This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2020 at 05:41:17 (UTC).

Ziankovich v. Mbrs of the CO Supreme Court, et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 Ziankovich filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Mbrs of the CO Supreme Court. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1195

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

MEMBERS OF THE COLORADO SUPREME COURT, each of them individually and in their official capacity

WILLIAM R. LUCERO, in his individual and official capacity

Plaintiff / Appellant

YOURAS ZIANKOVICH

Houston, TX 77014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Allison R. Ailer

Attorney at Colorado Department of Law

1300 Broadway

Denver, CO 80203

Grant Sullivan

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General for the State of Colorado

1300 Broadway

Denver, CO 80203

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Youras Ziankovich

14405 Walters Road, Suite 808

Houston, TX 77014

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10743509] Jurisdiction challenged. Appellant's memorandum brief due 06/11/2020 for Youras Ziankovich. See attached order for details. [20-1195] [Entered: 05/28/2020 02:42 PM]

Open Document

[10743453] Notice that transcript order filed by Youras Ziankovich. Transcript ordered: None.. Served on: 05/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1195]--[Edited 05/28/2020 by AT] YZ [Entered: 05/28/2020 01:15 PM]

Open Document #4

Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

Order denying review and reconsideration

Open Document #2

Order denying PI

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10743444] Entry of appearance filed by Youras Ziankovich. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1195] [Entered: 05/28/2020 12:59 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Prelim ROA

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket[10743606] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 05/29/2020. Text entry only. [20-1195] [Entered: 05/29/2020 08:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10743509] Jurisdiction challenged. Appellant's memorandum brief due 06/11/2020 for Youras Ziankovich. See attached order for details. [20-1195] [Entered: 05/28/2020 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket[10743488] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 06/04/2020 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [20-1195] [Entered: 05/28/2020 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10743453] Notice that transcript order filed by Youras Ziankovich. Transcript ordered: None.. Served on: 05/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1195]--[Edited 05/28/2020 by AT] YZ [Entered: 05/28/2020 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10743450] Docketing statement filed by Youras Ziankovich. Served on 05/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1195] YZ [Entered: 05/28/2020 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10743444] Entry of appearance filed by Youras Ziankovich. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 05/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-1195] [Entered: 05/28/2020 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket[10743435] Entry of appearance submitted by Youras Ziankovich for Appellant Youras Ziankovich for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 05/28/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 05/28/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-1195] YZ [Entered: 05/28/2020 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10743421] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/28/2020 Docketing statement due 06/11/2020 for Youras Ziankovich. Transcript order form due 06/11/2020 for Youras Ziankovich. Notice of appearance due on 06/11/2020 for William R. Lucero, Members of the Colorado Supreme Court, and Youras Ziankovich. [20-1195] [Entered: 05/28/2020 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.