jason Green, Mr. Jonathon Green, Mr. Brian Howd, Mr. James A. Mead, Mr. Jack Miller, Ms. Theresa C. Richard, Mr. James Springer and Mr. Russell Zinter. Fee deadline satisfied [22-50700] (MBC) [Entered: 09/06/2022 10:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellees/Cross-Appellants Mr. David Bailey, Mr. Mark Brown, Mr. Kevin Egan, Mr. Greg Gardiner, Mr. Juan Gonzales, Jr., Mr. Jason Green, Mr. Jonathon Green, Mr. Brian Howd, Mr. James A. Mead, Mr. Jack Miller, Ms. Theresa C. Richard, Mr. James Springer and Mr. Russell Zinterfor the Court to process. Date of service: 09/06/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant/Cross-Appellee: Frigerio; Attorney for Appellee/Cross-Appellant: Grable. [22-50700] (Brandon Grable ) [Entered: 09/06/2022 10:35 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketFEE PAID by Appellants/Cross-Appellees Mr. David Anderson, NFN Azar, NFN Castro, Mr. Brandon Evans, Mr. L. Farias, Mr. Uziel Hernandez, Mr. Chad Mandry, Mr. Joseph Salvaggio, NFN Tacquard, NFN Urdiales, Mr. Johnny Vasquez, Mr. Jim Wells and NFN Yarbrough. Fee deadline satisfied [22-50700] (MBC) [Entered: 09/06/2022 09:35 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Brandon Grable for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Greg Gardiner in 22-50700, Attorney Brandon Grable for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Jason Green in 22-50700, Attorney Brandon Grable for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Theresa C. Richard in 22-50700, Attorney Brandon Grable for Appellee/Cross-Appellant James Springer in 22-50700, Attorney Brandon Grable for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Jonathon Green in 22-50700, Attorney Brandon Grable for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Kevin Egan in 22-50700, Attorney Brandon Grable for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Juan Gonzales Jr. in 22-50700, Attorney Brandon Grable for Appellee/Cross-Appellant David Bailey in 22-50700, Attorney Brandon Grable for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Mark Brown in 22-50700, Attorney Brandon Grable for Appellee/Cross-Appellant James A. Mead in 22-50700, Attorney Brandon Grable for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Brian Howd in 22-50700, Attorney Brandon Grable for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Jack Miller in 22-50700, Attorney Brandon Grable for Appellee/Cross-Appellant Russell Zinter in 22-50700 [22-50700] (RSM) [Entered: 08/16/2022 02:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Austin Reyna is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:he is no longer counsel on this case. [22-50700] (AS) [Entered: 08/16/2022 08:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Brandon Grable for Mr. David Bailey, Mr. Mark Brown, Mr. Kevin Egan, Mr. Greg Gardiner, Mr. Juan Gonzales, Jr., Mr. Jason Green, Mr. Jonathon Green, Mr. Brian Howd, Mr. James A. Mead, Mr. Jack Miller, Ms. Theresa C. Richard, Mr. James Springer and Mr. Russell Zinter and Mr. Brandon Grable for Mr. David Bailey, Mr. Mark Brown, Mr. Kevin Egan, Mr. Greg Gardiner, Mr. Juan Gonzales, Jr., Mr. Jason Green, Mr. Jonathon Green, Mr. Brian Howd, Mr. James A. Mead, Mr. Jack Miller, Ms. Theresa C. Richard, Mr. James Springer and Mr. Russell Zinter for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-50700] (Brandon Grable ) [Entered: 08/15/2022 12:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9914902-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/29/2022 for Appellants/Cross-Appellees David Anderson, Azar, Castro, Brandon Evans, L. Farias, Uziel Hernandez, Chad Mandry, Joseph Salvaggio, Tacquard, Urdiales, Johnny Vasquez, Jim Wells and Yarbrough and Appellees/Cross-Appellants David Bailey, Mark Brown, Kevin Egan, Greg Gardiner, Juan Gonzales Jr., Jason Green, Jonathon Green, Brian Howd, James A. Mead, Jack Miller, Theresa C. Richard, James Springer and Russell Zinter. Transcript order due on 08/29/2022 for Appellants/Cross-Appellees David Anderson, Azar, Castro, Brandon Evans, L. Farias, Uziel Hernandez, Chad Mandry, Joseph Salvaggio, Tacquard, Urdiales, Johnny Vasquez, Jim Wells and Yarbrough [22-50700] (RSM) [Entered: 08/12/2022 12:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Brandon Grable is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:Does not represent Pierce or Herrara. [22-50700] (CAS) [Entered: 08/09/2022 03:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Cross appeal filed. [9911995-2] Parties updated: Appellants/Cross-Appellees Joseph Salvaggio, Jim Wells, L. Farias, David Anderson, Johnny Vasquez, Chad Mandry, Brandon Evans, Uziel Hernandez, Yarbrough, Azar, Urdiales, Castro and Tacquard, Appellees/Cross-Appellants Russell Zinter, Jack Miller, Brian Howd, James A. Mead, Mark Brown, David Bailey, Juan Gonzales Jr., Kevin Egan, Jonathon Green, James Springer, Theresa C. Richard, Jason Green and Greg Gardiner in 22-50700. NOA filed by Appellees Mr. David Bailey, Mr. Mark Brown, Mr. Kevin Egan, Mr. Greg Gardiner, Mr. Juan Gonzales, Jr., Mr. Jason Green, Mr. Jonathon Green, Mr. Brian Howd, Mr. James A. Mead, Mr. Jack Miller, Ms. Theresa C. Richard, Mr. James Springer and Mr. Russell Zinter. [9911995-1] [22-50700] (CAS) [Entered: 08/09/2022 03:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. David Anderson, NFN Azar, NFN Castro, Mr. Brandon Evans, Mr. L. Farias, Mr. Uziel Hernandez, Mr. Chad Mandry, Mr. Joseph Salvaggio, NFN Tacquard, NFN Urdiales, Mr. Johnny Vasquez, Mr. Jim Wells and NFN Yarbrough [22-50700] (CAS) [Entered: 08/09/2022 01:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Straith Frigerio Esq.